Jacobs v. O'Malley
Plaintiff: Terry Jacobs
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Interested Party: SSA-Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 7:2024cv00067
Filed: March 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Brian S Meyers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/13/2024. (Mann, Stephanie)
March 15, 2024 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE SERVICE - This action is governed by the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Pursuant to Supplemental Rule 3, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate office within the Social Security of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of this case and Plaintiff's complaint. No summons will issue. Defendant's deadline to serve an answer or motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 is governed by Supplemental Rule 4. (Mann, Stephanie)
February 22, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Wanda D. Mason on behalf of Martin O'Malley. (Mason, Wanda)
February 9, 2024 Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Mann, Stephanie)
February 7, 2024 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Terry Jacobs (Hall, Charlotte)
February 7, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Charlotte Williams Hall on behalf of Terry Jacobs. (Hall, Charlotte)
February 7, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terry Jacobs. (Hall, Charlotte)
February 7, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin O'Malley, filed by Terry Jacobs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hall, Charlotte)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Jacobs
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin O'Malley
Represented By: Wanda D. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA-Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?