Baker v. United States of America
Plaintiff: William Richard Baker, Jr.
Defendant: United States of America
Interested Party: Torts Branch USDOJ
Case Number: 7:2024cv00353
Filed: April 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Brian S Meyers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Philip C. Federico on behalf of William Richard Baker, Jr. (Federico, Philip)
April 19, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Sara Johanna Mirsky on behalf of United States of America. (Mirsky, Sara)
April 19, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Daniel Charles Eagles on behalf of United States of America. (Eagles, Daniel)
April 18, 2024 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission. Attorney Philip C. Federico must file a notice of special appearance within ten days, unless one has already been filed. Local Counsel is DIRECTED to serve this order on out-of-state counsel. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/18/2024. (Sellers, N.)
April 18, 2024 NOTICE OF SERVICE. This action is governed by Standing Order 23-SO-1. Pursuant to that Order, the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Filing using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing System, notifying the United States Attorney for the Eastern District of North Carolina and the Civil Division, Torts Branch, Environmental Torts Litigation Office, United States Department of Justice of the case. Plaintiff need not serve a summons and complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. No summons will issue. Service of the Complaint and any attachments thereto will be completed by a regenerated Notice of Electronic Filing to follow immediately. (Sellers, N.)
April 17, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission and Affidavit filed by William Richard Baker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt for Pro Hac Vice) (Smith, Guy)
April 17, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Guy Dixon Smith on behalf of William Richard Baker, Jr. (Smith, Guy)
April 17, 2024 Filing 1 SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCEDC-7570967.), filed by William Richard Baker, Jr. (Smith, Guy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Richard Baker, Jr.
Represented By: Guy Dixon Smith
Represented By: Philip C. Federico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel Charles Eagles
Represented By: Sara Johanna Mirsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Torts Branch USDOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?