FURR et al v. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: THOMAS R. FURR and SHIRLEY V. FURR
Defendant: RILEY POWER, INC., INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION, RPM, INC., CNA HOLDINGS, INC., INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, POTTS WELDING & BOILER REPAIR CO., INC., PACCAR, INC., FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, SEARS ROEBUCK & CO., DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY, GOODRICH CORPORATION, DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION, HARSCO CORPORATION, NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC., AIRCO, INC., NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION, INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, BOILER ENGINEERING & SUPPLY CO., FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION, HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY, UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC., ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, THE, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO., THE, GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORP., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, BORG WARNER CORPORATION, MACK TRUCKS, INC., CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., MAREMONT CORPORATION, FLUOR CAROLINA, INC., THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY, BELL & GOSSETT, YARWAY CORPORATION, CATERPILLAR, INC., SEPCO CORPORATION, KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY, FLOWSERVE US, INC., FORD MOTOR COMPANY, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP., CRANE COMPANY (THE), CELANESE CORPORATION OF AMERICA, HARRISBURG STEEL CORPORATION, COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC., B. F. GOODRICH COMPANY, THE, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., CHRYSLER CORPORATION, VIACOM, INC., WARREN PUMPS, LLC, FURNANCE ROAD CORPORATION, AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., GARLOCK, INC., CELANESE CORPORATION, NORTH BROTHERS, INC., THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY, A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT, AURORA PUMP, PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION, GREFCO, WEIL-McLAIN, REPUBLIC POWDERED METALS, INC., JOHN DEERE & COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL HARVESTER COMPANY, AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC a Virginia Corporation doing business as RECO USA, GOULDS PUMPS, INC., HNA HOLDINGS, INC., MR. SEARS, FOSTER WHEELER, INC., NSI ENTERPRISES, INC., LEIGHTON INDUSTRIES, INC., PETERBILT TRUCKS and BABCOCK BORSIG POWER, INC.
Cross Defendant: AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2007cv00400
Filed: May 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Moore
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 10/22/2012, that the Clerk of Court terminate Defendants Anchor Packing Company, RPM, Inc., DaimlerChrysler Corporation and Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC in his records; any party shall have the right to reopen this case as to Defendants Anchor Packing Company, RPM, Inc., DaimlerChrysler Corporation and Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC for any purpose on motion and notice to all parties, without prejudice to the rights of any of the parties, at any time prior to the 90th day after the final termination of the bankruptcy proceedings. (Butler, Carol)
October 17, 2012 Telephone Notice with Deputy Clerk, Tom Dempsey with the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (215) 597-7704 verifying that Crane Company is not a viable defendant held on 10/17/2012. (Sanders, Marlene)
October 8, 2012 Filing 98 STATUS REPORT by THOMAS R. FURR. (BLACK, JANET WARD)
October 5, 2012 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES D. GANDY, III on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC. (GANDY, JAMES)
September 28, 2012 Filing 96 NOTICE by GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC Notice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(BOUCH, TIMOTHY)
September 28, 2012 Filing 95 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record And Notice of Automatic Stay by NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC. (GANDY, JAMES) Modified on 10/1/2012 to remove unnecessary punctuation. (Butler, Carol)
September 26, 2012 Filing 94 NOTICE OF PRIOR FILING IN MDL 875 by DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Master Notice of Suggestion of Bankruptcy)(WARNER, KIRK) Modified on 9/27/2012 to edit title. (Butler, Carol)
July 12, 2012 Filing 93 NOTICE OF SUGGESTION OF PENDENCY OF BANKRUPTCY AND AUTOMATIC STAY OF PROCEEDINGS by Defendant RPM, INC. of filing bankruptcy (BENNETT, JOSHUA) Modified on 7/13/2012 to edit title. (Butler, Carol)
July 2, 2012 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #92 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Office of the Clerk has been advised that said Motion does not require a ruling. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 07/02/2012. (AULD, L.)
June 12, 2012 Motions Referred: #92 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MICHAEL C. GRIFFIN to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sanders, Marlene)
June 12, 2012 Motions No Longer Submitted to Judge Tilley #92 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MICHAEL C. GRIFFIN (Winchester, Robin)
June 11, 2012 Case Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD as referral judge. MAG/JUDGE WALLACE W. DIXON no longer assigned to the case. (Powell, Gloria)
June 11, 2012 Case Reassigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR no longer assigned to the case. (Powell, Gloria)
June 8, 2012 Motions Submitted: #92 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MICHAEL C. GRIFFIN to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR. (Winchester, Robin)
June 5, 2012 Filing 92 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MICHAEL C. GRIFFIN by on behalf of BELL & GOSSETT. Responses due by 6/29/2012 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (GRIFFIN, MICHAEL) Modified on 6/7/2012 to remove duplicate text. (Lloyd, Donna)
May 29, 2012 Case reopened. (Butler, Carol)
May 29, 2012 Filing 91 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER by MDL Panel re: MDL 875 received and filed on 5/29/2012. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(Butler, Carol)
September 24, 2007 Filing 90 ANSWER to Complaint by FLOWSERVE US, INC. (Individually and as successor to Pacific Pumps and Edward Valve, Inc. and Flowserve Pump Corporation, a Delaware Corporation). (ROBERTS, STEPHANIE) Modified on 9/25/2007 to correct spacing (Lee, Lisa).
September 12, 2007 Filing 89 MDL TRANSFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order transferring this action to EDPA. (Attachments: # 1 NCMD List of Cases) (Welch, Kelly)
August 28, 2007 Filing 88 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-280) Re: MDL 875, transferring this action to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania for the reasons stated in the order of July 29, 1991. (Received in Clerk's office on 7/2/2007). (Welch, Kelly)
August 2, 2007 Filing 87 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant BELL & GOSSETT. (GRIFFIN, MICHAEL)
August 2, 2007 Filing 86 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BELL & GOSSETT. (GRIFFIN, MICHAEL)
July 24, 2007 Filing 85 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, Cross Defendant BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, Cross Claimant BORG-WARNER CORPORATION by BORG-WARNER CORPORATION.(GARDNER, J.)
July 24, 2007 Filing 84 Notice of Appearance and ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against CLEAVER BROOKS, INC., AURORA PUMP, BELL & GOSSETT, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., CATERPILLAR INC., CBS CORPORATION, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS, INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC., CRANE CO., DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION, A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY, FLOWSERVE US, INC., FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., FORD MOTOR COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY, GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO., GOULDS PUMPS, INC., HARSCO CORPORATION, HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION, AIRCO, INC., JOHN DEERE & COMPANY, KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC., LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP., THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY, MACK TRUCKS, INC., MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT, MAREMONT CORPORATION, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC, PACCAR INC., PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, POTTS WELDING & BOILER REPAIR CO., INC., RPM, INC., RILEY POWER INC., SEARS, ROEBUCK AND CO., SEPCO CORPORATION, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, UNIROYAL HOLDINGS, INC., WARREN PUMPS LLC, WEIL-McLAIN, YARWAY CORPORATION, AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC., ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, THE by BORG-WARNER CORPORATION. (GARDNER, J.)
July 24, 2007 Filing 83 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY by ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY.(BOUCH, TIMOTHY)
July 24, 2007 Filing 82 ANSWER to Complaint by ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY. (BOUCH, TIMOTHY)
July 24, 2007 Filing 81 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT by MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT.(BOUCH, TIMOTHY)
July 24, 2007 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint by MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT. (BOUCH, TIMOTHY)
July 24, 2007 Filing 79 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC by GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC.(BOUCH, TIMOTHY)
July 24, 2007 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint by GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (BOUCH, TIMOTHY)
July 24, 2007 Filing 77 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, THE by ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, THE.(BOUCH, TIMOTHY)
July 24, 2007 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint by ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, THE. (BOUCH, TIMOTHY)
July 24, 2007 Filing 75 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant RILEY POWER INC.. (LAZZARONI, TERESA)
July 24, 2007 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by RILEY POWER INC.. (LAZZARONI, TERESA)
July 23, 2007 Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint by GOULDS PUMPS, INC.. (PEED, LINDSAY)
July 20, 2007 Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint by UNIROYAL HOLDINGS, INC.. (SPRINKLE, CHARLES)
July 20, 2007 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (SPRINKLE, CHARLES)
July 20, 2007 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (SPRINKLE, CHARLES)
July 20, 2007 Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint by UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. (SPRINKLE, CHARLES)
July 20, 2007 Filing 68 ANSWER to Complaint by CERTAINTEED CORPORATION. (SPRINKLE, CHARLES)
July 19, 2007 Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant SEARS, ROEBUCK AND CO. by SEARS, ROEBUCK AND CO..(LAZZARONI, TERESA)
July 18, 2007 Filing 66 Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company's ANSWER to Complaint and, CROSSCLAIM against CLEAVER BROOKS, INC., AURORA PUMP, BELL & GOSSETT, BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., CATERPILLAR INC., CBS CORPORATION, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS, INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC., CRANE CO., DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION, DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY, FLOWSERVE US, INC., FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., FORD MOTOR COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY, GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO., GOULDS PUMPS, INC., HARSCO CORPORATION, HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION, AIRCO, INC., JOHN DEERE & COMPANY, KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC., LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP., THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY, MACK TRUCKS, INC., MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT, MAREMONT CORPORATION, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC, PACCAR INC., PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, POTTS WELDING & BOILER REPAIR CO., INC., RPM, INC., RILEY POWER INC., SEARS, ROEBUCK AND CO., SEPCO CORPORATION, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, UNIROYAL HOLDINGS, INC., WARREN PUMPS LLC, WEIL-McLAIN, YARWAY CORPORATION, AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC., ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, THE by A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY. (THOMAS, MARK)
July 18, 2007 Filing 65 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY. (THOMAS, MARK)
July 18, 2007 Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
July 18, 2007 Filing 63 ANSWER to Complaint by CLEAVER BROOKS, INC.. (WILLIAMSON, STEPHEN)
July 17, 2007 Filing 62 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC.. (LAMBETH, CARTER)
July 17, 2007 Filing 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC.. (LAMBETH, CARTER)
July 17, 2007 Filing 60 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by MAREMONT CORPORATION. (LAMBETH, CARTER)
July 17, 2007 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant MAREMONT CORPORATION. (LAMBETH, CARTER)
July 17, 2007 Filing 58 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC.. (LAMBETH, CARTER)
July 17, 2007 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC.. (LAMBETH, CARTER)
July 17, 2007 Filing 56 Goodrich Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by GOODRICH CORPORATION. (BROWN, A.)
July 17, 2007 Filing 55 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WARREN PUMPS LLC. (ZARSADIAS, I.)
July 17, 2007 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.. (ZARSADIAS, I.)
July 17, 2007 Filing 53 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.. (DUKE, DAVID)
July 17, 2007 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint by LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.. (DUKE, DAVID)
July 16, 2007 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint and Entry of Appearance by CATERPILLAR INC.. (COOPER, LANGDON)
July 12, 2007 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
July 12, 2007 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and Answer to Cross-Claims by GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
July 10, 2007 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by SEARS, ROEBUCK AND CO.. (LAZZARONI, TERESA)
July 9, 2007 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC. (MOORE, LACEY)
July 9, 2007 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint by AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC. (MOORE, LACEY)
July 3, 2007 Filing 45 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
July 3, 2007 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
July 2, 2007 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to Counterclaims by HARSCO CORPORATION. (WHITE, JAMES)
June 27, 2007 Filing 42 NOTICE by YARWAY CORPORATION re #34 Corporate Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a) (Attachments: #1 Corrected image - Yarway's Corp. Disc.)(TOMLIN, TRACY)
June 25, 2007 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MACK TRUCKS, INC. re #40 Corporate Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a) (KESHIAN, RICHARD)
June 25, 2007 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT that #40 Corporate Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a) lacks a certificate of service. Please electronically file a separate certificate of service to be linked to doc. #40. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 22, 2007 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant MACK TRUCKS, INC. (KESHIAN, RICHARD)
June 22, 2007 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by MACK TRUCKS, INC. (KESHIAN, RICHARD)
June 22, 2007 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT re #34 Corporate Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a): second page of document is formatted differently from the first and third pages. #34 Corporate Disclosure Statement must be electronically filed again with all pages being correctly formatted. (McKenzie, Keayba)
June 21, 2007 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. (BENNETT, JOSHUA)
June 21, 2007 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint by KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC. (BENNETT, JOSHUA)
June 21, 2007 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. (BENNETT, JOSHUA)
June 21, 2007 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint by AMERICAN STANDARD, INC. (BENNETT, JOSHUA)
June 21, 2007 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant YARWAY CORPORATION. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
June 21, 2007 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance and ANSWER to Complaint by YARWAY CORPORATION. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
June 21, 2007 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant JOHN DEERE & COMPANY. (TOMLIN, TRACY) Original document modified to correct 2nd page layout 6/21/2007 (Franklin, Grady).
June 20, 2007 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY. (MOORE, LACEY)
June 20, 2007 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint by PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY. (MOORE, LACEY)
June 19, 2007 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance and ANSWER to Complaint by AURORA PUMP. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
June 19, 2007 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION. (WARNER, KIRK)
June 19, 2007 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (WARNER, KIRK)
June 19, 2007 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION. (WARNER, KIRK)
June 19, 2007 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Affirmative Defenses by GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION. (WARNER, KIRK)
June 19, 2007 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Affirmative Defenses by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (WARNER, KIRK)
June 19, 2007 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand with Affirmative Defenses by DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION. (WARNER, KIRK)
June 19, 2007 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KIRK GIBSON WARNER on behalf of Defendants DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION, FORD MOTOR COMPANY, GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION (WARNER, KIRK)
June 18, 2007 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant JOHN DEERE & COMPANY. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
June 18, 2007 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance and ANSWER to Complaint by JOHN DEERE & COMPANY. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
June 18, 2007 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WEIL-McLAIN. (GORDON, FRANK)
June 18, 2007 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (DAVIS, HARRY)
June 18, 2007 Filing 17 Entry of Appearance and ANSWER to Complaint by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (DAVIS, HARRY)
June 5, 2007 Filing 16 NOTICE by FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION NOTICE OF TAG-ALONG ACTION (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
June 5, 2007 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
June 5, 2007 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
June 4, 2007 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CRANE CO.. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
June 4, 2007 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance and ANSWER to Complaint by CRANE CO.. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
June 4, 2007 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
June 4, 2007 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance and ANSWER to Complaint by BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
June 4, 2007 NOTICE of Docket Text/Event Modification: The previously docketed Notice regarding Consent before Magistrate Jduge as document #10 was inadvertently e-filed and has been removed from the docket for processing. In the future, matters of this nature should be sent directly to the Clerk's Office for processing. (Blumke, Sheila)
June 1, 2007 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CNA HOLDINGS, INC.. (HICKS, JOSEPHINE)
June 1, 2007 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by CNA HOLDINGS, INC.. (HICKS, JOSEPHINE)
May 30, 2007 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant POTTS WELDING & BOILER REPAIR CO., INC.. (WELLMAN, JACOB)
May 30, 2007 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance and Short Form ANSWER to Complaint by POTTS WELDING & BOILER REPAIR CO., INC.. (WELLMAN, JACOB)
May 18, 2007 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (McClain, Abby)
May 18, 2007 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CLEAVER BROOKS, INC., AURORA PUMP, BELL & GOSSETT, BORG-WARNER CORPORATION, BUFFALO PUMPS, INC., CATERPILLAR INC., CBS CORPORATION, CERTAINTEED CORPORATION, CNA HOLDINGS, INC., COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC., CRANE CO., DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION, DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY, ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY, FLOWSERVE US, INC., FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., FORD MOTOR COMPANY, FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION, GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION, GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY, GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION, GOODRICH CORPORATION, GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO., GOULDS PUMPS, INC., HARSCO CORPORATION, A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY, HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY, INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION, AIRCO, INC., JOHN DEERE & COMPANY, KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC., LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP., THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY, MACK TRUCKS, INC., MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT, MAREMONT CORPORATION, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC., AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC, PACCAR INC., PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY, POTTS WELDING & BOILER REPAIR CO., INC., RPM, INC., RILEY POWER INC., SEARS, ROEBUCK AND CO., SEPCO CORPORATION, UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, UNIROYAL HOLDINGS, INC., WARREN PUMPS LLC, WEIL-McLAIN, YARWAY CORPORATION, AMERICAN STANDARD, INC., ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC., ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, THE. (McClain, Abby)
May 18, 2007 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET, filed by Thomas R. Furr, Shirley V. Furr.(BLACK, JANET WARD)
May 18, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 319098.), filed by Thomas R. Furr, Shirley V. Furr.(BLACK, JANET WARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FURR et al v. A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RILEY POWER, INC.
Represented By: TERESA LAZZARONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL TRUCK AND ENGINE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPHINE H. HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK SEALING TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POTTS WELDING & BOILER REPAIR CO., INC.
Represented By: JACOB H. WELLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACCAR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEARS ROEBUCK & CO.
Represented By: TERESA LAZZARONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: CHARLES M. SPRINKLE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL REFRACTORIES COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODRICH CORPORATION
Represented By: A. TODD BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION
Represented By: KIRK GIBSON WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARSCO CORPORATION
Represented By: JAMES C. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL SERVICES INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JAMES D. GANDY, III
Represented By: CARTER T. LAMBETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: I. TIMOTHY ZARSADIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL TRANSPORTATION CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOILER ENGINEERING & SUPPLY CO.
Represented By: JACOB H. WELLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOBART BROTHERS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES M. SPRINKLE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANCHOR PACKING COMPANY, THE
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO., THE
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: HARRY LEE DAVIS, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Represented By: CHARLES M. SPRINKLE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORG WARNER CORPORATION
Represented By: J. A. GARDNER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MACK TRUCKS, INC.
Represented By: RICHARD J. KESHIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN B. WILLIAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAREMONT CORPORATION
Represented By: CARTER T. LAMBETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CAROLINA, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES M. SPRINKLE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BELL & GOSSETT
Represented By: MICHAEL C. GRIFFIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YARWAY CORPORATION
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: LANGDON M. COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEPCO CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY-MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: KEITH E. COLTRAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION
Represented By: KIRK GIBSON WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY COMPANY
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC.
Represented By: STEPHANIE UNDERWOOD ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Represented By: KIRK GIBSON WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Represented By: CHARLES M. SPRINKLE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEAR SIEGLER DIVERSIFIED HOLDINGS CORP.
Represented By: DAVID MARSHALL DUKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY (THE)
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELANESE CORPORATION OF AMERICA
Represented By: JOSEPHINE H. HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRISBURG STEEL CORPORATION
Represented By: JAMES C. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOPER INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: CARTER T. LAMBETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. F. GOODRICH COMPANY, THE
Represented By: A. TODD BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: CHARLES M. SPRINKLE, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRYSLER CORPORATION
Represented By: KIRK GIBSON WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIACOM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: I. TIMOTHY ZARSADIAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FURNANCE ROAD CORPORATION
Represented By: JACOB H. WELLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN STANDARD, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARLOCK, INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELANESE CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPHINE H. HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH BROTHERS, INC.
Represented By: JAMES D. GANDY, III
Represented By: CARTER T. LAMBETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LINCOLN ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY
Represented By: MARK S. THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MANCHESTER TANK & EQUIPMENT
Represented By: TIMOTHY W. BOUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMP
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: LACEY M. MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPHINE H. HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREFCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL-McLAIN
Represented By: FRANK J. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REPUBLIC POWDERED METALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DEERE & COMPANY
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL HARVESTER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC a Virginia Corporation doing business as RECO USA
Represented By: LACEY M. MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HNA HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPHINE H. HICKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. SEARS
Represented By: TERESA LAZZARONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, INC.
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSI ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: JAMES D. GANDY, III
Represented By: CARTER T. LAMBETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEIGHTON INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JACOB H. WELLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETERBILT TRUCKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BABCOCK BORSIG POWER, INC.
Represented By: TERESA LAZZARONI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: AMERICAN INVESTORS, LLC
Represented By: LACEY M. MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS R. FURR
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY V. FURR
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?