SMITH v. U.S. GOVERNMENT et al
Plaintiff: |
KEVIN M. SMITH |
Defendant: |
U.S. GOVERNMENT, U.S. TREASUREY DEPARTMENT, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE and NOREEN BAVARO |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00673 |
Filed: |
September 3, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina |
Office: |
NCMD Office |
County: |
Cabarrus |
Nature of Suit: |
Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause of Action: |
26 U.S.C. § 6212 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 5, 2013 |
Filing
25
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 7/5/2013; that the Motion to Dismiss of Defendants (Docket Entry 10 ) be GRANTED and that this action be dismissed. (Sheets, Jamie)
|
February 28, 2013 |
Filing
18
ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR. on 2/28/2013 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation 8 ; that, to the extent "Plaintiffs [sic] Response to Magistrate [sic] Decision with Motions by Plaintiffs" (Doc. [6)] sets forth a dispositive motion seeking judgment against Defendants, said motion is DENIED. (Sheets, Jamie)
|
February 19, 2013 |
Filing
17
ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR. on 2/19/2013 Adopting the Magistrate Judge's order of September 13, 2010 (Doc. [4)]; The court dispenses with oral argument and hereby AFFIRMS AND ADOPTS the order of the Magistrate Judge dated S eptember 13, 2010. Plaintiff is further cautioned that, as found by the Magistrate Judge, Plaintiff will not be permitted to appear on behalf of a corporation in this case unless Plaintiff is a duly licensed attorney authorized to appear in this cour t. Plaintiff is hereby cautioned that his continued appearance in a pro se capacity on behalf of a corporation (see Doc. 6 (requesting extension and other relief on behalf of "Plaintiffs"), Doc. 13 at 2 ("Plaintiffs enter Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss") and Doc. 15 at 1 ("Herein now Comes the Plaintiffs")) may result in sanctions, including dismissal. (Sheets, Jamie)
|
September 13, 2010 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Affidavit/Declaration in Support (Docket Entry 1) is DENIED. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 9/13/2010. (Lapira, Sharon)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?