LINDSAY v. LEWIS et al
Plaintiff: DERRICK JAVON LINDSAY
Defendant: ERIC JONES, ROBERT C. LEWIS, S. PATTERSON, M. MARTIN, JOEL HARRON and ALVIN KELLER, JR.
Case Number: 1:2011cv00067
Filed: January 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Scotland
Presiding Judge: UNASSIGNED
Presiding Judge: WALLACE W. DIXON
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 08/21/2013 as set out herein. RECOMMENDED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket Entry 40 ) be granted. FURTHER that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Docket Entry 36 ) be denied as moot. FURTHER that Plaintiff's Motion in Limine (Docket Entry 39 ) be denied as moot.(Taylor, Abby)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 05/29/2012. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's filing entitled "Subpoena in a Civil Case" requesting issuance of subpoenas for service on Defendants (Docket Ent ry 27 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART in that the Clerk's Office shall send to Plaintiff signed subpoenas requiring the presence of each Defendant at the scheduled trial of this matter, along with an estimate of the daily travel allow ance for each Defendant under 28 U.S.C. § 1821(c)(2) calculated based on travel between 324 W. Market St., Greensboro, North Carolina, and 214 W. Jones St., Raleigh, North Carolina (for Defendants Lewis and Keller) and 22385 McGirt's Brid ge Rd., Laurinburg, North Carolina (for Defendants Patterson, Martin, Harron, and Jones), but the Court will not order the United States Marshals Service to serve any such subpoena(s) unless Plaintiff returns them to the Clerk's Office along w ith a payment covering the $40 single-day attendance fee and the single-day travel expenses estimated by the Clerk's Office for each returned subpoena. In the event Plaintiff returns a subpoena with the appropriate payment to the Clerk� 39;s Office, the Clerk's Office shall refer the matter to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for further action to attempt to minimize the accrual of service fees of the United States Marshals Service that, although not due in advance from Plaintiff, will become subject to taxation as costs.(Taylor, Abby)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 4/6/12, that Plaintiff's Motion for Physical and Mental Examination of Persons (Docket Entry 22 ) is DENIED. (Law, Trina)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LINDSAY v. LEWIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT C. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL HARRON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVIN KELLER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK JAVON LINDSAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?