THOMPKINS et al v. KEY HEALTH MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, INC.

Plaintiff: LISA GAIL THOMPKINS and HARVEY SANFORD BOONE, III
Defendant: KEY HEALTH MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00613
Filed: June 20, 2012
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: NCMD Office
County: Guilford
Presiding Judge: UNASSIGNED
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 8/20/2015 adopting the Magistrate Judge's Order and Recommendation [Doc. # 70 ]; that the stay of this matter is LIFTED, that the Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification [Doc. # 23 ] is DENIED without prejudice, and that the Plaintiffs' Motion for Oral Argument [Doc. # 61 ] is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER that the parties are to file a proposed discovery plan on or before September 17, 2015. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 24, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 6/24/2015 adopting in part MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER, AND RECOMMENDATION 64 ; that the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. # 21 ] is DENIED. FURTHER that Defendant's Request for Jud icial Notice [Doc. # 28 ] is GRANTED, that Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice and for Leave to Submit New Evidence in Support of the Motion for Class Certification [Doc. # 52 ] is GRANTED, and that Defendant's Motion to S trike Plaintiffs' Disclosure of New Matters [Doc. # 54 ] is DENIED. FURTHER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification [Doc. # 23 ] and the decision to stay all proceedings in this matter are RESUBMITTED to the Ma gistrate Judge for further consideration. FURTHER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Oral Argument on Class Certification [Doc. # 61 ] is also RESUBMITTED to the Magistrate Judge for further consideration should the Magistrate Judge consider it necessary. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 23, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER, AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 3/23/2015; that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. # 21 ] be denied. ORDERED that Defendant's Request for Jud icial Notice [Doc. # 28 ] is GRANTED to the extent the Court has considered the information submitted, although that submission does not affect the determination of the Motion to Dismiss. FURTHER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Class C ertification [Doc. # 23 ] is STAYED, and all further proceedings in this matter are STAYED pending final adjudication of the class action in Washington v. Key Health Medical Solutions, Inc., Case No.: BC473716 (Los Angeles, CA Superior Ct.), unless Plaintiffs submit a motion to proceed with discovery only as to the named Plaintiffs while the California Action remains pending. FURTHER that Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice and for Leave to Submit New Evidence in Su pport of Motion for Class Certification [Doc. # 52 ] is GRANTED to the extent that the Court has considered the information submitted, and as such, Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' "Disclosure of New Matters" [Doc. # 54 ] is DENIED. FURTHER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Oral Argument on Class Certification [Doc. # 61 ] is DENIED as moot in light of the stay of these proceedings. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMPKINS et al v. KEY HEALTH MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA GAIL THOMPKINS
Represented By: FREDERICK L. BERRY
Represented By: JOHN F. BLOSS, SR.
Represented By: DAVID H. IDOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARVEY SANFORD BOONE, III
Represented By: FREDERICK L. BERRY
Represented By: JOHN F. BLOSS, SR.
Represented By: DAVID H. IDOL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEY HEALTH MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: REBECCA KINLEIN LINDAHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?