RF MICRO DEVICES, INC. v. XIANG et al

Defendant: JIMMY S. XIANG, XIAOHANG DU, FENG WANG and VANCHIP TECHNOLOGIES LTD.
Plaintiff: RF MICRO DEVICES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00967
Filed: August 24, 2012
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: NCMD Office
County: Guilford
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L. OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2016 214 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 07/14/2016. For the reasons set forth herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 194 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DEN IED in PART and that Summary Judgment will be entered against Defendant Jimmy S. Xiang as to Plaintiff's causes of action for Breach of Contract and Unfair and Deceptive Trade Practices under N.C. Gen. Stat. § 75-1.1, as they relate to Defendant's actions involving Document Two as set out in Defendant Xiang's guilty plea in the parallel criminal case. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is otherwise DENIED.(Taylor, Abby)
June 9, 2016 212 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 06/09/2016. For the reasons stated herein, Plaintiff's Motion for Disclosure of Grand Jury Materials (Doc. 184 ) is GRANTED. (Garland, Leah)
June 8, 2016 211 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 06/08/2016. For the reasons stated herein, Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Protective Order (Doc. 189 ) is DENIED.(Taylor, Abby)
September 30, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN JR. on 09/30/2013, that for the reasons set forth herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or Stay, or for a More Definite Statement (Doc. 34 ) is DENIED.(Taylor, Abby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RF MICRO DEVICES, INC. v. XIANG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIMMY S. XIANG
Represented By: JOSEPH A. PONZI
Represented By: DAVID WILLIAM SAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XIAOHANG DU
Represented By: JOSEPH A. PONZI
Represented By: DAVID WILLIAM SAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FENG WANG
Represented By: JOSEPH A. PONZI
Represented By: DAVID WILLIAM SAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANCHIP TECHNOLOGIES LTD.
Represented By: JOSEPH A. PONZI
Represented By: DAVID WILLIAM SAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RF MICRO DEVICES, INC.
Represented By: BENJAMIN BAI
Represented By: LAURA R. HALL
Represented By: PAUL B. KELLER
Represented By: JOHN F. MORROW, JR.
Represented By: MICHAEL F. WESTFAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?