UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JOHNSON

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: TERRY S. JOHNSON
Case Number: 1:2012cv01349
Filed: December 20, 2012
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: NCMD Office
County: Alamance
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D. SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2015 180 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM Order signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/8/2015. Government's 164 motion to stay Defendant's petition for fees and costs is DENIED; Clerk's order staying consideration of bill of costs is LIFTED, Defendant's 161 motion for costs is GRANTED, and Defendant awarded $23,297.20 in costs; Defendant's 161 motion for attorney fees is DENIED.(Powell, Gloria)
August 7, 2015 159 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 08/07/2015. IT IS ORDERED that the claims of the United states be DENIED. The judgment entered for Defendant Sheriff Johnson, and the Complaint 1 be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Any request for costs must be filed within thirty (30) days. A judgment in conformance with this Order will be entered simultaneously. (Coyne, Michelle)
June 20, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TERRY S. JOHNSON and 88 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by the UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as set out herein. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 6/20/2014. (Solomon, Dianne) .
May 19, 2014 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 5/19/2014, Boney's objections 84 are overruled, and the Magistrate Judge's Amended Protective Order is affirmed.(Powell, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: SAMANTHA K. TREPEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY S. JOHNSON
Represented By: S. C. KITCHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?