DILLON v. BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: JAMES DILLON
Defendant: BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A., FOUR OAKS BANK & TRUST, GENERATIONS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION and BAY CITIES BANK
Case Number: 1:2013cv00897
Filed: October 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Randolph
Presiding Judge: L. PATRICK AULD
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D. SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 02/10/2017. The Court will impose a total sanction of $150,000 in attorney's fees and expenses. Mr. Six, Mr. Kaplan, Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP, and Darren Kaplan Law Firm, P.C. are responsible for paying this entire amount and Mr. Moore is responsible for paying up to $100,000 of this sanction as set out herein.(Taylor, Abby)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 09/30/2016, that the defendant Generations Community Federal Credit Union's motion for sanctions, (Doc. 188 ), is GRANTED. Steve Six, J. Austin Moore, Darren T . Kaplan, and the firms Stueve Siegel Hanson LLP and Darren Kaplan Law Firm, P.C. are SANCTIONED for acting vexatiously, in bad faith, and in violation of their duty of candor to the Court and will be required to pay attorney's fees incurred by Generations as a result of their misconduct. Generations and the sanctioned lawyers shall confer about the amount of attorney's fees and report jointly on that amount or, if they disagree about the amount, brief that issue in accordance with the schedule established herein on p. 58. The plaintiff James Dillon's request for attorney's fees, (Doc. 202 ), is DENIED.(Taylor, Abby)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 03/23/2016 as set out herein. ORDERED that the motion to compel arbitration by Bay Cities Bank, (Doc. 154 ), is DENIED.(Taylor, Abby)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 10/30/2015, that Dillon's Bay Cities Motion (Docket Entry 163 ) and Generations Motion (Docket Entry 161 ) are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: on or b efore November 6, 2015, with the sole exception of materials withheld on the basis of privilege as identified on the privilege logs detailed below (i) Bay Cities must produce all materials responsive to BCRFP 10; (ii) Generations mus t produce all materials responsive to GRFPs 1, 2, 5, 6, 9, 12, 13, 16, 17, 18; (iii) Generations must produce all materials on which it relies for its "third-party beneficiary" and "servicer" arguments, as specified in GRF Ps 3 and 4; and (iv) Generations must produce all materials related to arbitration responsive to GRFP 11. FURTHER that, on or before November 6, 2015, Bay Cities and Generations must each serve on Dillon a privilege log specifying any docume nts withheld on the basis of privilege, including the common interest privilege. Defendants must explicitly identify any documents withheld under the common interest privilege. Dillon may renew his challenge to Defendants' common interest privilege assertions if he has a good-faith basis for doing so after reviewing the privilege logs. (Daniel, J)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 07/07/2014, that BMO Harris's renewed motion to compel arbitration, (Doc. 102 ), is DENIED, Generations' renewed motion to dismiss, (Doc. 106 ), is DENIED, and Bay Cities' renewed motion to compel arbitration, (Doc. 123 ), is DENIED.(Taylor, Abby)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 04/23/2014 as set out herein. The Court will deny BMO Harris's motion to sever and BMO Harris's motion to transfer. The Court will grant in part and deny in par t the motions to dismiss for failure to join an indispensable party and for failure to state a claim. Specifically, the Court will deny the motions to dismiss for failure to join an indispensable party. The Court will grant the motions to dismiss M r. Dillon's usury and money had and received claims as to all defendants. The Court will deny the motions to dismiss Mr. Dillon's RICO, UDTPA, and Unjust Enrichment claims as to all defendants. Finally, the Court will grant the motions to dismiss Mr. Dillon's CFA claim as to defendants BMO Harris, Generations, and Four Oaks, and deny it as to defendant Bay Cities.(Taylor, Abby)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 03/10/2014 as set out herein. ORDERED that: 1. The motion to dismiss filed by Generations, (Doc. 14 ), is DENIED. 2. The motion to compel arbitration filed by BMO Harris, (Doc. 35 ), is DENIED. 3. The motion to compel arbitration filed by Bay Cities, (Doc. 40 ), is DENIED.(Taylor, Abby)
February 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM TO COUNSEL REGARDING MARCH 6, 2014 HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 02/28/2014 as set out herein. (Taylor, Abby)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DILLON v. BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES DILLON
Represented By: F. HILL ALLEN, IV
Represented By: JOHN AUSTIN MOORE
Represented By: NORMAN E. SIEGEL
Represented By: STEVE SIX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO HARRIS BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUR OAKS BANK & TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERATIONS FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAY CITIES BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?