BAGWELL v. DIMON et al
Plaintiff: DONALD RICHARD: BAGWELL
Defendant: JAMIE DIMON, MARIANNE A. LAKE, GRADY I. INGLE, ELIZABETH B. ELLS, JONATHAN BLAKE DAVIS, JAMES C. STANFORD, COUNTY OF, ORANGE, STATE OF, NORTH CAROLINA, BARRY JACOBS, EARL MCKEE, ALICE M. GORDON, BERNADETTE PELISSIER, RENEE PRICE, PENNY RICH, BRIAN CHARLES HIATT, HEATHER HOVANEC FORD, DAVID R. FORD, JACKSON D. WICKER, NOAH H. HUFFSTETLER, III, ROE(S) NO. 1 THROUGH 20, JANE DOES NO. 1 THROUGH NO. 49, JOHN DOES NO. 1 THROUGH NO. 49, JPMORGAN CHASE & CO. and JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2014cv00495
Filed: June 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: L. PATRICK AULD
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L. OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 12/22/2015, adopting the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation (ECF No. 117 ) and Plaintiff's Rule 59(e) Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment (ECF No 99 ) is DENIED. FURTHER that, in light of the Judgment entered by this Court against Plaintiff (ECF No. 98 ) dismissing Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, Plaintiff's motions for partial summary judgment (ECF Nos. 120 , 122 , 124 , 126 , 128 ) are DENIED as moot. (Daniel, J)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD signed on 11/17/2015, RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Rule 59(e) Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment (Docket Entry 99 ) be denied. (Daniel, J)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 5/18/2015, that Chase's Rule 12(f) Motion to Strike Plaintiff['s] Second Amended Complaint or Responsive Objections to Amendment under Rule 15(a) (ECF No. 38 ) is GRANTE D. The Motions to Dismiss filed by Chase, the Chase Attorneys, and the Trustee Defendants (ECF Nos. 36 , 40 , 31 ) are GRANTED. The Court will decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law causes of action as to these Defendants and, thus, such causes of action are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law causes of action asserted against the Orange County Defendants and State Defendants, and such causes of action are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, rendering their Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 34 , 47 ) DENIED as MOOT. Plaintiff's five Motions for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 65 , 67 , [ 69], 71 , 73 ) are DENIED as MOOT. Plaintiff's Motions for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply (ECF Nos. 87 , 90 , 91 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. As no cause of action remains, the Amended Complaint (ECF No. 8 ) is <>DISMISSED, and the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THE CASE. A judgment dismissing this action will be entered contemporaneously with this Order.(Daniel, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAGWELL v. DIMON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD RICHARD: BAGWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE DIMON
Represented By: D. MARTIN WARF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARIANNE A. LAKE
Represented By: D. MARTIN WARF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRADY I. INGLE
Represented By: JASON K. PURSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH B. ELLS
Represented By: JASON K. PURSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN BLAKE DAVIS
Represented By: JASON K. PURSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES C. STANFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF, ORANGE
Represented By: SONNY S. HAYNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF, NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRY JACOBS
Represented By: SONNY S. HAYNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EARL MCKEE
Represented By: SONNY S. HAYNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALICE M. GORDON
Represented By: SONNY S. HAYNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERNADETTE PELISSIER
Represented By: SONNY S. HAYNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENEE PRICE
Represented By: SONNY S. HAYNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNY RICH
Represented By: SONNY S. HAYNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN CHARLES HIATT
Represented By: JASON K. PURSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER HOVANEC FORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID R. FORD
Represented By: JASON K. PURSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACKSON D. WICKER
Represented By: DONALD R. POCOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOAH H. HUFFSTETLER, III
Represented By: DONALD R. POCOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROE(S) NO. 1 THROUGH 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOES NO. 1 THROUGH NO. 49
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES NO. 1 THROUGH NO. 49
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE & CO.
Represented By: D. MARTIN WARF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: D. MARTIN WARF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?