SIMMONS et al v. CORIZON HEALTH, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
GLENDA S. SIMMONS, CALVIN C. SIMMONS, BRYAN O'NEIL SIMMONS and TIFFANY SIMMONS |
Defendant: |
CORIZON HEALTH, INC., CORIZON, LLC, B. J. BARNES, GUILFORD COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, GUILFORD COUNTY and THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT EXCESS LIABILITY FUND, INC. |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00730 |
Filed: |
August 26, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina |
Office: |
NCMD Office |
County: |
Guilford |
Presiding Judge: |
L. PATRICK AULD |
Presiding Judge: |
THOMAS D. SCHROEDER |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 29, 2016 |
Filing
97
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 8/29/2016, that the Extension Motion (Docket Entry 83 ) is DENIED. (Butler, Carol)
|
October 7, 2015 |
Filing
52
MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 10/6/2015, that for the reasons stated, Plaintiffs have failed to plausibly allege a § 1983 claim against Sheriff Barnes in his official capacity. ORDERED that Defendants' motion for reconsideration (Doc. 36 ) is GRANTED and Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' § 1983 claim against Sheriff Barnes in his official capacity (Doc. 15 ) is GRANTED. (Butler, Carol)
|
August 4, 2015 |
Filing
35
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 8/4/2015. ORDERED that Corizon's motion to dismiss (Doc. 25 ) is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' negligence per se claim (Count IV); and 33 DENIED as to Plaintiffs' &# 167; 1983 claim (Count II) and request for punitive damages (Count VI). FURTHER ORDERED that Guilford Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 28 ) is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' Fourteenth Amendment claim under § 1983 against Guilford C ounty and Sheriff Barnes (Count I), Plaintiffs' State law claims against Guilford County (Counts III and V); and Plaintiffs State law claims against Sheriff Barnes (Counts III and V) to the extent those claims will be limited to recovery up to and including $25,000; and DENIED as to Plaintiffs' Eighth Amendment claims under § 1983 against Guilford County and Sheriff Barnes in his official capacity (Count I). (Butler, Carol)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: SIMMONS et al v. CORIZON HEALTH, LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: GLENDA S. SIMMONS |
Represented By: |
FRED WILLIAM DEVORE, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: CALVIN C. SIMMONS |
Represented By: |
FRED WILLIAM DEVORE, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: BRYAN O'NEIL SIMMONS |
Represented By: |
FRED WILLIAM DEVORE, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: TIFFANY SIMMONS |
Represented By: |
FRED WILLIAM DEVORE, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: CORIZON HEALTH, INC. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: CORIZON, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: B. J. BARNES |
Represented By: |
WILLIAM L. HILL |
Represented By: |
JAMES DEMAREST SECOR, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: GUILFORD COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT |
Represented By: |
WILLIAM L. HILL |
Represented By: |
JAMES DEMAREST SECOR, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: GUILFORD COUNTY |
Represented By: |
WILLIAM L. HILL |
Represented By: |
JAMES DEMAREST SECOR, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT EXCESS LIABILITY FUND, INC. |
Represented By: |
WILLIAM L. HILL |
Represented By: |
JAMES DEMAREST SECOR, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?