HARTZMAN v. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY
Plaintiff: GEORGE HARTZMAN
Defendant: WELLS FARGO & COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2014cv00808
Filed: September 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Guilford
Presiding Judge: UNASSIGNED
Presiding Judge: L. PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 07/12/2017, that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 107 ) is DENIED, that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 124 ) is GRANTED, and that th is case is DISMISSED. FURTHER that Plaintiff's Motion for a Hearing before Summary Judgment Deadline (Doc. 105 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. FURTHER that Defendant's Motion for Dismissal for Non-Compliance with Court Order (Doc. 158 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. A judgment in accordance with this Memorandum Opinion and Order will be entered contemporaneously herewith.(Taylor, Abby)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 02/17/2016. For the reasons set forth herein, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 37 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PA RT and that Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 36 ) is DISMISSED as to all claims except for his claim for retaliation under Sarbanes-Oxley, specifically as it relates to his raising of concerns regarding whether government loans were properly disclosed in Wells Fargo's SEC filings from 2008 and 2009.(Taylor, Abby)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 03/19/2015. Plaintiff has shown a basis to permit (at least in part) his proposed further amendment of his Amended Complaint, but has failed to show any basis for his Motion to Seal or his Motions to Compel. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (Docket Entry 24 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART and that, on or before April 1, 2015, Plaintiff s hall file his proposed Amended Complaint (Docket Entry 24 -1) as a Second Amended Complaint, but without the addition of John Stumpf or Robert Steel as Defendants or the inclusion of any causes of action beyond his claim of retaliation related to the Sarbanes-Oxley Act. Plaintiff's filing of a Second Amended Complaint will render moot Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry 19 ). FURTHER that, if Plaintiff timely files his Second Amended Complaint as outlined above, De fendant shall, on or before April 20, 2015, respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. FURTHER that the Clerk shall strike the unredacted version of the Sanchez Report (Docket Entry 26 ) and that Plaintiff's Motion to Seal Document (Docket Entry 22 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. FURTHER that Plaintiff's Motions to Compel (Docket Entries 31 , 32 ) are DENIED.(Taylor, Abby)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARTZMAN v. WELLS FARGO & COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE HARTZMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO & COMPANY
Represented By: ROBERT WALKER FULLER, III
Represented By: PEARLYNN G. HOUCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?