HUTTON v. LIFT-ALL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DANA LEAH PUCKETT HUTTON
Defendant: LIFT-ALL, INC., HYCO INTERNATIONAL, INC., ALTEC INDUSTRIES, INC. and HYDRA-TECH, INC.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00888
Filed: October 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Guilford
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 03/15/2018, that the Altec Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, (ECF No. 204 ), is GRANTED, and this matter is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FURTHER that the Alte c Defendants'Motion to File a Document Under Seal, (ECF No. 206 ), is GRANTED, and the unredacted version of Exhibit D to the Altec Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, (ECF No. 206 -1, 206 - 2, 206 -3, 206 -4), is and shall be permanently sealed. A redacted version of Exhibit D, (ECF No. 204 -4, 204 -5, 204 -6, 204 -7), shall be accessible to the public. A Judgment dismissing this action will be entered contemporaneously with this Memorandum Opinion and Order.(Taylor, Abby)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 06/27/2017, that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Amended Complaint (ECF No. 162 ) is DENIED, and that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Amended Complaint (ECF No. 161 ) is TERMINATED AS MOOT. (Taylor, Abby)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 06/06/2017, that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Amended Complaint After Deadline (Docket Entry 162 ) be DENIED. FURTHER that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Amended Complaint (Docket Entry 161 ) be TERMINATED AS MOOT.(Taylor, Abby)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 09/30/2016; that Hydra-Tech Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 120 ) is GRANTED, based on lack of personal jurisdiction, and they are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Garland, Leah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUTTON v. LIFT-ALL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANA LEAH PUCKETT HUTTON
Represented By: AMIEL J. ROSSABI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFT-ALL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYCO INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: MARY MARGARET DILLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYDRA-TECH, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?