STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC. v. UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR., JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, ROGER AIKEN, HANNAH D. GAGE, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR., RODNEY E. HOOD, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, HARI H. MATH, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, THERENCE O. PICKETT, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR., J. CRAIG SOUZA, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY, THOMAS W. ROSS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, CAROL L. FOLT, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, W. LOWRY CAUDILL, ALSTON GARDNER, SALLIE SHUPING-RUSSELL, JEFFERSON W. BROWN, PHILLIP L. CLAY, HAYWOOD D. COCHRANE, DONALD WILLIAMS CURTIS, CHARELS G. DUCKETT, PETER T. GRAUER, KELLY MATTHEWS HOPKINS, STEVEN LERNER, DWIGHT D. STONE, ANDREW HENRY POWELL, JAMES W. DEAN, JR. and STEPHEN M. FARMER
Case Number: 1:2014cv00954
Filed: November 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D. SCHROEDER
Presiding Judge: JOE L. WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 3/21/2016, that the motion (Docket Entry 67 ) is GRANTED. Christine Bischoff is withdrawn as counsel for Proposed Defendant-Intervenors and is discharged from any further duties or responsibilities. (Daniel, J)
March 15, 2016 Filing 67 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney CHRISTINE C. BISCHOFF by on behalf of LUIS ACOSTA, CHRISTOPHER JACKSON, RAMONIA JONES, ANGIE MILLS, KEVIN MILLS, JULIA NIEVES, LAURA ORNELAS, CECILIA POLANCE, TAMIKA WILLIAMS, STAR WINGATE-BEY. Responses due by 4/8/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(BISCHOFF, CHRISTINE)
March 15, 2016 Motion Referred: RE: 67 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney CHRISTINE C. BISCHOFF, to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Samuel-Priestley, Tina)
December 29, 2015 Filing 66 Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority re 56 Reply to Response to Motion, 50 Response in Opposition to Motion, 39 MOTION to Intervene , 40 Memorandum, by Plaintiff STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Opinion)(RULEY, DANIEL)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 10/1/2015, that (i) the Joint Motion for Partial Stay of Proceedings (ECF No. 64 ) is GRANTED, that (ii) Defendants shall produce to plaintiff by December 31, 2015 the materials in the Stipulation entered as an Order of the Court on September 8, 2015 (ECF No. 62 ) and certain other agreed upon documents relating to the University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill's admission policies from the 2013-2014 and 2014-2015 admissions cycles that are partially responsive to Plaintiff's discovery requests; (iii) all other proceedings in this case be stayed pending the Supreme Court's decision in Fisher v. University of Texas at Austin, No. 14-981, with the exception that upon motion by either party the Magistrate Judge assigned to the case may take any action deemed necessary and appropriate to enforce the parties' agreed-upon discovery; and (iv) the parties be directed to meet and confer and notify the Court in writing of their respective positions on the course of continued proceedings within 14 days following issuance of a decision by the Supreme Court in Fisher II. (Daniel, J)
September 30, 2015 Filing 64 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCUDDER, MICHAEL)
September 30, 2015 Motion Submitted: 64 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings, to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Samuel-Priestley, Tina)
September 17, 2015 Filing 63 Joint MOTION for to Discuss Case Management, Scheduling, and Related Considerations in Light of Defendants' Motion to Stay all Proceedings Status Conference by ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY. (SCUDDER, MICHAEL)
September 17, 2015 Motion Submitted: 63 Joint MOTION for Status Conference to Discuss Case Management, Scheduling, and Related Considerations in Light of Defendants' Motion to Stay all Proceedings, to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Samuel-Priestley, Tina)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 9/8/2015, that the terms of the Stipulation of the Parties is hereby entered as an Order of this Court. (Daniel, J)
September 1, 2015 Filing 61 AMENDED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 9/1/2015 as set out herein. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 1, 2015 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTINE C. BISCHOFF on behalf of Intervenor Defendants LUIS ACOSTA, CHRISTOPHER JACKSON, RAMONIA JONES, ANGIE MILLS, KEVIN MILLS, JULIA NIEVES, LAURA ORNELAS, CECILIA POLANCE, TAMIKA WILLIAMS, STAR WINGATE-BEY (BISCHOFF, CHRISTINE) (Main Document 60 replaced on 9/2/2015) (Sheets, Jamie).
August 31, 2015 Motion Referred: RE: 59 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Amended), to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Samuel-Priestley, Tina)
August 28, 2015 Filing 59 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Amended) by ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCUDDER, MICHAEL)
August 14, 2015 Filing 58 STIPULATION of Electronically Stored Information Discovery Protocol by ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY. (SCUDDER, MICHAEL)
August 13, 2015 Motions Submitted: 39 MOTION to Intervene, and 46 MOTION to Stay Proceedings, to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Samuel-Priestley, Tina)
August 12, 2015 Filing 57 NOTICE of Hearing: Master Trial Calendar: OCTOBER: Jury Trial set for 10/3/2016 at 09:30 AM in Unassigned Courtroom before UNASSIGNED Judge. Trial briefs and proposed instructions on the issues due 9/12/2016. (Samuel-Priestley, Tina)
August 7, 2015 Filing 56 REPLY, filed by Intervenor Defendants LUIS ACOSTA, CHRISTOPHER JACKSON, RAMONIA JONES, ANGIE MILLS, KEVIN MILLS, JULIA NIEVES, LAURA ORNELAS, CECILIA POLANCE, TAMIKA WILLIAMS, STAR WINGATE-BEY, to Response to 39 MOTION to Intervene filed by LUIS ACOSTA, CHRISTOPHER JACKSON, RAMONIA JONES, ANGIE MILLS, KEVIN MILLS, JULIA NIEVES, LAURA ORNELAS, CECILIA POLANCE, TAMIKA WILLIAMS, STAR WINGATE-BEY. (COLFAX, REED)
August 7, 2015 Filing 55 REPLY, filed by Defendants ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY, to Response to 46 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Oral Argument Requested) filed by ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY. (SCUDDER, MICHAEL)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 8/3/2015, granting (ECF No. 53 ) Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Briefing, and Proposed Intervenors are permitted to file a consolidated reply brief no more than fifteen pages in support of their Motion to Intervene. (Daniel, J)
July 28, 2015 Motions Submitted: 53 MOTION to Consolidate Briefing to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS- (Williamson, Wanda)
July 27, 2015 Filing 53 MOTION to Consolidate Briefing by LUIS ACOSTA, CHRISTOPHER JACKSON, RAMONIA JONES, Angie Mills, Kevin Mills, Julia Nieves, Laura Ornelas, Cecilia Polanco, Tamika Williams, Star Wingate-Bey. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(COLFAX, REED)
July 27, 2015 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.. Replies due by 8/13/2015. (RULEY, DANIEL)
July 22, 2015 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION to Intervene filed by ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JEFFERSON W. BROWN, W. LOWRY CAUDILL, PHILLIP L. CLAY, HAYWOOD D. COCHRANE, DONALD WILLIAMS CURTIS, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, CHARELS G. DUCKETT, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ALSTON GARDNER, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER T. GRAUER, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, KELLY MATTHEWS HOPKINS, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN LERNER, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, ANDREW HENRY POWELL, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, SALLIE SHUPING-RUSSELL, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, DWIGHT D. STONE, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY. Replies due by 8/10/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(BRENNAN, STEPHANIE)
July 21, 2015 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION to Intervene filed by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.. Replies due by 8/7/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Students v Harvard Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Fisher v. Texas Order)(RULEY, DANIEL)
July 9, 2015 Filing 49 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 7/9/2015. (Daniel, J)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 7/9/2015, that the motion (Docket Entry 44 ) is GRANTED. W. Ellis Boyle and Ellis Boyle Law, PLLC firm are withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiffs and are discharged from any further duties or responsibilities. (Daniel, J)
July 7, 2015 Motion Referred: RE: 45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order, to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Samuel-Priestley, Tina)
July 6, 2015 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY re 46 MOTION to Stay Proceedings In Support filed by ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(SCUDDER, MICHAEL)
July 6, 2015 Filing 46 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCUDDER, MICHAEL)
July 6, 2015 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCUDDER, MICHAEL)
July 6, 2015 Filing 44 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney WILLIAM ELLIS BOYLE by on behalf of STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BOYLE, WILLIAM)
July 6, 2015 Motion Referred: RE: 44 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - WILLIAM ELLIS BOYLE, to MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Samuel-Priestley, Tina)
July 2, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANDREW ALLEN FREEMAN on behalf of Plaintiff STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC. (FREEMAN, ANDREW)
July 2, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DANIEL ALAN M. RULEY on behalf of Plaintiff STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC. (RULEY, DANIEL)
June 30, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JACK HOLTZMAN on behalf of Intervenor Defendants LUIS ACOSTA, CHRISTOPHER JACKSON, RAMONIA JONES, Angie Mills, Kevin Mills, Julia Nieves, Laura Ornelas, Cecilia Polanco, Tamika Williams, Star Wingate-Bey (HOLTZMAN, JACK)
June 30, 2015 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM filed by Intervenor Defendants Luis Acosta, Ramonia Jones, Angie Mills, Kevin Mills, Julia Nieves, Laura Ornelas, Cecilia Polanco, Tamika Williams, Star Wingate-Bey, Intervenor Plaintiff Christopher Jackson re 39 MOTION to Intervene filed by Luis Acosta, Christopher Jackson, Ramonia Jones, Angie Mills, Kevin Mills, Julia Nieves, Laura Ornelas, Cecilia Polanco, Tamika Williams, Star Wingate-Bey. (COLFAX, REED)
June 30, 2015 Filing 39 MOTION to Intervene by Luis Acosta, Christopher Jackson, Ramonia Jones, Angie Mills, Kevin Mills, Julia Nieves, Laura Ornelas, Cecilia Polanco, Tamika Williams, Star Wingate-Bey. Responses due by 7/23/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declarations, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Answer)(COLFAX, REED)
June 30, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LAURA J. GAZTAMBIDE-ARANDES on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Luis Acosta, Ramonia Jones, Angie Mills, Kevin Mills, Julia Nieves, Laura Ornelas, Cecilia Polanco, Tamika Williams, Star Wingate-Bey, Intervenor Plaintiff Christopher Jackson (GAZTAMBIDE-ARANDES, LAURA)
June 30, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SASHA M. SAMBERG-CHAMPION on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Luis Acosta, Ramonia Jones, Angie Mills, Kevin Mills, Julia Nieves, Laura Ornelas, Cecilia Polanco, Tamika Williams, Star Wingate-Bey, Intervenor Plaintiff Christopher Jackson (SAMBERG-CHAMPION, SASHA)
June 30, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GLENN SCHLACTUS on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Luis Acosta, Ramonia Jones, Angie Mills, Kevin Mills, Julia Nieves, Laura Ornelas, Cecilia Polanco, Tamika Williams, Star Wingate-Bey, Intervenor Plaintiff Christopher Jackson (SCHLACTUS, GLENN)
June 29, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney REED N COLFAX on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Cecilia Polanco, Luis Acosta, Star Wingate-Bey, Laura Ornelas, Kevin Mills, Angie Mills, Julia Nieves, Tamika Williams, Ramonia Jones, Intervenor Plaintiff Christopher Jackson (COLFAX, REED)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 5/13/2015, that Plaintiff's Individual Rule 26(f) Report (Docket Entry 32 ) is DENIED. Defendants' Individual Rule 26(f) Report (Docket Entry 33 ) is ADOPTED with the following modifications: Initial pretrial disclosures shall be due no later than 5/20/2015. (Daniel, J)
May 14, 2015 Set Scheduling Order Deadlines. Case-Management Track: Exceptional. Discovery due by 2/15/2016. The parties agree this case is unlikely to be resolved in mediation. Plaintiffs Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 6/29/2015. Defendants Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 8/11/2015. Dispositive Motions due within 45 days of the close of discovery. The parties do no consent to the reference this case to a Magistrate Judge. ETT: 10-15 days. A jury trial has been demanded. (Daniel, J)
May 13, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER: Attorneys Thomas McCarthy and William Boyle appeared as counsel for plaintiff. Attorneys Stephanie Brennan and Michael Scudder appeared as counsel for the defendants.Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/13/2015. The Court adopts defendants Rule 26(f) Report. Written order forthcoming. (Proceedings Recorded) (Winchester, Robin)
May 12, 2015 Motions Referred: RE: 33 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual), 32 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual), to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim)
May 4, 2015 Filing 33 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). by ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY.(SCUDDER, MICHAEL)
May 4, 2015 Filing 32 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC..(BOYLE, WILLIAM)
March 25, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 5/13/2015 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
March 24, 2015 Filing 30 ANSWER to 1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY. (SCUDDER, MICHAEL)
March 20, 2015 Filing 29 STIPULATION of Dismissal of party JOINT STIPULATION BY ALL PARTIES TO DISMISS VARIOUS PATIES AND CLAIMS by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.. (BOYLE, WILLIAM) Modified on 3/23/2015 per the request of filer.(Coyne, Michelle).
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 3/20/2015, that the motion (Docket Entry 27 ) is GRANTED, and Defendants shall have up to and including 3/20/2015 to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. (Daniel, J)
March 19, 2015 Motions Referred: RE: 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Williamson, Wanda)
March 16, 2015 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JEFFERSON W. BROWN, W. LOWRY CAUDILL, PHILLIP L. CLAY, HAYWOOD D. COCHRANE, DONALD WILLIAMS CURTIS, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, CHARELS G. DUCKETT, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ALSTON GARDNER, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER T. GRAUER, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, KELLY MATTHEWS HOPKINS, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN LERNER, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, ANDREW HENRY POWELL, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, SALLIE SHUPING-RUSSELL, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, DWIGHT D. STONE, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCUDDER, MICHAEL)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 03/09/2015, that Defendants' Motion (Docket Entry 23 ) is GRANTED, and Defendants shall have up to and including March 16, 2015 to file an answer or other response to Plaintiff's complaint. (Taylor, Abby) Modified on 3/10/2015 to correct docket text (Taylor, Abby).
March 6, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARIANNE H. COMBS on behalf of Defendants ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JEFFERSON W. BROWN, W. LOWRY CAUDILL, PHILLIP L. CLAY, HAYWOOD D. COCHRANE, DONALD WILLIAMS CURTIS, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, CHARELS G. DUCKETT, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ALSTON GARDNER, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER T. GRAUER, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, KELLY MATTHEWS HOPKINS, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN LERNER, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, ANDREW HENRY POWELL, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, SALLIE SHUPING-RUSSELL, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, DWIGHT D. STONE, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY (COMBS, MARIANNE)
March 6, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL YALE SCUDDER on behalf of Defendants ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JEFFERSON W. BROWN, W. LOWRY CAUDILL, PHILLIP L. CLAY, HAYWOOD D. COCHRANE, DONALD WILLIAMS CURTIS, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, CHARELS G. DUCKETT, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ALSTON GARDNER, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER T. GRAUER, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, KELLY MATTHEWS HOPKINS, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN LERNER, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, ANDREW HENRY POWELL, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, SALLIE SHUPING-RUSSELL, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, DWIGHT D. STONE, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY (SCUDDER, MICHAEL)
March 6, 2015 Motions Referred: RE: 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Kemp, Donita)
March 4, 2015 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JEFFERSON W. BROWN, W. LOWRY CAUDILL, PHILLIP L. CLAY, HAYWOOD D. COCHRANE, DONALD WILLIAMS CURTIS, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, CHARELS G. DUCKETT, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ALSTON GARDNER, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER T. GRAUER, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, KELLY MATTHEWS HOPKINS, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN LERNER, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, ANDREW HENRY POWELL, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, SALLIE SHUPING-RUSSELL, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, DWIGHT D. STONE, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BRENNAN, STEPHANIE)
January 23, 2015 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM S. CONSOVOY on behalf of Plaintiff STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC. (CONSOVOY, WILLIAM)
January 23, 2015 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney THOMAS R. MCCARTHY on behalf of Plaintiff STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC. (MCCARTHY, THOMAS)
January 23, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN MICHAEL CONNOLLY on behalf of Plaintiff STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC. (CONNOLLY, JOHN)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 1/15/2015, that Defendants' Motion (Docket Entry 17 ) is GRANTED, and Defendants are allowed up to and including March 6, 2015, within which to serve an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. (Daniel, J)
January 13, 2015 Motions Referred: RE: 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Williamson, Wanda)
January 12, 2015 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JEFFERSON W. BROWN, W. LOWRY CAUDILL, PHILLIP L. CLAY, HAYWOOD D. COCHRANE, DONALD WILLIAMS CURTIS, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, CHARELS G. DUCKETT, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ALSTON GARDNER, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER T. GRAUER, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, KELLY MATTHEWS HOPKINS, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN LERNER, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, ANDREW HENRY POWELL, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, SALLIE SHUPING-RUSSELL, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, DWIGHT D. STONE, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY. (BRENNAN, STEPHANIE)
January 12, 2015 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN on behalf of Defendants ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JEFFERSON W. BROWN, W. LOWRY CAUDILL, PHILLIP L. CLAY, HAYWOOD D. COCHRANE, DONALD WILLIAMS CURTIS, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, CHARELS G. DUCKETT, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ALSTON GARDNER, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER T. GRAUER, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, KELLY MATTHEWS HOPKINS, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN LERNER, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, ANDREW HENRY POWELL, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, SALLIE SHUPING-RUSSELL, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, DWIGHT D. STONE, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY (BRENNAN, STEPHANIE)
January 12, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MATTHEW T. TULCHIN on behalf of Defendants ROGER AIKEN, W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR, JEFFERSON W. BROWN, W. LOWRY CAUDILL, PHILLIP L. CLAY, HAYWOOD D. COCHRANE, DONALD WILLIAMS CURTIS, JAMES W. DEAN, JR, CHARELS G. DUCKETT, STEPHEN M. FARMER, JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE, CAROL L. FOLT, H. FRANK FRAINGER, HANNAH D. GAGE, ALSTON GARDNER, ANN B. GOODNIGHT, PETER T. GRAUER, PETER D. HANS, THOMAS J. HARRELSON, HENRY W. HINTON, JAMES L. HOLMES, JR, RODNEY E. HOOD, KELLY MATTHEWS HOPKINS, W. MARTY KOTIS, III, G. LEROY LAIL, SCOTT LAMPE, STEVEN LERNER, STEVEN B. LONG, JOAN G. MACNEILL, HARI H. MATH, MARY ANN MAXWELL, W. EDWIN MCMAHAN, W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL, ANNA SPANGLER NELSON, ALEX PARKER, R. DOYLE PARRISH, JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY, THERENCE O. PICKETT, ANDREW HENRY POWELL, DAVID M. POWERS, ROBERT S. RIPPY, THOMAS W. ROSS, SALLIE SHUPING-RUSSELL, HARRY LEO SMITH, JR, J. CRAIG SOUZA, DWIGHT D. STONE, GEORGE A. SYWASSINK, RICHARD F. TAYLOR, RAIFORD TRASK, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF TRUSTEES, PHILLIP D. WALKER, LAURA I. WILEY (TULCHIN, MATTHEW)
January 12, 2015 Case Reassigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER no longer assigned to the case. (Garrett, Kim)
December 11, 2014 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.. ROGER AIKEN waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; H. FRANK FRAINGER waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; HANNAH D. GAGE waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; ANN B. GOODNIGHT waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; PETER D. HANS waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; THOMAS J. HARRELSON waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; HENRY W. HINTON waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; JAMES L. HOLMES, JR waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; RODNEY E. HOOD waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; W. MARTY KOTIS, III waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; G. LEROY LAIL waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; SCOTT LAMPE waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; STEVEN B. LONG waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; JOAN G. MACNEILL waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; HARI H. MATH waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; MARY ANN MAXWELL waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; W. EDWIN MCMAHAN waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; ANNA SPANGLER NELSON waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; ALEX PARKER waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; R. DOYLE PARRISH waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; THERENCE O. PICKETT waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; DAVID M. POWERS waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; ROBERT S. RIPPY waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; THOMAS W. ROSS waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; HARRY LEO SMITH, JR waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; J. CRAIG SOUZA waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; GEORGE A. SYWASSINK waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; RICHARD F. TAYLOR waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; RAIFORD TRASK, III waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; PHILLIP D. WALKER waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015; LAURA I. WILEY waiver sent on 11/21/2014, answer due 1/20/2015. (BOYLE, WILLIAM)
December 11, 2014 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.. JEFFERSON W. BROWN waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; W. LOWRY CAUDILL waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; PHILLIP L. CLAY waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; HAYWOOD D. COCHRANE waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; DONALD WILLIAMS CURTIS waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; JAMES W. DEAN, JR waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; CHARELS G. DUCKETT waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; STEPHEN M. FARMER waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; CAROL L. FOLT waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; ALSTON GARDNER waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; PETER T. GRAUER waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; KELLY MATTHEWS HOPKINS waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; STEVEN LERNER waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; ANDREW HENRY POWELL waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; SALLIE SHUPING-RUSSELL waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; DWIGHT D. STONE waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015; UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF TRUSTEES waiver sent on 12/1/2014, answer due 1/30/2015. (BOYLE, WILLIAM)
November 18, 2014 Filing 12 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 18, 2014 Filing 11 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 3 Summons Issued. (Attachments: # 1 Parker)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 18, 2014 Filing 10 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 3 Summons Issued. (Attachments: # 1 Powers, # 2 Duckett, # 3 Whaley, # 4 Folt, # 5 Spangler, # 6 Goodnight, # 7 Powell)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 18, 2014 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 3 Summons Issued. (Attachments: # 1 Smith, # 2 Math, # 3 Gage, # 4 Frainger, # 5 Sywassink, # 6 Lail, # 7 Stone)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 18, 2014 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 3 Summons Issued. (Attachments: # 1 Perry, # 2 MacNeill, # 3 Brown, # 4 Dean, # 5 Holmes, # 6 Souza, # 7 Hinton)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 18, 2014 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 3 Summons Issued. (Attachments: # 1 Walker, # 2 Grauer, # 3 Hans, # 4 Maxwell, # 5 Wiley, # 6 Hopkins)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 18, 2014 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 3 Summons Issued. (Attachments: # 1 Hood, # 2 Rippy, # 3 Taylor, # 4 Trask, # 5 Parrish)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 18, 2014 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 3 Summons Issued. (Attachments: # 1 Pickett, # 2 Lerner, # 3 Long, # 4 Farmer, # 5 Lampe, # 6 Shuping Russell)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 18, 2014 Filing 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 3 Summons Issued. (Attachments: # 1 UNCCH, # 2 UNCBOG, # 3 UNC, # 4 Ross)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 18, 2014 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Caudill, # 2 Summons Bissette, # 3 Summons Mitchell, # 4 Summons MacMahan)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 17, 2014 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC. (BOYLE, WILLIAM)
November 17, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-1607504.), filed by Students For Fair Admissions. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Edward Blum)(BOYLE, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC. v. UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STUDENTS FOR FAIR ADMISSIONS, INC.
Represented By: WILLIAM ELLIS BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN C. FENNEBRESQUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAN TEMPLETON PERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER AIKEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANNAH D. GAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANN B. GOODNIGHT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. FRANK FRAINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER D. HANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS J. HARRELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENRY W. HINTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES L. HOLMES, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RODNEY E. HOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. MARTY KOTIS, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. LEROY LAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT LAMPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN B. LONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOAN G. MACNEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY ANN MAXWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. EDWIN MCMAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.G. CHAMPION MITCHELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARI H. MATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANNA SPANGLER NELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. DOYLE PARRISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERENCE O. PICKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID M. POWERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT S. RIPPY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARRY LEO SMITH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. CRAIG SOUZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE A. SYWASSINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD F. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAIFORD TRASK, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP D. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAURA I. WILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS W. ROSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAROL L. FOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF TRUSTEES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. LOWRY CAUDILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALSTON GARDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SALLIE SHUPING-RUSSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON W. BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP L. CLAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAYWOOD D. COCHRANE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD WILLIAMS CURTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARELS G. DUCKETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER T. GRAUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY MATTHEWS HOPKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN LERNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DWIGHT D. STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW HENRY POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES W. DEAN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN M. FARMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?