SEAMAN V. DUKE UNIVERSITY, ET AL.

Plaintiff: DANIELLE SEAMAN
Defendant: DUKE UNIVERSITY and DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00462
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Durham
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C. EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L. WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 04/11/2018, that Plaintiff's motion (Docket Entry 210 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. As set forth above, Defendant Duke shall produce to Plaintiff, on or before April 24, 2018 an amended Rule 26(a)(1)(A)(i) list that more clearly identifies the subjects about which the listed individuals may testify if presented at trial. In all other respects, Plaintiff's motion is DENIED. (Garland, Leah)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 03/21/2018, that Plaintiff's motion (Docket Entry 198 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. As set forth above, Defendant Duke shall produc e to Plaintiff: (1) on or before April 30, 2018, any documents and ESI from the years 1993 to present responsive to the previously-agreed-to search terms for only those of the seventeen named individuals who held the office of President, Senior Vic e President for Public Affairs and Government Relations, or Chancellor for Health Affairs; and (2) on or before April 15, 2018, the total amount Analysis Group has billed in connection with this case, through the date of Dr. Cremieux's deposition, and a breakdown of the proportion of Analysis Group's bills that are attributed to Dr. Cremieux's work. (Garland, Leah)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 02/01/2018, that: 1. The plaintiff's motion for certification of a litigation class, Doc. 87 , is GRANTED, in part, and the following faculty class is certified as set out. 2. Plaintiff Dr. Danielle Seaman is appointed class representative. 3. Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP, and Elliot Morgan Parsonage, P.A., are appointed class counsel. 4. The motion is otherwise DENIED. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEAMAN V. DUKE UNIVERSITY, ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIELLE SEAMAN
Represented By: KELLY M. DERMODY
Represented By: ROBERT M. ELLIOT
Represented By: BRENDAN P. GLACKIN
Represented By: DEAN M. HARVEY
Represented By: MARTIN D. QUINONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUKE UNIVERSITY
Represented By: KELLY MARGOLIS DAGGER
Represented By: MATTHEW W. SAWCHAK
Represented By: PAUL K. SUN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: KELLY MARGOLIS DAGGER
Represented By: MATTHEW W. SAWCHAK
Represented By: PAUL K. SUN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?