CARCANO et al v. MCCRORY, et al
Plaintiff: JOAQUIN CARCANO, PAYTON GREY MCGARRY, ANGELA GILMORE, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA, H.S., KELLY TRENT and BEVERLY NEWELL
Defendant: PATRICK MCCRORY, ROY A. COOPER, III, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA and W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00236
Filed: March 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D. SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 07/22/2019, that the Supplemental Joint Motion for Entry of Consent Decree (Doc. 289 ) is GRANTED. The proposed consent decree will be entered contemporaneously with this order. (Garland, Leah)
September 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 9/30/2018. For the reasons stated herein, Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file the declaration of Ericka Myers (Doc. 236 ) is DENIED, th e motion to dismiss by the UNC Defendants (Doc. 222 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and the motion to dismiss by Intervenor-Defendants (Doc. 221 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Additional briefing as stated herein is due within 30 days of the issuance of this order.(Engle, Anita)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM OPINION, ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 08/26/2016; that Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. 21 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set out. The court reserves rulin g on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction on their Due Process claims. If Plaintiffs wish to submit additional briefing on these claims, they must do so no later than September 9, 2016. Any response briefs must be filed no later than September 23, 2016, and any reply briefs must be filed no later than October 7, 2016. (Garland, Leah)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 06/06/2016; that the proposed intervenors' motion to intervene (Doc. 33 ) is GRANTED. (Garland, Leah)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARCANO et al v. MCCRORY, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOAQUIN CARCANO
Represented By: TARA L. BORELLI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. BROOK
Represented By: ELIZABETH O. GILL
Represented By: KYLE ANTHONY PALAZZOLO
Represented By: LUKE C PLATZER
Represented By: PETER C. RENN
Represented By: PAUL M SMITH
Represented By: CHASE B. STRANGIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAYTON GREY MCGARRY
Represented By: TARA L. BORELLI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. BROOK
Represented By: ELIZABETH O. GILL
Represented By: KYLE ANTHONY PALAZZOLO
Represented By: LUKE C PLATZER
Represented By: PETER C. RENN
Represented By: PAUL M SMITH
Represented By: CHASE B. STRANGIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA GILMORE
Represented By: TARA L. BORELLI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. BROOK
Represented By: ELIZABETH O. GILL
Represented By: KYLE ANTHONY PALAZZOLO
Represented By: LUKE C PLATZER
Represented By: PETER C. RENN
Represented By: PAUL M SMITH
Represented By: CHASE B. STRANGIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: TARA L. BORELLI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. BROOK
Represented By: ELIZABETH O. GILL
Represented By: KYLE ANTHONY PALAZZOLO
Represented By: LUKE C PLATZER
Represented By: PETER C. RENN
Represented By: PAUL M SMITH
Represented By: CHASE B. STRANGIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EQUALITY NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: TARA L. BORELLI
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. BROOK
Represented By: ELIZABETH O. GILL
Represented By: KYLE ANTHONY PALAZZOLO
Represented By: PETER C. RENN
Represented By: CHASE B. STRANGIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H.S.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. BROOK
Represented By: LUKE C PLATZER
Represented By: PAUL M SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY TRENT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. BROOK
Represented By: LUKE C PLATZER
Represented By: PAUL M SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY NEWELL
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. BROOK
Represented By: LUKE C PLATZER
Represented By: PAUL M SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK MCCRORY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROY A. COOPER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. LOUIS BISSETTE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?