UNITED STATES OF AMERICA V. STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, ET AL. Featured Case

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: PATRICK MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA and UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS
Intervenor_defendant: Phil Berger and Tim Moore
Counter_claimant: PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY and STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Counter_defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Intervenor_plaintiff: STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON
Case Number: 1:2016cv00425
Filed: May 9, 2016
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: NCMD Office
County: Durham
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D. SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2017 ***Attorneys Karl S. Bowers, Jr., Robert N. Driscoll, William W. Stewart, Jr., Frank J. Gordon, B. Tyler Brooks terminated. (Daniel, J)
March 24, 2017 243 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 3/24/2017, that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Doc. 241 ) is GRANTED. (Daniel, J)
March 23, 2017 Motion Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: 241 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR KARL S. BOWERS, JR., ROBERT N. DRISCOLL, FRANK J. GORDON, B. TYLER BROOKS. (Engle, Anita)
March 22, 2017 242 MEMORANDUM filed by Counter Claimants PATRICK MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY re 241 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR KARL S. BOWERS, JR., ROBERT N. DRISCOLL, FRANK J. GORDON, B. TYLER BROOKS filed by PATRICK MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY. (STEWART, WILLIAM) Modified on 3/22/2017 to add filing party per p/c from attorney. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 22, 2017 241 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR KARL S. BOWERS, JR., ROBERT N. DRISCOLL, FRANK J. GORDON, B. TYLER BROOKS by on behalf of PATRICK MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (STEWART, WILLIAM) Modified on 3/22/2017 to add filing party per p/c from attorney. (Sheets, Jamie)
March 22, 2017 240 AMENDED DOCUMENT by NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY. Amendment to 238 Notice of Appearance Amended Certificate of Service. (VYSOTSKAYA DE BRITO, OLGA)
March 22, 2017 239 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney AMAR MAJMUNDAR on behalf of Defendant NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY (MAJMUNDAR, AMAR)
March 22, 2017 238 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney OLGA E. VYSOTSKAYA DE BRITO on behalf of Defendant NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY (VYSOTSKAYA DE BRITO, OLGA)
March 6, 2017 Motion No Longer Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (See 237 Order expanding stay). (Engle, Anita)
March 3, 2017 237 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 3/3/2017, that the unopposed motion to expand the stay to include the pending request for a preliminary injunction (Doc. 236 ) is GRANTED, and that all proceedings in this case shall be subject to the stay set forth in this court's December 16, 2016 Text Order. (Daniel, J)
March 3, 2017 Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: 236 Unopposed Motion to Expand Stay to Include the United States' Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief. (Engle, Anita)
March 2, 2017 236 MOTION to Stay Unopposed Motion to Expand Stay to Include the United States' Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Response to Motion due by 3/27/2017 (KEVENEY, SEAN)
February 23, 2017 235 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(KEVENEY, SEAN)
February 1, 2017 234 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney THOMAS C. SHANAHAN on behalf of Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (SHANAHAN, THOMAS)
January 19, 2017 233 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Counter Defendants UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. COREY L. STOUGHTON is substituted as counsel for Plaintiff, Counter Defendants. Attorney COREY L. STOUGHTON terminated. (STOUGHTON, COREY)
January 17, 2017 232 NOTICE by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (BURNHAM, JAMES)
January 17, 2017 231 NOTICE by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (GORE, JOHN)
January 17, 2017 230 NOTICE by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (FRANCISCO, NOEL)
January 6, 2017 229 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 1/6/2017, that the Consent Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED, and the Clerk of Court will remove Robert C. Stephens from the electronic distribution list. (Daniel, J)
December 30, 2016 Motion Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: 227 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ROBERT C. STEPHENS. (Engle, Anita)
December 28, 2016 228 MEMORANDUM filed by Counter Claimant PATRICK MCCRORY, Defendant PATRICK MCCRORY re 227 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ROBERT C. STEPHENS filed by PATRICK MCCRORY. (STEPHENS, ROBERT)
December 28, 2016 227 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ROBERT C. STEPHENS by on behalf of PATRICK MCCRORY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(STEPHENS, ROBERT)
December 21, 2016 226 RULE 45 MANDATE of USCA. This court's order dismissing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 45 takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. USCA Case #16-2120. (Daniel, J)
December 20, 2016 225 USCA ORDER dismissing this proceeding for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 45. USCA Case #16-2120. (Daniel, J)
December 16, 2016 TEXT ORDER by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/16/2016. Before the court are the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending the Supreme Court Decision in Gloucester Cnty. Sch. Bd. v. G.G. (Doc. 182 in 1:16CV236 and Doc. 221 in 1:16CV425). All parties agree to a stay of further proceedings pending decision by the U.S. Supreme Court, but the United States seeks a ruling on their Preliminary Injunction motion. UNC Defendants' Statement (Doc. 180 in 16cv236, Doc. 220 in 16cv425); Legislators' Statement (Doc. 181 in 16CV236, Doc. 223 in 16cv425); Carcaño Plaintiffs' Statement (Doc. 184 in 16cv236); United States' Statement (Doc. 222 in 16cv425). In the interest of judicial economy, upon the agreement of all parties, and for good cause shown, the joint request to stay is GRANTED, and all further proceedings in these cases are STAYED pending disposition of the G.G. case pending in the United States Supreme Court. With the Carcaño Plaintiffs' agreement, this stay includes further consideration of their due process claims, but the stay does not at this time include the United States' pending motion. The parties are directed to inform the court immediately upon the resolution of the G.G. case or any other development that will affect the pendency of these cases. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425 (Engle, Anita)
December 16, 2016 224 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/16/2016, that the motion of Chris Sevier and Elizabeth Ording to intervene (Doc. 130 ) is DENIED. (Daniel, J)
December 16, 2016 TEXT ORDER by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 12/16/2016. On July 25, 2016, the Court consolidated cases 1:16CV236, 1:16CV425, 1:16CV844 and 1:16CV845 for discovery purposes only. Subsequent to this consolidation, Plaintiffs voluntarily dismissed case 1:16CV844 on July 28, 2016 (Doc. 33) and 1:16CV845 on August 31, 2016 (Doc. 63). However, parties continue to file documents in these closed cases. Therefore, parties are directed that any future filings must be filed in the appropriate case to which it relates and parties should refrain from electing the option to "spread" the docket entry to any unrelated or closed cases. IT IS SO ORDERED. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv844, 1:16cv845 (Engle, Anita)
November 22, 2016 Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: JOINT MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE SUPREME COURTS DECISION IN GLOUCESTER CNTY. SCH. BD. v. G.G. ( 182 in 1:16cv236 and 221 in 1:16cv425) Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425(Engle, Anita)
November 21, 2016 223 STATEMENT re 217 Order,,,, Position Statement by Counter Claimants PHIL BERGER, PATRICK MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Intervenor Defendants PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE, Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (STEWART, WILLIAM)
November 21, 2016 222 STATEMENT REGARDING THE UNITED STATES' PENDING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (VAUGHAN, ARIA)
November 21, 2016 221 Featured Case JOINT MOTIONTO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING THE SUPREME COURTS DECISION IN GLOUCESTER CNTY. SCH. BD. v. G.G. by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (VAUGHAN, ARIA)
November 21, 2016 220 STATEMENT re (177 in 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP) Order,,,, Position Statement by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, MARGARET SPELLINGS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP(FRANCISCO, NOEL)
November 17, 2016 Motions No Longer Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION to Dismiss( 89 in 1:16CV236 and 98 in 1:16CV425) stayed per Order dated 11/15/2016 ( 177 in 1:16CV236 and 217 in 1:16CV425). Associated Cases: 1:16CV236, 1:16CV425 (Engle, Anita)
November 16, 2016 219 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEPHEN S. SCHWARTZ on behalf of Counter Claimants PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE, PHILLIP BERGER, TIM MOORE, Intervenor Defendants PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE, PHILLIP BERGER, TIM MOORE Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP(SCHWARTZ, STEPHEN)
November 15, 2016 218 Transcript of the Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/14/2016, before Judge Joi E. Peake. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. <P>NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.</P> Redaction Request due 12/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana)
November 15, 2016 217 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 11/15/2016; that trial is continued for 90 days and all pending discovery deadlines are extended for 90 days. Discovery is stayed for 90 days, and any pending discovery and pre-trial matters are stayed. On or before February 13, 2017, the parties shall file status updates and position statements, jointly if possible, re: scheduling and discovery issues as set forth. A further status and scheduling conference will be set as appropriate thereafter. The parties in 1:16CV425 shall file additional position statements as set forth on or before Monday, November 21, 2016. The parties in 1:16CV236 shall file additional position statements as set forth on or before Monday, November 21, 2016. ACLU Plaintiffs' Oral Motion to file a Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED. ACLU Plaintiffs shall file the Third Amended Complaint on or before November 21, 2016. Any responsive pleadings shall not be due until after the 90-day stay of discovery has lifted. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP(Garland, Leah)
November 14, 2016 216 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, to Response to 204 MOTION to Quash and Modify Defendants Subpoenas Duces Tecum MOTION for Protective Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(VAUGHAN, ARIA)
November 14, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE: Telephone Conference held on 11/14/2016. Participating in the Telephone Conference were: Attorney Scott Wilkens for Carcaño Plaintiffs, Attorney Corey Stoughton for Plaintiff United States, Attorney Kyle Duncan for Legislative Intervenors, Attorney Butch Bowers for State Defendants, and Attorney John Gore for UNC Defendants. In light of the United States Supreme Court granting cert in Gloucester County School Board v. G.G., the Court has extended the Trial date for ninety (90) days, extended the Discovery deadlines for ninety (90) days, and stayed Discovery for ninety (90) days; parties instructed to file position statements no later than Monday, November 21, 2016, as to the Motions for Preliminary Injunction; parties further instructed to file position statements no later than Monday, February 13, 2017, as to discovery and scheduling; Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit) Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425(Kemp, Donita)
November 14, 2016 215 MOTION to Quash Witness D.B.'s motion to join US motion to partially quash and modify defendants' subpoenas duces tecum and for protective order by D.B.. Responses due by 12/8/2016 (MORGAN, J.)
November 14, 2016 214 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney J. GRIFFIN MORGAN on behalf of Witness D.B. (MORGAN, J.)
November 10, 2016 Set Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 11/14/2016 10:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP(Powell, Gloria)
November 10, 2016 TEXT ORDER Per MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 11/10/2016. In light of the 213 Joint Request, this case will be set for a telephone scheduling conference on Monday, November 14, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. The parties should coordinate with the Clerk's Office to set up the call. The Court will also continue the hearing presently set for Friday, November 18, 2016, given the positions of the parties set out in the Joint Request, and the Court will address that further at the scheduling conference on Monday, November 14. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP(Powell, Gloria)
November 10, 2016 213 NOTICE by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE Joint Request for Telephonic Conference (DUNCAN, STUART)
November 8, 2016 Envelope Containing 202 Order addressed to ELIZABETH ORDING 219 S. LIMESTONE, LEXINGTON, KY 40508 returned to court by postal service, marked undeliverable because Envelope marked "Return to Sender, Insufficient Address, Unable to Forward". (Garland, Leah)
November 1, 2016 212 RESPONSE in Opposition MOTION to Quash and MOTION for Protective Order filed by PHIL BERGER, PATRICK MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. Replies due by 11/18/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Initial Disclosures (236), # 2 Exhibit B - Initial Disclosures (425))(STEWART, WILLIAM) Modified document title on 11/2/2016. (Daniel, J)
October 24, 2016 211 MOTION to Adopt (204 in 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 204 in 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP) MOTION to Quash and Modify Defendants Subpoenas Duces Tecum MOTION for Protective Order by Stephanie Paige Dula. Responses due by 11/17/2016 Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(SUSSMAN, JACOB)
October 24, 2016 210 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JACOB H. SUSSMAN on behalf of Witness Stephanie Paige Dula (SUSSMAN, JACOB)
October 21, 2016 209 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CURT C. HARTMAN on behalf of Intervenor Defendants PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE (HARTMAN, CURT)
October 21, 2016 Envelope Containing 199 Order addressed to ELIZABETH ORDING 219 S. LIMESTONE, LEXINGTON, KY 40508 returned to court by postal service, marked "Return to Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable to Forward". (Garland, Leah)
October 20, 2016 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: Joint MOTION for Protective Order re: Legislative Privilege ( 153 in 1:16cv236 and 183 in 1:16cv425). Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425(Engle, Anita)
October 19, 2016 208 REPLY, filed by Intervenor Defendants PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE, Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, to Response to 183 Joint MOTION for Protective Order re: Legislative Privilege filed by PHIL BERGER, PATRICK MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(DUNCAN, STUART)
October 18, 2016 207 MOTION of Non-Party Witnesses to Join United States' Motion to Partially Quash and Modify Defendants' Subpoenas Duces Tecum and for a Protective Order by A. N., Alaina Kupec, A. T.. Responses due by 11/14/2016 Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(PFEIFFER, SONYA) Modified on 10/19/2016 to remove duplicate text. (Garland, Leah)
October 18, 2016 206 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SONYA PFEIFFER on behalf of Witnesses A. N., A. T., Alaina Kupep. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(PFEIFFER, SONYA)
October 18, 2016 205 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 204 MOTION to Quash and Modify Defendants Subpoenas Duces Tecum MOTION for Protective Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(, TARYN)
October 18, 2016 204 MOTION to Quash and Modify Defendants Subpoenas Duces Tecum ( Responses due by 11/1/2016), MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(, TARYN)
October 14, 2016 203 Transcript of Status Conference held on 09/30/2016, before Judge Joi E. Peake. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Nesbit, Briana)
October 13, 2016 202 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 10/13/2016; that the Motion for Extension of Time is hereby GRANTED. State Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants shall file their reply brief on or before Wednesday, October 19, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah)
October 13, 2016 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply ISO Motion for Protective Order based on Legislative Privilege ( 163 in 1:16cv236 and 200 in 1:16cv425) Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425(Engle, Anita)
October 12, 2016 201 Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority Hively v. Ivy Tech Community College by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (MONAHAN, CAMILLE)
October 12, 2016 200 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ISO Motion for Protective Order based on Legislative Privilege by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MCDOWELL, LEAH)
October 11, 2016 Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/18/2016 01:00 PM. (See 199 Order) Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah)
October 11, 2016 199 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 10/11/2016; that the Court adopts the Parties' Joint Proposal Regarding Deposition Limits [Doc. # 157 in 1:16CV236 and Doc. # 195 in 1:16CV425] in full, and the most recent Scheduling Order [Doc. # 147 in 1:16CV236 and Doc. # 178 in 1:16CV425] is modified accordingly. Any other time limits for particular depositions may be stipulated by the Parties or requested in a separate Motion for a Protective Order. FURTHER that the Hearing and Status Conference previously set for October 28, 2016 shall be rescheduled for November 18, 2016, at 1 p.m. The Parties are instructed to follow the briefing schedule set out above for any discovery disputes surrounding Plaintiffs' or Plaintiffs' witnesses' medical records, and the most recent Scheduling Order [Doc. # 147 in 1:16CV236 and Doc. # 178 in 1:16CV425] is modified accordingly. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah)
October 11, 2016 Reset Reply Deadline re 183 Joint MOTION for Protective Order re: Legislative Privilege: Replies due by 10/14/2016 pursuant to Scheduling Order filed 9/20/2016 (pleading 178 ). (Sheets, Jamie)
October 11, 2016 ***FILED IN ERROR*** Reset Motion Reply Deadline re 183 Joint MOTION for Protective Order re: Legislative Privilege: Replies due by 10/24/2016. (Sheets, Jamie) Modified on 10/11/2016 to mark filed in error. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 7, 2016 198 RESPONSE in Opposition re 183 Joint MOTION for Protective Order re: Legislative Privilege filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 10/14/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(CARNEY, CHRISTOPHER)
October 7, 2016 197 Transcript of Status Conference held on 09/16/2016, before Magistrate Judge Joi E. Peake. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. <P>NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.</P> Redaction Request due 10/31/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2017. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana)
October 7, 2016 Envelope Containing 166 Order addressed to ELIZABETH ORDING 219 S. LIMESTONE, LEXINGTON, KY 40508 returned to court by postal service, marked undeliverable because Envelope marked "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as addressed, Unable to Forward". (Garland, Leah)
October 6, 2016 196 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 76 Memorandum,,, Notice of Change in Factual Circumstances and Supplemental Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(PHOENIX, CANDYCE)
October 2, 2016 CASE REFERRED to Judge MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: Joint Notice of Proposal Regarding Deposition Limits ( 157 in 1:16cv236 and 195 in 1:16cv425) Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425(Engle, Anita)
September 30, 2016 195 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Joint Notice on Proposal Regarding Deposition Limits (PHOENIX, CANDYCE)
September 30, 2016 194 Brief by PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, BY AND THROUGH GOVERNOR MATTHEW G. BEVIN, U re 193 Order on Motion for Leave to File Brief of Texas, Arkansas, Arizona, West Virginia, Alabama, Wisconsin, Georgia, Nebraska, Louisiana, South Carolina, Commonwealth of Kentucky, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, Utah, and Governor Phil Bryant of the State of Mississippi as Amici Curiae in Opposition to United States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (NIMOCKS, DAVID) Modified on 10/2/2016 to correct document type. (Engle, Anita)
September 30, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE in WS-3: Telephone Conference held on 9/30/2016. Participating in the Telephone Conference were: Attorney Wilkens for Carcaño Plaintiffs, Attorney Stoughton for Plaintiff United States, Attorney Duncan for Legislative Intervenors, Attorney Stewart for State Defendants, and Attorney Gore for UNC Defendants. Parties are to file a joint written proposal regarding deposition limits by the end of today. Written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425(Engle, Anita)
September 30, 2016 193 Featured Case ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 9/30/2016, that the motion (Doc. 161 ) is GRANTED and movants shall separately file the brief as Amici Curiae forthwith. (Daniel, J)
September 29, 2016 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: 137 MOTION to Correct, 130 MOTION to Intervene, 138 MOTION for ECF Filing, and 161 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae. (Engle, Anita)
September 29, 2016 192 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 186 Notice of Appearance (DE KERVOR, DYLAN)
September 29, 2016 Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit to US Court of Appeals re: 188 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case #16-2120. (Daniel, J)
September 29, 2016 CASE REFERRED to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: Notice ( 155 in 1:16cv236 and 190 in 1:16cv425) Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425 (Engle, Anita)
September 28, 2016 191 NOTICE of Docketing Appeal from USCA re: 188 Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment filed by STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON. USCA Case Mgr: Rickie Edwards; USCA Case Number 16-2120. (Daniel, J)
September 28, 2016 190 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 178 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Rule 26f (Joint),,,,,,,,,, Joint Notice of Issues (PHOENIX, CANDYCE)
September 27, 2016 189 Electronic Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 188 Notice of Appeal Without Fee Payment. (Daniel, J)
September 27, 2016 187 Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority re 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Addendum)(CARNEY, CHRISTOPHER)
September 27, 2016 186 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DYLAN N. DE KERVOR on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (DE KERVOR, DYLAN)
September 27, 2016 185 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CAMILLE A. MONAHAN on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (MONAHAN, CAMILLE)
September 26, 2016 188 NOTICE OF APPEAL Without Fee Payment by STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON as to 157 Order and 109 Memorandum Order. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope front, # 2 Envelope back)(Daniel, J)
September 26, 2016 184 MEMORANDUM filed by Intervenor Defendants PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE re 183 Joint MOTION for Protective Order re: Legislative Privilege Memo ISO filed by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE. (DUNCAN, STUART)
September 23, 2016 183 Joint MOTION for Protective Order re: Legislative Privilege by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE. Responses due by 10/7/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum ISO, # 2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D-1, # 7 Exhibit D-2, # 8 Exhibit D-3, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K)(DUNCAN, STUART)
September 21, 2016 182 SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 9/21/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP(Daniel, J)
September 21, 2016 181 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KRISTEN A. LEJNIEKS on behalf of Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (LEJNIEKS, KRISTEN)
September 20, 2016 180 STIPULATION E-Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (KISCH, LORI)
September 20, 2016 179 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. Signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 9/20/2016. (Daniel, J)
September 20, 2016 178 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 9/20/2016, that the Court adopts the Parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Doc. # 144 in 1:16CV236 and Doc. #175 in 1:16CV425) as modified herein. The Parties shall submit a Joint Notice of Issues by 9/28/2016, and this matter remains set for a telephone Status Conference on 9/30/2016 at 10:00 a.m. This case is set for a Hearing and Status Conference on 10/28/2016. The ACLU Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint (Doc. # 116 in 1:16CV236) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs may file the Second Amended Complaint, and within the time otherwise required to respond to the Second Amended Complaint, the Defendants shall file a responsive pleading. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP(Daniel, J)
September 19, 2016 Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Engle, Anita)
September 16, 2016 177 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, to Response to 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(, TARYN)
September 16, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE in WS-3: Telephone Conference held on 9/16/2016. Participating in the call were: Attorney Wilkens for Carcaño Plaintiffs, Attorney Kisch for Plaintiff United States, Attorney Duncan for Legislative Intervenors, Attorney Bowers for State Defendants, and Attorney Gore for UNC Defendants. Parties Joint Rule 26(f) Report adopted with modifications as stated from the bench. Parties are to file a Joint Notice of Issues by 9/28/2016 with respect to the Telephone Conference previously set for 9/30/2016 at 10:00 a.m. Written Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) (Engle, Anita) Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425
September 13, 2016 TEXT ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 9/13/2016. In light of the Joint Rule 26(f) Report and the Joint Notice, the Status Conference scheduled for Friday, September 16, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. will be a telephone hearing. The Parties are directed to contact the case manager to set up the call. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425 (Engle, Anita)
September 13, 2016 176 NOTICE by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE re 166 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,, Joint Notice by All Parties (DUNCAN, STUART)
September 13, 2016 Motion Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: JOINT MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order ( 145 in 1:16cv236 and 174 in 1:16cv425). Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425(Engle, Anita)
September 13, 2016 CASE REFERRED to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties ( 144 in 1:16cv236 and 175 in 1:16cv425). Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425 (Engle, Anita)
September 12, 2016 175 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (VAUGHAN, ARIA)
September 12, 2016 174 JOINT MOTIONfor Entry of Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(VAUGHAN, ARIA)
September 9, 2016 Envelope Containing (Doc. 157 ) Order - addressed to Elizabeth Ording 219 S. Limestone, Lexington, KY 40508 and returned to court by postal service, marked undeliverable because Insufficient Address - Unable to Forward. (Daniel, J)
September 9, 2016 173 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/02/2016, before Judge Joi E. Peake. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. <P>NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.</P> Redaction Request due 10/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana)
September 7, 2016 172 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER J. CARNEY on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (CARNEY, CHRISTOPHER)
September 6, 2016 170 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LEAH D. MCDOWELL on behalf of Plaintiffs PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP(MCDOWELL, LEAH)
September 6, 2016 169 RESPONSE in Opposition re 130 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. Replies due by 9/23/2016. (FRANCISCO, NOEL)
September 6, 2016 168 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ERIC S. DREIBAND on behalf of Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (DREIBAND, ERIC)
September 6, 2016 Set Hearings: Supplemental Pretrial Conference and Status Conference set for 9/16/2016 10:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah)
September 6, 2016 166 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 09/06/2016; that Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings [Doc. # 113 in 1:16CV236 and Doc. # 141 in 1:16CV425] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as set out herein and that this matter is set for a Supplemental Pretrial Conference and Status Conference on September 16, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 of the United States Courthouse in Winston-Salem, North Carolina. The parties are directed to file Rule 26(f) Reports by September 12, 2016, and to file a Joint Notice by September 13, 2016, setting out any additional issues that need to be addressed at the Status Conference. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP(Garland, Leah)
September 2, 2016 ORAL ORDER by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 9/2/2016 GRANTING 165 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney DWAYNE J. BENSING terminated. (Engle, Anita)
September 2, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE: Status Conference held on 9/2/2016 in WS-3. In attendance were: Attorney Wilkens for Carcaño Plaintiffs, Attorney Stoughton for Plaintiff United States, Attorneys Duncan and Potter for Legislative Intervenors, Attorney Bowers and Stewart for State Defendants, and Attorney Gore for UNC Defendants. As stated from the bench, 121 Motion for Extension of Time to Designate Rebuttal Expert Witnesses filed by Plaintiffs in 1:16CV236 is GRANTED, MOTION to Stay Proceedings in Light of G.G. ( 113 in 1:16CV236 and 141 in 1:16CV425) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, 165 Attorney BENSING'S Motion to Withdraw filed in 1:16CV425 is GRANTED. Parties are to submit Supplemental Rule 26(f) Reports by 9/12/2016. Status Conference set for 9/16/2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 in Winston-Salem. Written Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:16cv425, 1:16cv236 (Engle, Anita)
September 1, 2016 165 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney DWAYNE J. BENSING by on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (BENSING, DWAYNE)
September 1, 2016 CASE REFERRED to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: Joint Notice of Issues for Status Conference ( 136 in 1:16cv236 and 163 in 1:16cv425) Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425 (Engle, Anita)
September 1, 2016 164 REPLY, filed by Counter Claimants PHIL BERGER, PATRICK MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Intervenor Defendants PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE, Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, to Response to 141 MOTION to Stay Proceedings in Light of G.G. filed by PHIL BERGER, PATRICK MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. (STEWART, WILLIAM)
August 31, 2016 163 NOTICE by PHIL BERGER, PATRICK MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS re Order,,, Joint Notice of Issues for Status Conference (STEWART, WILLIAM)
August 31, 2016 162 FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP(CAMPBELL, JAMES) Modified on 9/2/2016 to reflect filed in error and terminated public access. (Daniel, J)
August 31, 2016 161 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici Curiae by Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, U. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(NIMOCKS, DAVID)
August 31, 2016 160 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID A. NIMOCKS on behalf of Amicus Parties Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, U, Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, U, Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, U, Proposed Amici Curiae - TEXAS, ARKANSAS, ARIZONA, WEST VIRGINIA, ALABAMA, WISCONSIN, GEORGIA, NEBRASKA, LOUISIANA, SOUTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF KENTUCKY, by and through Governor Matthew G. Bevin, U Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(NIMOCKS, DAVID)
August 29, 2016 159 Counterclaim ANSWER to Complaint Counterclaims of the Legislator Intervenors by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (PHOENIX, CANDYCE)
August 29, 2016 158 RESPONSE in Opposition re 130 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 9/15/2016. (VAUGHAN, ARIA)
August 26, 2016 157 Featured Case ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 8/26/2016, denying (Doc. 156 )Steven-Glenn: Johnson's Pro Se Motion for Extension of Time to file a Motion for Rehearing or Reconsideration of the Courts Memorandum Order denying his Motion to Intervene in this case. (Daniel, J)
August 26, 2016 Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: 156 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. (Engle, Anita)
August 25, 2016 Set Hearing: Status Conference set for 9/2/2016 at 10:00 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv845(Engle, Anita)
August 25, 2016 TEXT ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 8/25/2016. In light of the Joint Notice filed by the parties, the Court will not set this matter for a status conference on August 26, 2016. However, it appears that a status conference in the near future would be appropriate, in order to address any discovery and scheduling issues. Therefore, the Court will plan to conduct a discovery status conference on September 2, 2016, and given the potential issues to be addressed, the Court will conduct that status conference in person rather than by telephone hearing. Therefore, this matter will be set for a discovery status conference on September 2, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 of United States Courthouse in Winston-Salem, NC. The parties should file their Joint Notice by August 31, 2016 to outline any issues that they would seek to raise at the status conference. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv845 (Engle, Anita)
August 25, 2016 CASES REFERRED to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: Joint Notice of Issues for Status Conference ( 126 in 1:16cv236, 155 in 1:16cv425, and 59 in 1:16cv845). Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv845 (Engle, Anita)
August 24, 2016 156 MOTION by STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON for Extension of Time to file FRCiv.P Rule 59 Motion for Rehearing/Reconsideration of the Court's Memorandum Order denying Intervention. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope front, # 2 Envelope back)(Daniel, J)
August 24, 2016 155 NOTICE by PHIL BERGER, PATRICK MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS JOINT NOTICE OF ISSUES FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (STEWART, WILLIAM)
August 23, 2016 154 Counterclaim ANSWER to Complaint Counterclaims of the State of North Carolina, et al by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (PHOENIX, CANDYCE)
August 23, 2016 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: MOTION to Dismiss ( 89 in 1:16cv236 and 98 in 1:16cv425) and MOTION to Stay Proceedings in Light of G.G. (113 in 1:16cv236 and 141 in 1:16cv425) Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425 (Engle, Anita)
August 22, 2016 153 RESPONSE in Opposition re 141 MOTION to Stay Proceedings in Light of G.G. filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 9/9/2016. (NEWTON, JONATHAN)
August 22, 2016 152 NOTICE by PHIL BERGER, PATRICK MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA re 149 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , 141 MOTION to Stay Proceedings in Light of G.G. SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: PI Order - State of Texas v. USA)(STEWART, WILLIAM)
August 22, 2016 151 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID CHRISTOPHER OSBORN on behalf of Counter Claimants PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE, Intervenor Defendants PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE (OSBORN, DAVID)
August 19, 2016 150 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 08/19/16. IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Counterclaim Defendant United States Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond Nunc Pro Tunc 127 is GRANTED, and Counterclaim Defendant United States shall file the Answer as a separate pleading within seven (7) days from the date of this Order. (Garrett, Kim)
August 18, 2016 TEXT ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 8/18/2016 CANCELLING the Telephone Status Conference set for 8/19/2016 at 10:00 AM. Parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report by Wednesday, 8/24/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv845 (Engle, Anita)
August 18, 2016 CASE REFERRED to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: Joint Notice of Issues for Status Conference ( 119 in 1:16cv236), ( 56 in 1:16cv845), ( 147 in 1:16cv425). Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv845 (Engle, Anita)
August 17, 2016 149 RESPONSE in Opposition re 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PHIL BERGER, PATRICK MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. Replies due by 9/6/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Table of Contents, # 2 Exhibit A - Public Facilities Privacy and Security Act, # 3 Exhibit B - Executive Order 93 to Protect Privacy and Equality, # 4 Exhibit C - Charlotte City Council Ordinance No. 7056, # 5 Exhibit D - House Floor Session Transcript, # 6 Exhibit E - Senate Floor Session Transcript, # 7 Exhibit F - House Judiciary Committee Transcript, # 8 Exhibit G - Senate Judiciary Committee Transcript, # 9 Exhibit H - Declaration of Paul Hruz, # 10 Exhibit I - Declaration of Quentin Van Meter, # 11 Exhibit J - Declaration of Allan Josephson, # 12 Exhibit K - Declaration of Lawrence Mayer, # 13 Exhibit L - Declaration of Walt Heyer, # 14 Exhibit M - Declaration of Kenneth Lanning, # 15 Exhibit N - Declaration of Tim Hutchison, # 16 Exhibit O - Declaration of Y.K., # 17 Exhibit P - Declaration of D.H., # 18 Exhibit Q - Declaration of S.H., # 19 Exhibit R - Declaration of Robert Gallagher, # 20 Exhibit S - Declaration of S.B., # 21 Exhibit T - Declaration of R.F., # 22 Exhibit U - Chart of Term "Gender" in U.S. Code)(STEWART, WILLIAM)
August 17, 2016 148 REPLY, filed by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, to Response to 98 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit U.S. Br. in Texas v. United States)(FRANCISCO, NOEL)
August 17, 2016 TEXT ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 8/17/2016. For good cause shown, IT IS ORDERED that the motion to expedite responses to motion to stay proceedings by Defendants and Plaintiff North Carolinians for Privacy (Doc. 114 in 1:12CV236 and 142 in 1:16CV425) is hereby GRANTED; Plaintiffs' response to the motion to stay proceedings, if any, shall be filed on or before Monday, August 22, 2016; because Defendants and Plaintiff North Carolinians for Privacy have agreed to forego filing a reply in support of their stay motion, the motion will therefore be submitted to the court upon the filing of a response by Plaintiffs, assuming that a response is filed by Monday, August 22, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of Defendants State of North Carolina, Governor McCrory, and the North Carolina Department of Public Safety, and Intervenor-Defendants President Pro Tempore Phil Berger and Speaker Tim Moore for leave to submit a memorandum not to exceed 70 pages in opposition to the United States' motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Doc. 144 ) is hereby GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of Attorney Holly A. Thomas to Withdraw as attorney for Proposed Amici Curiae (Doc. 145 ) is hereby GRANTED; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that UNC Defendants unopposed motion for leave to submit a consolidated reply brief of up to 18 pages (Doc. 117 in 1:16CV236 and 146 in 1:16CV425) in support of its motions to dismiss in United States v. North Carolina (1:16CV425) and Carcao v. McCrory (1:16CV236) is hereby GRANTED. The UNC Defendants are directed to file their reply brief in both cases forthwith. Associated Cases: 1:16cv425, 1:16cv236 (Engle, Anita)
August 17, 2016 147 NOTICE by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE re 108 Rule 26f (Joint), Order on Rule 26f Report - Individual,,,,,, JOINT NOTICE OF ISSUES FOR STATUS CONFERENCE (POTTER, ROBERT)
August 17, 2016 146 MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Reply Brief by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. Responses due by 9/12/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Reply Brief, # 2 Exhibit A to Proposed Reply Brief, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(FRANCISCO, NOEL)
August 16, 2016 145 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney HOLLY A. THOMAS by on behalf of Proposed Amici Curiae - States of New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont, and the District of Columbia. (THOMAS, HOLLY)
August 16, 2016 144 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by PHIL BERGER, PATRICK MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(STEWART, WILLIAM)
August 12, 2016 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: (142 in 1:16cv425) Consent MOTION to Expedite Responses to Motion to Stay Proceedings, (114 in 1:16cv236) Consent MOTION to Expedite Responses to Motion to Stay Proceedings. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425(Engle, Anita)
August 12, 2016 143 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS re 141 MOTION to Stay Proceedings in Light of G.G. filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Gore, # 2 Order in Williams v. Guilford Tech. Cmty. Coll., # 3 Carcano Plfs' Initial Disclosures, # 4 United States' Initial Disclosures)(FRANCISCO, NOEL)
August 12, 2016 142 Consent MOTION to Expedite Responses to Motion to Stay Proceedings by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DUNCAN, STUART)
August 12, 2016 141 MOTION to Stay Proceedings in Light of G.G. by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE. Responses due by 9/6/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DUNCAN, STUART)
August 12, 2016 129 Second Supplemental Memorandum re: 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Stay of Proceedings in light of the Supreme Court's G.G. Order by Counter Claimants/ Intervenor Defendants/ Defendants PHIL BERGER, PATRICK MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Table of Contents, # 2 Exhibit A:Supreme Court Order in Gloucester Cnty. v. G.G., # 3 Exhibit B: Stay Application in Gloucester Cnty. v. G.G., # 4 Exhibit C: Response to Stay Application in Gloucester Cnty. v. G.G., # 5 Exhibit D: Reply to Stay Application in Gloucester Cnty. v. G.G., # 6 Exhibit E: Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures)(STEWART, WILLIAM) Modified document title on 8/15/2016. (Daniel, J)
August 11, 2016 140 Proposed Order re: 138 MOTION for ECF Filing. (Garland, Leah)
August 11, 2016 139 Exhibits Supporting 138 MOTION for ECF Filing, filed by CHRIS SEVIER. (Garland, Leah)
August 11, 2016 138 MOTION FOR ECF FILING, filed by CHRIS SEVIER. Responses due by 9/6/2016. (Garland, Leah)
August 11, 2016 137 MOTION to Correct the Docket, filed by CHRIS SEVIER. Responses due by 9/6/2016. (Garland, Leah)
August 11, 2016 136 DECLARATION of Goodspeed, filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs ELIZABETH ORDING, CHRIS SEVIER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (Garland, Leah)
August 11, 2016 135 DECLARATION of Quinlan, Former President of PFOX, filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs ELIZABETH ORDING, CHRIS SEVIER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits (Part One), # 2 Exhibits (Part Two)) (Garland, Leah)
August 11, 2016 134 DECLARATION of Dr. King, filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs ELIZABETH ORDING, CHRIS SEVIER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (Garland, Leah)
August 11, 2016 133 DECLARATION of Pastor Cothran, filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs ELIZABETH ORDING, CHRIS SEVIER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (Garland, Leah)
August 11, 2016 132 Additional Exhibits to 131 Memorandum. Main document is Exhibit F (Part 1). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F (Part 2), # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit K) (Garland, Leah)
August 11, 2016 131 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, filed by Intervenor Plaintiffs ELIZABETH ORDING, CHRIS SEVIER to 130 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Garland, Leah)
August 11, 2016 130 MOTION to Intervene filed by ELIZABETH ORDING, CHRIS SEVIER. Responses due by 9/6/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Intervening Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Garland, Leah) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2016: # 3 Address Label for Documents 130 - 140) (Daniel, J).
August 11, 2016 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re 98 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 8/29/2016. (VAUGHAN, ARIA)
August 10, 2016 Motion Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: 127 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. (Engle, Anita)
August 9, 2016 127 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim,,, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Supplement)(PHOENIX, CANDYCE)
August 8, 2016 126 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (CUMMINGS, TOREY)
August 5, 2016 125 MEMORANDUM Regarding Title IX by Counter Claimants PHIL BERGER, PATRICK MCCRORY, TIM MOORE, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Intervenor Defendants PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE, Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (STEWART, WILLIAM)
August 5, 2016 124 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney NARENDRA K. GHOSH on behalf of Amicus Proposed Amici Curiae - States of New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont, and the District of Columbia (GHOSH, NARENDRA)
August 4, 2016 123 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 11/14/2016 at 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Exhibit and witness lists and deposition designations shall be filed no later than October 24, 2016. Any objections thereto, as well as any counter-designations, shall be filed no later than November 2, 2016. Pre-trial briefs shall be submitted no later than November 7, 2016. No opposition briefs shall be allowed. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv845(Engle, Anita)
August 4, 2016 TEXT ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 8/4/2016. On August 3, 2016, the Supreme Court issued a stay of the Fourth Circuit's mandate in G.G. v. Gloucester County School Board, case number 16A52, which held that the U.S. Department of Education's guidance as to the interpretation of "on the basis of sex" in its regulation implementing Title IX was entitled to Auer deference. As a result of today's telephone hearing, the court directs the parties to address the following: (1) whether, and if so how, the Supreme Court's stay of the mandate in G.G. v. Gloucester County School Board affects this court, including as to the rules of law this court must apply; (2) this courts authority to grant preliminary injunctive relief, on a facial basis or otherwise, beyond the scope of the individually named Plaintiffs (both under Title IX and as a constitutional matter). Plaintiffs' briefs are due by 5:00 p.m. Monday, August 8, 2016. Defendants' responses are due by noon on Friday, August 12, 2016. Briefs are limited to 20 pages per side, and the parties are encouraged to work together. In addition, the parties are directed to meet and confer to determine if there is any value in adjusting the pretrial or trial schedule and whether or not there is agreement to participate in this district's mediation process. Parties are to report back via letter to Ms. Engle as to the results of the conference by 5:00 p.m. on August 8, 2016. SO ORDERED. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv845(Engle, Anita)
August 4, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephone Conference held on 8/4/2016. Participating in the call: Attorney Smith for Carcaño Plaintiffs, Attorney Stoughton for Plaintiff United States, Attorney Campbell for Plaintiff North Carolinians for Privacy, Attorney Duncan for Legislative Intervenors, Attorney Berwick for Defendant United States, Attorney Bowers for State Defendants, Attorney Francisco for UNC Defendants, and Attorney Smith for Proposed Amici School Administrators. Written Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv845(Engle, Anita)
August 4, 2016 122 Transcript of Preliminary Injunction held on 8/1/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number (336) 734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. <P>NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.</P> Redaction Request due 8/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana)
August 4, 2016 Telephone Conference set for 8/4/2016 at 4:00 P.M. before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv845(Engle, Anita)
August 3, 2016 121 Notice of Filing Additional Exhibits in Support of the Motion to Intervene filed by CHRIS SEVIER. (Documents received 7/27/2016) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Envelope Front and Back)(Engle, Anita) (Modified on 8/8/2016 to reflect name of document as received. To date, Motion to Intervene has not been received.) (Engle, Anita).
August 3, 2016 120 Featured Case ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 8/3/2016, that the motion (Doc. 116 ) is GRANTED and that the associated amicus curiae brief in support of the United States' motion for preliminary injunction is deemed filed as of this date. (Daniel, J)
July 29, 2016 119 Transcript of Pretrial Scheduling Conference held on 7/22/2016, before Judge Joi E. Peake. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number (336) 734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. <P>NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.</P> Redaction Request due 8/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana)
July 29, 2016 118 RESPONSE in Opposition re 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. Replies due by 8/15/2016. (FRANCISCO, NOEL)
July 28, 2016 Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: 116 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the States of New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont and the District of Columbia in Support of the United States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Engle, Anita)
July 28, 2016 117 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/28/2016, that the Court adopts the briefing schedule set out in the Joint Notice (Doc. # 112 ) in 1:16CV425, but any issues that the parties wish to raise in these cases should still be addressed in the dispositive motions and trial briefs on the schedule set out in the July 25, 2016 Scheduling Order, so that all of the relevant issues can be addressed in November after the period of expedited discovery. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP(Daniel, J)
July 27, 2016 116 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the States of New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont and the District of Columbia in Support of the United States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Proposed Amici Curiae - States of New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont, and the District of Columbia. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of the States of New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont and the District of Columbia in Support of the United States' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(THOMAS, HOLLY)
July 27, 2016 115 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney HOLLY A. THOMAS on behalf of Amicus Proposed Amici Curiae - States of New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont, and the District of Columbia (THOMAS, HOLLY)
July 27, 2016 114 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANISHA S. DASGUPTA on behalf of Amicus Proposed Amici Curiae - States of New York, Washington, California, Connecticut, Illinois, Maryland, Massachusetts, New Mexico, Oregon, and Vermont, and the District of Columbia (DASGUPTA, ANISHA)
July 27, 2016 113 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN M. GORE on behalf of Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (GORE, JOHN)
July 27, 2016 CASE REFERRED to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: 112 Joint Notice Regarding Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule. (Engle, Anita)
July 26, 2016 112 JOINT NOTICE by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE re: 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Joint Notice Regarding Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule (DUNCAN, STUART)
July 25, 2016 111 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ALYSSA C. LAREAU on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (LAREAU, ALYSSA)
July 25, 2016 110 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ARIA S. VAUGHAN on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (VAUGHAN, ARIA)
July 25, 2016 109 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 7/25/2016, that the motion to intervene by Steven-Glenn: Johnson (Doc. 34 ) is DENIED. (Daniel, J)
July 25, 2016 108 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 07/25/2016; that the Court adopts the Joint Rule 26(f) Report and the discovery schedule set forth above. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is set for telephonic conferences at 10:00 am on August 19, 2016, September 2, 2016, September 16, 2016, and September 30, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah)
July 25, 2016 107 Featured Case ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 7/25/2016, that the joint motion of Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants for extension (Doc. 97 ) is GRANTED and that Defendants and Intervenor-Defendants are relieved of their obligation to file responses to the United States' motion for preliminary injunction by July 29, 2016. By July 29, 2016, the parties are directed to submit a proposal to the United States Magistrate Judge, jointly if possible and separately if they cannot reach agreement, regarding an appropriate briefing schedule for the United States' motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. 73 ) in light of the fact that the court has advanced trial on the merits and the discovery and pre-trial briefing schedule. (Daniel, J)
July 22, 2016 106 JOINT NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re: 93 Order. (PHOENIX, CANDYCE)
July 22, 2016 Set Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/30/2016 at 10:00 AM before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv844, 1:16cv845 (Engle, Anita)
July 22, 2016 Set Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/16/2016 at 10:00 AM before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv844, 1:16cv845 (Engle, Anita)
July 22, 2016 Set Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 9/2/2016 at 10:00 AM before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv844, 1:16cv845 (Engle, Anita)
July 22, 2016 Set Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/19/2016 at 10:00 AM before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv844, 1:16cv845 (Engle, Anita)
July 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE: Pretrial Scheduling Conference held on 7/22/2016 in WS-3. Present at the conference were: Attorney Wilkins for Carcaño Plaintiffs, Attorney Stoughton for Plaintiff United States, Attorney Dalton for Plaintiff/Proposed Intervenor North Carolinians for Privacy, Attorney Duncan for Legislative Plaintiffs/Intervenors, Attorney Gardner for Defendant United States, Attorney Bowers for State Defendants, and Attorney Francisco for UNC Defendants. The Court sets Telephone Status Conferences for 8/19/2016, 9/2/2016, 9/16/2016 and 9/30/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Peake. Joint Status of Issues to be Resolved to be filed by the close of business the Wednesday before each scheduled Telephone Status Conference. If no Status Conference is necessary, Parties are to notify Case Manager. In light of Scheduling Conference, Defendant McCrory's Motion for Leave to Conduct Expedited Discovery (Doc. 52 in 1:16CV236) is moot and Motion to Intervene filed by North Carolinians for Privacy (Doc. 58 in 1:16CV425) is withdrawn. Written Order forthcoming.(Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv844, 1:16cv845 (Engle, Anita)
July 21, 2016 Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: 58 MOTION to Intervene by North Carolinians for Privacy. (Engle, Anita)
July 21, 2016 Motion Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: 104 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, (Engle, Anita)
July 21, 2016 105 REPLY, filed by Intervenor Defendant NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY, to Response to 58 MOTION to Intervene filed by NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY. (CAMPBELL, JAMES)
July 20, 2016 104 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(CUMMINGS, TOREY)
July 20, 2016 103 REPLY entitled "Verified Reply to Parties Response in Opposition to Motion to Intervene as Proposed Plaintiff by Steven-Glenn: Johnson" filed by Intervenor Plaintiff STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON, to Response to 34 MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope - Front and Back) (Sheets, Jamie)
July 19, 2016 102 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONATHAN D. NEWTON on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (NEWTON, JONATHAN)
July 19, 2016 Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: 34 MOTION to Intervene. (Engle, Anita)
July 19, 2016 101 Transcript of Telephonic status conference held on 7/13/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana Nesbit, Telephone number (336)734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. <P>NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.</P> Redaction Request due 8/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana)
July 18, 2016 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 8/4/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(CUMMINGS, TOREY)
July 18, 2016 99 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS re 98 MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. (FRANCISCO, NOEL)
July 18, 2016 98 MOTION to Dismiss by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. Responses due by 8/11/2016 (FRANCISCO, NOEL)
July 18, 2016 Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: 97 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Engle, Anita)
July 18, 2016 CASE REFERRED to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER RE: 95 Notice by United States of America of Conditional Waiver of Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Relief. (Engle, Anita)
July 18, 2016 97 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DUNCAN, STUART)
July 18, 2016 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re 95 Notice (Other) filed by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE. Replies due by 8/4/2016. (DUNCAN, STUART)
July 15, 2016 95 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Conditional Waiver of Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Relief (KISCH, LORI)
July 15, 2016 Set Rule 26(f) Report Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report (jointly or individually) due by 7/20/2016. (See 88 Order in 16CV126; 94 Order in 16CV425; 30 Order in 16CV844; 38 Order in 16CV845) Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah)
July 15, 2016 Set Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2016 at 1:00 PM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3. (See 88 Order in 16CV126; 94 Order in 16CV425; 30 Order in 16CV844; 38 Order in 16CV845) Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah)
July 15, 2016 94 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 07/15/2016; that this matter is set for an Initial Pretrial Conference on July 22, 2016, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3 of the United States Courthouse in Winston-Salem, North Carolina. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file their Rule 26(f) Report(s), whether jointly or individually, by July 20, 2016, as noted herein. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah)
July 14, 2016 Set Deadlines: Joint Notice due by 7/22/2016 no later than 5:00 PM. (See 86 Order in 16CV236, 93 Order in 16CV425, 29 Order in 16CV844, and 37 Order in 16CV845) Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah)
July 14, 2016 93 Featured Case ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 07/14/2016; Parties in case 1:16CV236 shall appear on Monday, August 1, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 of the Hiram H. Ward Federal Building, Winston-Salem, North Carolina, for a hearing on the Carcano Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. 21 in 1:16CV236) and UNC defendants' motion to stay proceedings (Doc. 38 in 1:16CV236). Counsel for United States may participate in the hearing as set out. Trial on merits, etc. in United States' action to be consolidated with hearing on United States' motion for preliminary injunction (Doc. 73 in 1:16cv425). Trial in all four HB2 cases will take place in late October or early November, 2016 depending on pretrial schedule to be determined by the Magistrate Judge as set out. Parties shall file a short joint notice identifying any agreements reached and explaining their respective positions no later than 5:00 p.m. on July 22, 2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00844-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00845-TDS-JEP (Garland, Leah) Docket entry modified on 7/19/2016. (Powell, Gloria).
July 14, 2016 TEXT ORDER by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 7/14/2016 GRANTING 71 United States' Motion for Leave to File Witness Declarations Using Witness Initials. (Engle, Anita)
July 13, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephone Conference held on 7/13/2016. Participating in the call: Attorney Smith for Carcaño Plaintiffs, Attorney Stoughton for Plaintiff United States, Attorney Campbell for Plaintiff/Proposed Intervenor North Carolinians for Privacy, Attorney Duncan for Legislative Plaintiffs/Intervenors, Attorney Berwick for Defendant United States, Attorney Bowers for State Defendants, Attorney Francisco for UNC Defendants, Attorney Boizelle for Amici 68 Companies, Attorney Sigmon for Proposed Amici School Administrators, and Proposed Pro se Intervenor Steven-Glenn: Johnson. Written Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv844, 1:16cv845 (Engle, Anita)
July 12, 2016 92 Featured Case ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 7/12/2016. Plaintiff United States' 70 Motion to Exceed Page Limit is GRANTED and the Clerk is directed to accept as filed 76 United States' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Engle, Anita)
July 12, 2016 91 Featured Case ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 7/12/2016. All responses to North Carolinians for Privacy's motion to intervene (Doc. 58) due on or before July 18, 2016. Any reply by North Carolinians for Privacy due on or before July 22, 2016. If the court were to grant the motion to intervene, it would not extend any deadlines - such that North Carolinians for Privacy's response to the United States' motion for preliminary injunction would be due July 29, 2016.(Engle, Anita)
July 12, 2016 90 Amicus Curiae BRIEF by 68 Companies Opposed to H.B. 2 and in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (LARGESS, STEPHEN)
July 12, 2016 89 Featured Case ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 7/12/2016, that the motion (Doc. 85 ) is GRANTED. The amici are directed to file the associated amicus curiae brief in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction forthwith. (Daniel, J)
July 12, 2016 Telephone Conference set for 7/13/2016 at 1:00 PM before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425, 1:16cv844, 1:16cv845(Engle, Anita)
July 11, 2016 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: 71 MOTION for Leave to File Witness Declarations Using Initials, 85 MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff, 70 MOTION to Exceed Page Limit, and 78 MOTION to Expedite the Responses to its Motion to Intervene. (Engle, Anita)
July 10, 2016 88 REPLY, filed by Intervenor Defendant NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY, to Response to 78 MOTION to Expedite the Responses to its Motion to Intervene filed by NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY. (CAMPBELL, JAMES)
July 8, 2016 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re 78 MOTION to Expedite the Responses to its Motion to Intervene filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (KEVENEY, SEAN)
July 8, 2016 86 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Amicus PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES (LARGESS, STEPHEN)
July 8, 2016 85 MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiff by PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Curiae Brief by 68 Companies in Support of Plaintiff, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(LARGESS, STEPHEN)
July 8, 2016 84 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ASHLEY S. BOIZELLE on behalf of Amicus PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES (BOIZELLE, ASHLEY)
July 8, 2016 83 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MATTHEW D. MCGILL on behalf of Amicus PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES (MCGILL, MATTHEW)
July 8, 2016 82 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney THEODORE J. BOUTROUS, JR on behalf of Amicus PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES (BOUTROUS, THEODORE)
July 8, 2016 81 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney THEODORE B. OLSON on behalf of Amicus PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES (OLSON, THEODORE)
July 8, 2016 80 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARK JAMES KLEINSCHMIDT on behalf of Amicus PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES (KLEINSCHMIDT, MARK)
July 8, 2016 79 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEPHEN LUKE LARGESS on behalf of Amicus PROPOSED AMICI CURIAE 68 COMPANIES (LARGESS, STEPHEN)
July 7, 2016 78 MOTION to Expedite the Responses to its Motion to Intervene by NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CAMPBELL, JAMES)
July 6, 2016 77 CERTIFICATE re 76 Memorandum,,, (Amended) by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (CUMMINGS, TOREY)
July 6, 2016 76 MEMORANDUM re 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Amended) by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit, # 40 Exhibit, # 41 Exhibit, # 42 Exhibit, # 43 Exhibit, # 44 Exhibit, # 45 Exhibit)(CUMMINGS, TOREY)
July 6, 2016 75 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSEPH E. LARUE on behalf of Intervenor Defendant NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY (LARUE, JOSEPH)
July 5, 2016 74 MEMORANDUM Memorandum in Support by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Exhibit, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit, # 31 Exhibit, # 32 Exhibit, # 33 Exhibit, # 34 Exhibit, # 35 Exhibit, # 36 Exhibit, # 37 Exhibit, # 38 Exhibit, # 39 Exhibit, # 40 Exhibit, # 41 Exhibit, # 42 Exhibit)(CUMMINGS, TOREY) Modified on 7/6/2016 to correct event to a memorandum (Taylor, Abby).
July 5, 2016 73 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 7/29/2016 (CUMMINGS, TOREY)
July 5, 2016 72 Memorandum in Support Witness Declarations Using Initials by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 7/29/2016 (CUMMINGS, TOREY) Modified on 7/6/2016 to correct event type (Contreras, Jamie).
July 5, 2016 71 MOTION for Leave to File Witness Declarations Using Initials by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 7/29/2016 (CUMMINGS, TOREY)
July 5, 2016 70 MOTION to Exceed Page Limit by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 7/29/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CUMMINGS, TOREY)
July 5, 2016 69 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN MATTHEW SHARP on behalf of Intervenor Defendant NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY (SHARP, JOHN)
July 1, 2016 68 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DEBORAH J. DEWART on behalf of Intervenor Defendant NORTH CAROLINIANS FOR PRIVACY (DEWART, DEBORAH)
July 1, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephone Conference held on 7/1/2016. Attorneys Christopher Brook and Jon Davidson present for Plaintiff Carcano, et al. and Attorney Corey Stoughton present for the United States. Attorney Noel Francisco present for UNC Defendants, Attorney Butch Bowers present for Defendants State of North Carolina, Governor McCrory and North Carolina Dept. of Public Safety, Attorney Kyle Duncan present for Legislative Intervenors Berger and Moore, Attorney Cynthia Robertson present for Proposed Amici School Administrators, Attorney James Campbell present for Proposed Intervenor North Carolinians for Privacy and Proposed Pro se Intervenor Steven-Glenn: Johnson present. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425(Engle, Anita)
June 30, 2016 Telephone Conference set for 7/1/2016 at 11:00 AM before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. Associated Cases: 1:16cv236, 1:16cv425(Engle, Anita)
June 30, 2016 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 7/18/2016. (RAND, RIPLEY)
June 30, 2016 66 Intervenor-Defendants' ANSWER to 2 Complaint, 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, Counterclaim by PHIL BERGER, TIM MOORE. (DUNCAN, STUART) Modified on 7/1/2016 to remove duplicate text. (Sheets, Jamie)
June 29, 2016 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Intervene filed by PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. Replies due by 7/18/2016. (STEWART, WILLIAM)
June 29, 2016 64 MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 6/29/2016. For the reasons stated herein, proposed intervenors motion to intervene (Doc. 8 ) is GRANTED. The proposed intervenors shall file their responsive pleading to the complaint forthwith and will be subject to the same schedule as the current parties to the case. (Engle, Anita)
June 29, 2016 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Intervene filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. Replies due by 7/18/2016. (FRANCISCO, NOEL)
June 28, 2016 62 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID A. CORTMAN on behalf of Intervenor Defendant North Carolinians for Privacy (CORTMAN, DAVID)
June 28, 2016 61 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JEREMY D. TEDESCO on behalf of Intervenor Defendant North Carolinians for Privacy (TEDESCO, JEREMY)
June 28, 2016 60 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONATHAN CALEB DALTON on behalf of Intervenor Defendant North Carolinians for Privacy (DALTON, JONATHAN)
June 28, 2016 59 BRIEF re 58 MOTION to Intervene . (CAMPBELL, JAMES)
June 28, 2016 58 MOTION to Intervene by North Carolinians for Privacy. Responses due by 7/22/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Answer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(CAMPBELL, JAMES)
June 28, 2016 57 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES A. CAMPBELL on behalf of Intervenor Defendant North Carolinians for Privacy (CAMPBELL, JAMES)
June 24, 2016 56 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS re 51 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Regarding Suspension of Funds filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA (FRANCISCO, NOEL)
June 24, 2016 55 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Counter Claimants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA re 52 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Stay MOTION to Expedite filed by PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (STEWART, WILLIAM)
June 24, 2016 54 Transcript of Telephone Status Conference held on 6/23/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number (336) 734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2016. (Nesbit, Briana)
June 23, 2016 53 MEMORANDUM ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 6/23/2016. For the reasons stated herein, 37 Joint Motion to enjoin automatic suspension of funds is GRANTED. The United States is hereby enjoined from enforcing the automatic suspension of VAWA funding to Defendants as stated herein. This preliminary injunction shall remain in effect until the court rules on the merits of this claim, or until further order of the court. (Engle, Anita)
June 23, 2016 52 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Responses due by 7/18/2016), MOTION to Stay ( Responses due by 7/18/2016), MOTION to Expedite () by PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (STEWART, WILLIAM)
June 23, 2016 51 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Regarding Suspension of Funds by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. Responses due by 7/18/2016 (FRANCISCO, NOEL)
June 23, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephone Conference held on 6/23/2016 on 37 United States Joint Motion to Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds. Attorney Stoughton present for the United States, Attorney Francisco present for UNC Defendants, Attorneys Bowers and Stephens present for Defendants State of North Carolina and Governor McCrory, Attorney Schaerr present for Proposed Intervenors Berger and Moore and Proposed Intervenor Steven-Glenn: Johnson present Pro se. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) (Engle, Anita)
June 23, 2016 50 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 8 MOTION to Intervene in response to June 22, 2016 telephone conference by Intervenor Defendants Phil Berger, TIM MOORE filed by Phil Berger, TIM MOORE. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Order denying motion to transfer)(SCHAERR, GENE)
June 23, 2016 49 Transcript of telephone conference/motion hearing held on 6/22/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number (336) 734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. <P>NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.</P> Redaction Request due 7/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/26/2016. (Nesbit, Briana)
June 22, 2016 Telephone Conference set for 6/23/2016 at 03:00 PM before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 37 United States Joint Motion to Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds. (Engle, Anita)
June 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephone Conference held on 6/22/2016 on 37 United States Joint Motion to Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds. Attorney Stoughton present for the United States, Attorney Francisco present for UNC Defendants, Attorney Bowers present for Defendants State of North Carolina and Governor McCrory, Attorney Duncan present for Proposed Intervenors Berger and Moore and Proposed Intervenor Steven-Glenn: Johnson appeared Pro se. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) (Engle, Anita)
June 22, 2016 Telephone Conference set for 6/22/2016 at 04:00 PM before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 37 United States Joint Motion to Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds. (Engle, Anita)
June 20, 2016 48 Supplemental Memorandum re 37 JOINT MOTIONto Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Nadine Neufville, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(STOUGHTON, COREY)
June 20, 2016 47 RESPONSE in Support re 37 JOINT MOTIONto Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds filed by PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. Replies due by 7/8/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Perry Declaration)(STEWART, WILLIAM)
June 20, 2016 46 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 37 JOINT MOTIONto Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Margaret Spellings, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Spellings Declaration - Code Section 501, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Spellings Declaration - Code Section 103, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Spellings Declaration - Public Facilities Privacy & Security Act, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Spellings Declaration - Guidance Memorandum, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Spellings Declaration - Policy Manual, # 7 Declaration of Noel Francisco, # 8 Exhibit A to Francisco Declaration - Spellings April 11 Statement, # 9 Exhibit B to Francisco Declaration - Shanahan April 13 Letter, # 10 Exhibit C to Francisco Declaration - Spellings May 9 Letter, # 11 Declaration of Sarah Smith)(FRANCISCO, NOEL)
June 19, 2016 Motions Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: 8 MOTION to Intervene. (Engle, Anita)
June 17, 2016 45 Transcript of telephone conference/motion hearing held on 6/16/2016, before Judge Thomas D. Schroeder. Court Reporter Briana L. Nesbit, Telephone number 336-734-2514. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP(Nesbit, Briana)
June 17, 2016 44 REPLY, filed by Intervenor Defendants Phil Berger, Tim Moore, to Response to 8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Phil Berger, Tim Moore. (DUNCAN, STUART)
June 16, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: Telephone Conference held on 6/16/2016 on 37 United States Joint Motion to Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds. Attorneys Corey Stoughton, Ripley Rand, Lori Kisch, Torey Cummings, Taryn Null and Dwayne Bensing present for the United States. Attorneys Noel Francisco, Carolyn Pratt and James Burnham present for UNC Defendants. Attorneys Butch Bowers, Robert Stephens, Lindsey Wakely and Jonathan Harris present for Defendants State of North Carolina and Governor McCrory and Attorney Kyle Duncan, Gene Schaerr and Robert Potter present for Proposed Intervenors Berger and Moore. Any additional briefing by Parties is due by close of business 6/20/2016. (Court Reporter Briana Nesbit.) (Engle, Anita) Modified on 6/22/2016 to reflect Intervenors are Proposed (Engle, Anita).
June 15, 2016 Telephone Conference set for 6/16/2016 at 04:30 PM before JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. (Engle, Anita)
June 15, 2016 Motion Submitted to JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: 37 JOINT MOTION to Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds. (Engle, Anita)
June 15, 2016 43 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT N. DRISCOLL on behalf of Counter Claimants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (DRISCOLL, ROBERT)
June 14, 2016 42 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GENE C. SCHAERR on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Phil Berger, Tim Moore (SCHAERR, GENE)
June 10, 2016 41 RESPONSE filed by Counter Claimants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA re 8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Phil Berger, Tim Moore filed by PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. Replies due by 6/27/2016. (STEWART, WILLIAM)
June 10, 2016 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 36 Response to Motion (KEVENEY, SEAN)
June 10, 2016 39 RESPONSE filed by Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS re 8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Phil Berger, Tim Moore filed by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. Replies due by 6/27/2016. (FRANCISCO, NOEL)
June 10, 2016 38 BRIEF re 37 JOINT MOTIONto Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds . (KEVENEY, SEAN)
June 10, 2016 37 JOINT MOTIONto Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (KEVENEY, SEAN)
June 10, 2016 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) re: 35 JOINT MOTION to Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds. The brief was filed as an attachment to the motion; no certificate of service attached to the motion or brief; and the brief is not signed. Refile the Motion and Brief as separate documents which includes a signature and certificate of service. (Daniel, J)
June 10, 2016 36 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Phil Berger, Tim Moore filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Replies due by 6/27/2016. (KEVENEY, SEAN)
June 9, 2016 35 ***FILED IN ERROR*** JOINT MOTIONto Enjoin Automatic Suspension of Funds by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support)(KEVENEY, SEAN) Modified on 6/10/2016 to reflect filed in error. (Daniel, J)
June 6, 2016 34 Verified MOTION by STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON to Intervene of Proposed Plaintiff Intervener ("Movant") Steven-Glenn: Johnson in his capacity as a North Carolinian, one of the people in his capacity as appointed TRUSTEE of the RESULTING TRUST DECLARATION AND AGREEMENT, the State of North Carolina Beneficiary. Responses due by 6/30/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Complaint)(Daniel, J)
June 2, 2016 TEXT ORDER by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 06/2/16, granting 15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and granting 22 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 7/18/2016. (Garrett, Kim)
June 2, 2016 33 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TARYN WILGUS NULL on behalf of Counter Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (WILGUS NULL, TARYN)
June 2, 2016 32 ANSWER to 2 Complaint, 1 Complaint, , ANSWER to 2 Complaint, 1 Complaint, , Counterclaim against by PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (STEWART, WILLIAM)
June 2, 2016 31 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT C. STEPHENS on behalf of Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (STEPHENS, ROBERT)
June 2, 2016 30 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KARL S. BOWERS, JR on behalf of Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (BOWERS, KARL)
June 2, 2016 29 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney FRANK J. GORDON on behalf of Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (GORDON, FRANK)
June 2, 2016 28 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRENNAN TYLER BROOKS on behalf of Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (BROOKS, BRENNAN)
June 2, 2016 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR on behalf of Defendants PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (STEWART, WILLIAM)
May 31, 2016 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GLEN D. NAGER on behalf of Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (NAGER, GLEN)
May 31, 2016 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney AMAR MAJMUNDAR on behalf of Defendant STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (MAJMUNDAR, AMAR)
May 27, 2016 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES M. BURNHAM on behalf of Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (BURNHAM, JAMES)
May 27, 2016 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney NOEL J. FRANCISCO on behalf of Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (FRANCISCO, NOEL)
May 27, 2016 Motion Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, 1 Complaint. (Engle, Anita)
May 27, 2016 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion To Answer or Otherwise Respond 2 Complaint, until 07/18/2016, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Complaint, 1 Complaint, () by STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Prop Order Extending Time)(VYSOTSKAYA DE BRITO, OLGA)
May 27, 2016 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney OLGA E. VYSOTSKAYA DE BRITO on behalf of Defendant STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA (VYSOTSKAYA DE BRITO, OLGA)
May 26, 2016 20 RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office as to Board of Governors of the University of North Carolina (c/o Thomas C. Shanahan) re: Summons/Complaint/Notice of Right to Consent served on 5/12/2016. Answer due by 6/2/2016. (Daniel, J)
May 26, 2016 19 RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office as to Department of Public Safety (c/o Deborah L. McSwain, General Counsel) re: Summons/Complaint/Notice of Right to Consent on 5/12/2016. Answer due by 6/2/2016. (Daniel, J)
May 26, 2016 18 RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office as to State of North Carolina (c/o Roy Cooper) re: Summons/Complaint/Notice of Right to Consent served on 5/12/2016. Answer due by 6/2/2016. (Daniel, J)
May 26, 2016 17 RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office as to University of North Carolina (c/o Thomas C. Shanahan, Senior Vice President and General Counsel) re: Summons/Complaint/Notice of Right to Consent served on 5/12/2016. Answer due by 6/2/2016. (Daniel, J)
May 26, 2016 16 RETURN OF SERVICE by US Marshal's Office as to Governor Pat McCrory re: Summons/Complaint/Notice of Right to Consent served on 5/12/2016. Answer due by 6/2/2016. Modified on 5/26/2016 to reflect which defendant was served. (Daniel, J)
May 25, 2016 Motion Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE RE: 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Engle, Anita)
May 25, 2016 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(PRATT, CAROLYN)
May 25, 2016 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (PRATT, CAROLYN)
May 25, 2016 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA (PRATT, CAROLYN)
May 25, 2016 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CAROLYN C. PRATT on behalf of Defendants UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (PRATT, CAROLYN)
May 17, 2016 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STUART K. DUNCAN on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Phil Berger, Tim Moore (DUNCAN, STUART)
May 17, 2016 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT D. POTTER, JR on behalf of Intervenor Defendants Phil Berger, Tim Moore (POTTER, ROBERT)
May 17, 2016 9 MEMORANDUM filed by Intervenor Defendants Phil Berger, Tim Moore re 8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Phil Berger, Tim Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(DUNCAN, STUART)
May 17, 2016 8 MOTION to Intervene by Phil Berger, Tim Moore. Responses due by 6/10/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Answer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DUNCAN, STUART)
May 13, 2016 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to All Defendants. (PHOENIX, CANDYCE)
May 13, 2016 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JON W. DAVIDSON on behalf of Plaintiffs AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTH CAROLINA, JOAQUIN CARCANO, ANGELA GILMORE, H.S., PAYTON GREY MCGARRY, BEVERLY NEWELL, KELLY TRENT Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP(DAVIDSON, JON)
May 11, 2016 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SEAN R. KEVENEY on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP, 1:16-cv-00236-TDS-JEP(KEVENEY, SEAN)
May 10, 2016 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
May 10, 2016 3 Summons Issued as to PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS. (Attachments: # 1 UNC, # 2 NC, # 3 DPS, # 4 BOG)(Coyne, Michelle)
May 10, 2016 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Related Case # 1:16-cv-236), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(PHOENIX, CANDYCE) The 1 Complaint filed on 5/9/2016 was re-filed on 5/10/2016 by counsel as Document 2 pursuant to the Notice of Corrective Action received from Clerk's Office in order to comply with Local Rule 5.3(e)(2). (Powell, Gloria).
May 9, 2016 1 COMPLAINT against PATRICK MCCRORY, NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS (Related Case # 1:16-cv-236), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PHOENIX, CANDYCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA V. STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK MCCRORY
Represented By: KARL S. BOWERS, JR.
Represented By: BRENNAN TYLER BROOKS
Represented By: FRANK J. GORDON
Represented By: ROBERT C. STEPHENS
Represented By: WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: KARL S. BOWERS, JR.
Represented By: BRENNAN TYLER BROOKS
Represented By: FRANK J. GORDON
Represented By: AMAR MAJMUNDAR
Represented By: ROBERT C. STEPHENS
Represented By: WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR.
Represented By: OLGA E. VYSOTSKAYA DE BRITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Represented By: KARL S. BOWERS, JR.
Represented By: BRENNAN TYLER BROOKS
Represented By: FRANK J. GORDON
Represented By: WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: JAMES M. BURNHAM
Represented By: NOEL J. FRANCISCO
Represented By: GLEN D. NAGER
Represented By: CAROLYN C. PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA BOARD OF GOVERNORS
Represented By: JAMES M. BURNHAM
Represented By: NOEL J. FRANCISCO
Represented By: GLEN D. NAGER
Represented By: CAROLYN C. PRATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: DWAYNE J. BENSING
Represented By: TOREY B. CUMMINGS
Represented By: JON W. DAVIDSON
Represented By: SEAN R. KEVENEY
Represented By: LORI B. KISCH
Represented By: WHITNEY PELLEGRINO
Represented By: CANDYCE PHOENIX
Represented By: RIPLEY RAND
Represented By: COREY L. STOUGHTON
Represented By: TARYN WILGUS NULL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Phil Berger
Represented By: STUART K. DUNCAN
Represented By: ROBERT D. POTTER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Tim Moore
Represented By: STUART K. DUNCAN
Represented By: ROBERT D. POTTER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: PATRICK MCCRORY
Represented By: KARL S. BOWERS, JR.
Represented By: BRENNAN TYLER BROOKS
Represented By: FRANK J. GORDON
Represented By: ROBERT C. STEPHENS
Represented By: WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Represented By: KARL S. BOWERS, JR.
Represented By: BRENNAN TYLER BROOKS
Represented By: FRANK J. GORDON
Represented By: WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: KARL S. BOWERS, JR.
Represented By: BRENNAN TYLER BROOKS
Represented By: FRANK J. GORDON
Represented By: AMAR MAJMUNDAR
Represented By: ROBERT C. STEPHENS
Represented By: WILLIAM WOODLEY STEWART, JR.
Represented By: OLGA E. VYSOTSKAYA DE BRITO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: DWAYNE J. BENSING
Represented By: TOREY B. CUMMINGS
Represented By: JON W. DAVIDSON
Represented By: SEAN R. KEVENEY
Represented By: LORI B. KISCH
Represented By: WHITNEY PELLEGRINO
Represented By: CANDYCE PHOENIX
Represented By: RIPLEY RAND
Represented By: COREY L. STOUGHTON
Represented By: TARYN WILGUS NULL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: STEVEN-GLENN: JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?