LEWIS V. MILLENNIUM SPORTS CLUB, ET AL.

Plaintiff: PAUL LEWIS
Defendant: DURHAM WELLNESS AND FITNESS, INC., PATRIK CONTEH and ROBERT J. NAUSEEF
Case Number: 1:2017cv00217
Filed: March 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Durham
Presiding Judge: UNASSIGNED
Referring Judge: JOE L. WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 04/11/2019, that the defendants motion for summary judgment, Doc. 61 , is GRANTED.(Taylor, Abby)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 02/20/2019, that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Docket Entry 61 ) be GRANTED. (Garland, Leah)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 10/10/2017, that the defendant Nauseef's motion to dismiss, Doc. 19 , is GRANTED. FURTHER that the plaintiff's motions for entry of default and for default judgment, Docs. 31 , 34 , are DENIED. The case is ready for a Rule 26(f) conference. (Taylor, Abby)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 09/15/2017. Based upon the evidence presented in this case, Plaintiff failed to properly effectuate service of process on Defendant Nause ef, therefore depriving the Court of personal jurisdiction over him. Alternatively, Plaintiff has failed to plausibly state a claim upon which relief may be granted. For such reasons, IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Defendant Nauseef's Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry 19 ) be GRANTED and Plaintiff's Motions for Entry of Default and for Default Judgment (Docket Entries 31 , 34 ) be DENIED.(Taylor, Abby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEWIS V. MILLENNIUM SPORTS CLUB, ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL LEWIS
Represented By: MARY MARCH EXUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURHAM WELLNESS AND FITNESS, INC.
Represented By: CARLOS E. MAHONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRIK CONTEH
Represented By: CARLOS E. MAHONEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT J. NAUSEEF
Represented By: DAVID O. LEWIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?