BAIYEWU v. NIELSEN et al
Plaintiff: OLUWAKAYODE JOSIAH BAIYEWU
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, MARCOS CASTELLS, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III and L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Case Number: 1:2018cv00638
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Guilford
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 09/10/2018, that the Stipulation is approved, and this action be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1). (Garland, Leah)
September 10, 2018 CASE REFERRED RE: #7 Stipulation of Dismissal, to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
September 10, 2018 Motion No Longer Submitted #5 MOTION to Remand to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Blay, Debbie)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Joint by OLUWAKAYODE JOSIAH BAIYEWU. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TARPEY, CAROLINE)
September 7, 2018 Motion Submitted: #5 MOTION to Remand to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Blay, Debbie)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM re #5 MOTION to Remand to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services by Defendants MARCOS CASTELLS, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Remand to USCIS)(BAKER, STEVEN)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services by MARCOS CASTELLS, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III. Response to Motion due by 9/6/2018 (BAKER, STEVEN)
July 20, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MARCOS CASTELLS, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III, and U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to L. Francis Cissna, #2 Summons issued to Marcos Castells, #3 Summons issued to Jefferson B. Sessions, III, #4 Summons issued to U.S. Attorney) (Garland, Leah)
July 19, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garland, Leah)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN W. ROCKERS on behalf of Plaintiff OLUWAKAYODE JOSIAH BAIYEWU (ROCKERS, JOHN)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2390913.), filed by OLUWAKAYODE JOSIAH BAIYEWU.(TARPEY, CAROLINE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAIYEWU v. NIELSEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: STEVEN N. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCOS CASTELLS
Represented By: STEVEN N. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON B. SESSIONS, III
Represented By: STEVEN N. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: STEVEN N. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLUWAKAYODE JOSIAH BAIYEWU
Represented By: CAROLINE J. TARPEY
Represented By: JOHN W. ROCKERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?