KNIGHT v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Plaintiff: DANIEL KNIGHT
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv00673
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Guilford
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Appointing GARY S. HEMRIC as the mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Gammon, Cheryl)
September 24, 2018 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER ; Mediation due by 7/25/2019. (Gammon, Cheryl)
September 24, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. (Gammon, Cheryl)
September 18, 2018 Set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery shall be placed on a case management track designated in LR 26.1 as exceptional. Discovery due by 8/15/2019. Parties agree to Gary Hemric as mediator. Mediation due by 7/25/2018. Plaintiff's Amended Pleadings due by 11/20/2018. Defendant's Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2018. Joinder of Parties for Plaintiff due by 11/30/2018. Joinder of Parties for Defendant due by 12/31/2018. The parties have not agreed to refer the case to a magistrate judge or to appoint a master. The trial of this action is expected to take approximately 5-7 days.A jury trial has been demanded. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 18, 2018 TEXT ORDER adopting #11 Joint Certification and Report of Rule 26(f) Conference and Discovery Plan with the following clarification: the deadline for Plaintiff to seek leave to amend pleadings or to add parties is 11/30/2018. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 09/18/2018. (AULD, L.)
September 18, 2018 Motions Referred: RE: #11 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY.(KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RYAN M. ARNOLD on behalf of Defendant NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (ARNOLD, RYAN)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 10/29/2018 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY served on 8/6/2018, answer due 8/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(FRANCIS, DANIEL)
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
August 3, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. Set flag for Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TIMOTHY A. SHERIFF on behalf of Plaintiff DANIEL KNIGHT (SHERIFF, TIMOTHY)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DANIEL R. FRANCIS on behalf of Plaintiff DANIEL KNIGHT (FRANCIS, DANIEL)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2399315.), filed by DANIEL KNIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(FRANCIS, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KNIGHT v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: RYAN M. ARNOLD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL KNIGHT
Represented By: DANIEL R. FRANCIS
Represented By: TIMOTHY A. SHERIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?