AHMED v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Plaintiff: MOHAMED SAMEH AHMED
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2018cv00674
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Rowan
0 Judge: L PATRICK AULD
1 Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7426
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Answer updated to 11/5/2018 for UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Daniel, J)
September 24, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond by 11/05/2018. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 09/24/2018. (AULD, L.)
September 24, 2018 Motions Referred: RE: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Sanders, Marlene)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DARDEN, ERIN)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MOHAMED SAMEH AHMED. SUMMONS/COMPLAINT served on 8/6/2018 as to Internal Revenue Service, Washington, DC; answer due 10/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 US Attorney's Office, Greensboro NC, #2 US Attorney General, #3 Interal Revenue Service Philadelphia PA) (Daniel, J)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted by MOHAMED SAMEH AHMED as to UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, 555 4th St., NW, Washington, DC 20530. (Daniel, J)
August 13, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and the United States Attorney General. (Garland, Leah)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
August 3, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. Set flag for Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Plaintiff shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 2, 2018 Receipt of Funds in the amount of $ 400.00. Receipt Number NCM042364. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by MOHAMED SAMEH AHMED.(Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AHMED v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMED SAMEH AHMED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: ERIN F. DARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?