UNBEHAGEN v. BERRYHILL

Plaintiff: KATRINA UNBEHAGEN
Defendant: NANCY BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv00704
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: NCMD Office
County: Person
0 Judge: L PATRICK AULD
1 Judge: N C TILLEY
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2018 Answer updated for NANCY BERRYHILL to 11/5/2018. Incorrect service date entered. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 13, 2018 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to NANCY BERRYHILL served on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. as to (HALL, CHARLOTTE) Modified on 9/14/2018 to edit answer deadline - incorrect service date entered. (Sheets, Jamie)
August 30, 2018 5 Notice of Right to Consent - SSA. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
August 30, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to NANCY BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 16, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 08/16/2018, that Plaintiff in the above-entitled proceeding be, and is hereby, permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant, including the correct address and the name and title of the individual to be served on behalf of a corporation, association, infant, incompetent, or government agency. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the complaint and summons upon each defendant. (Garland, Leah)
August 15, 2018 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld RE: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 15, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. Set flag for Magistrate Judge L. Patrick Auld. (Coyne, Michelle)
August 15, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by KATRINA UNBEHAGEN. (HALL, CHARLOTTE)
August 15, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY BERRYHILL, filed by KATRINA UNBEHAGEN.(HALL, CHARLOTTE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNBEHAGEN v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATRINA UNBEHAGEN
Represented By: CHARLOTTE W. HALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?