BROWN v. MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC.
Plaintiff: ETHAN C. BROWN
Defendant: MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00717
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Office: NCMD Office
County: Guilford
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: N C TILLEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Motions Referred: RE: #10 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Garrett, Kim)
October 5, 2018 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by ETHAN C. BROWN.(WALL, JONATHAN)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 10/18/2018 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, by MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC.. (HOCKADAY, JONATHAN)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC. Answer due by 9/7/2018. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 08/22/2018. (Brubaker, John)
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Complaint, by MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(HOCKADAY, JONATHAN)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
August 17, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 18CVS6506, issued 7/17/2018, listed as Exhibit A to #1 Petition for Removal) (Garland, Leah)
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC., filed by ETHAN C. BROWN. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, case number 18CVS6506, listed as Exhibit A to #1 Petition for Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Garland, Leah)
August 17, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garland, Leah)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONATHAN TRAVIS HOCKADAY on behalf of Defendant MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC. (HOCKADAY, JONATHAN)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. (HOCKADAY, JONATHAN)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Ethan C Brown ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2409229.), filed by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Removal)(HOCKADAY, JONATHAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROWN v. MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN MARIETTA MATERIALS, INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN TRAVIS HOCKADAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ETHAN C. BROWN
Represented By: JONATHAN WALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?