SALAMI v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff: M. REZA SALAMI, PH.D., M.D.
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00765
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff M. REZA SALAMI, PH.D., M.D. and Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (Daniel, J)
September 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by M. REZA SALAMI, PH.D., M.D. to 5204 HAYWARD DRIVE, GREENSBORO, NC 27406. (Daniel, J)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by M. REZA SALAMI, PH.D., M.D. to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)( i) without prejudice since Plaintiff has filed new lawsuit in the above court on 9/21/2018 with details material. Replies due by 10/15/2018. (Daniel, J)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 Corrected document re #6 Memorandum, #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Supplement Unpublished Decisions)(FARZAD, RAMONA)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 Roseboro Letter regarding Right to Respond to #5 Motion to Dismiss. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(FARZAD, RAMONA)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. Response to Motion due by 10/9/2018 (FARZAD, RAMONA)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DONALD R. POCOCK on behalf of Defendant JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (POCOCK, DONALD)
September 7, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 7, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., filed by M. REZA SALAMI, PH.D., M.D. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 18cvs7008 and is listed as exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (FARZAD, RAMONA)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2422630.), filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(FARZAD, RAMONA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALAMI v. JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: RAMONA FARZAD
Represented By: DONALD R. POCOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. REZA SALAMI, PH.D., M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?