SLOOP et al v. BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY SLOOP and TERESA SLOOP
Defendant: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00775
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC. Answer due by 11/15/2018. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 10/02/2018. (Brubaker, John)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (ESSER, WILLIAM)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 11, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. Set flag for Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TIMOTHY SLOOP, TERESA SLOOP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(EDWARDS, ASA) Modified on 9/11/2018 to reflect filing fee paid. Receipt number: 04182424281.(Butler, Carol)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ASA C. EDWARDS, IV on behalf of Plaintiffs TERESA SLOOP, TIMOTHY SLOOP (EDWARDS, ASA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SLOOP et al v. BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY SLOOP
Represented By: ASA C. EDWARDS, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA SLOOP
Represented By: ASA C. EDWARDS, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM L. ESSER, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?