SALAMI, PH.D., M.D. v. J.P. MORGAN CHASE, N.A.
Plaintiff: M. REZA SALAMI, PH.D., M.D.
Defendant: J.P. MORGAN CHASE, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00794
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 17 USMS Return Executed on 10/19/2018 as to Ms. Lorianne K. WIlliams, J.P. MORGAN CHASE, N.A. VP & Asset General Counsel for COMPLAINT, SUMMONS, NOTICE. (Daniel, J)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond to #12 MOTION to Dismiss. (Daniel, J)
November 12, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by J.P. MORGAN CHASE, N.A. re #14 Notice of Appearance (POCOCK, DONALD)
November 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DONALD R. POCOCK on behalf of Defendant J.P. MORGAN CHASE, N.A. (POCOCK, DONALD)
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant J.P. MORGAN CHASE, N.A. re #12 Corrected Document MOTION TO DISMISS filed by J.P. MORGAN CHASE, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Supplement Cited Unpublished Decisions)(FARZAD, RAMONA)
November 12, 2018 Filing 12 Corrected document re #11 MOTION to Dismiss . (FARZAD, RAMONA)
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by J.P. MORGAN CHASE, N.A.. Response to Motion due by 12/3/2018 (FARZAD, RAMONA)
November 2, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to J.P. MORGAN CHASE, N.A. served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Right to Consent. Plaintiff shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to J.P. MORGAN CHASE, N.A. (Coyne, Michelle)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 10/03/2018 that the plaintiff is permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons and complaint upon defendant. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 24, 2018 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster re: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 24, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 24, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service by M. REZA SALAMI, PH.D., M.D. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Signed Pro Se Electronic Service Consent by M. REZA SALAMI, PH.D., M.D. rezasalami2020@gmail.com (Coyne, Michelle)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against J.P. MORGAN CHASE, N.A., filed by M. REZA SALAMI, PH.D., M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by M. REZA SALAMI, PH.D., M.D.. (Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SALAMI, PH.D., M.D. v. J.P. MORGAN CHASE, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. REZA SALAMI, PH.D., M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. MORGAN CHASE, N.A.
Represented By: DONALD R. POCOCK
Represented By: RAMONA FARZAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?