EDWARDS v. PARRISH TIRE COMPANY
Plaintiff: ANGELA EDWARDS
Defendant: PARRISH TIRE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv00811
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KENNETH PAUL CARLSON, JR on behalf of Defendant PARRISH TIRE COMPANY (CARLSON, KENNETH)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PARRISH TIRE COMPANY. (STRICKLIN, JILL)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant PARRISH TIRE COMPANY re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Memoranum in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal filed by PARRISH TIRE COMPANY. (STRICKLIN, JILL)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by PARRISH TIRE COMPANY. Response to Motion due by 12/12/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights)(STRICKLIN, JILL)
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANGELA EDWARDS. PARRISH TIRE COMPANY waiver sent on 10/1/2018, answer due 11/30/2018. (JAMES, RANDOLPH)
October 4, 2018 Answer updated for PARRISH TIRE COMPANY to 10/22/2018. (Sheets, Jamie)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to PARRISH TIRE COMPANY served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (JAMES, RANDOLPH) Modified on 10/4/2018 to edit dates. (Sheets, Jamie)
September 28, 2018 Case Reassigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah)
September 27, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to PARRISH TIRE COMPANY. (Coyne, Michelle)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff ANGELA EDWARDS (JAMES, RANDOLPH)
September 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RANDOLPH M. JAMES on behalf of Plaintiff ANGELA EDWARDS (JAMES, RANDOLPH)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PARRISH TIRE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2433120.), filed by ANGELA EDWARDS.(JAMES, RANDOLPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EDWARDS v. PARRISH TIRE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA EDWARDS
Represented By: RANDOLPH M. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARRISH TIRE COMPANY
Represented By: JILL S. STRICKLIN
Represented By: KENNETH PAUL CARLSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?