MACEMORE v. ASPHALT PAVING COMPANY OF GREENSBORO
Plaintiff: MATTHEW MACEMORE
Defendant: ASPHALT PAVING COMPANY OF GREENSBORO
Case Number: 1:2018cv00830
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for ASPHALT PAVING COMPANY OF GREENSBORO. Answer due by 12/30/2018. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 11/20/2018. (Brubaker, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANDREW G. PINTO on behalf of Defendant ASPHALT PAVING COMPANY OF GREENSBORO (PINTO, ANDREW)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by ASPHALT PAVING COMPANY OF GREENSBORO. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BOWERS, DEBORAH)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DEBORAH J. BOWERS on behalf of Defendant ASPHALT PAVING COMPANY OF GREENSBORO (BOWERS, DEBORAH)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ASPHALT PAVING COMPANY OF GREENSBORO. (Coyne, Michelle)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 10/05/2018 that plaintiff is permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the complaint and summons upon the defendant(Coyne, Michelle)
October 2, 2018 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Joi Elizabeth Peake RE: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Coyne, Michelle)
October 2, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
October 2, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by MATTHEW MACEMORE. (HENSEL, CRAIG)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ASPHALT PAVING COMPANY OF GREENSBORO, filed by MATTHEW MACEMORE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HENSEL, CRAIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MACEMORE v. ASPHALT PAVING COMPANY OF GREENSBORO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASPHALT PAVING COMPANY OF GREENSBORO
Represented By: DEBORAH J. BOWERS
Represented By: ANDREW G. PINTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW MACEMORE
Represented By: CRAIG P. HENSEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?