SAWYERS v. BERRYHILL

Plaintiff: JOEL WILLIAM SAWYERS
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv00870
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
0 Judge: N C TILLEY
1 Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text/Event Modification re #9 Notice to Parties in Social Security Case : to correct image. (Butler, Carol)
December 6, 2018 9 NOTICE to Parties in Social Security Case. Plaintiff's Dispositive Motions due by 2/4/2019. Defendant's Dispositive Motions due by 4/5/2019. (Butler, Carol) (Main Document 9 replaced on 12/7/2018) (Butler, Carol).
December 4, 2018 8 SEALED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD IN SSA CASES filed by Defendant NANCY A. BERRYHILL, Plaintiff JOEL WILLIAM SAWYERS, Interested Party SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION. The record is available in paper format at the Clerk's Office. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 - Pgs 97-196, #2 Part 3 - Pgs 197-296, #3 Part 4 - Pgs 297-396, #4 Part 5 - Pgs 397-463)(DRUM, ROBERT) Modified on 12/7/2018 to reflect Transcript received in the Clerks Office on 12/6/2018. (Butler, Carol)
December 4, 2018 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (DRUM, ROBERT)
November 8, 2018 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON GOVERNMENT as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL served on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. as to (Attachments: #1 proof of service)(PATTON, AMELIA)
October 16, 2018 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
October 16, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Coyne, Michelle)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster on 10/16/2018 that the plaintiff is permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant. Plaintiff is responsible for service of the complaint and summons upon the defendant. (Coyne, Michelle)
October 15, 2018 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle)
October 15, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
October 15, 2018 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOEL WILLIAM SAWYERS.(PATTON, AMELIA)
October 15, 2018 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP () by JOEL WILLIAM SAWYERS. (PATTON, AMELIA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAWYERS v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL WILLIAM SAWYERS
Represented By: AMELIA N. PATTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Represented By: ROBERT S. DRUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?