MEBANE, ET AL. V. GKN DRIVELINE NORTH AMERICA, INC., ET AL.
Plaintiff: ANGELA WORSHAM and JAMES MEBANE
Defendant: GKN DRIVELINE NORTH AMERICA, INC. and RANDSTAD USA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00892
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Third and Final Unopposed by RANDSTAD USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MANOS, MARGARET)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by RANDSTAD USA, LLC. Answer due by 1/4/2019. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 12/21/2019 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Powell, Gloria)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant GKN DRIVELINE NORTH AMERICA, INC. re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Three, Seven, Eight, and Nine, and Portions of Count Two filed by GKN DRIVELINE NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-GKN Employee Welfare Benefit Plan, #2 Exhibit 1-A: 2016 RedBrick Health Wellness Program Overview, #3 Exhibit 1-B: 2017 RedBrick Health Wellness Program Plan, #4 Exhibit 1-C: 2018 RedBrick Health Wellness Program Plan)(JOYNER, KEVIN)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Three, Seven, Eight, and Nine, and Portions of Count Two by GKN DRIVELINE NORTH AMERICA, INC.. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2019 (JOYNER, KEVIN)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by GKN DRIVELINE NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CALABRO, REGINA)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for GKN DRIVELINE NORTH AMERICA, INC. Answer due by 12/12/2018. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/10/2018. (Brubaker, John)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney REGINA W. CALABRO on behalf of Defendant GKN DRIVELINE NORTH AMERICA, INC. (CALABRO, REGINA)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for RANDSTAD USA, LLC. Answer due by 12/21/2018. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/7/2018. (Brubaker, John)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by RANDSTAD USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MANOS, MARGARET)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KEVIN SCOTT JOYNER on behalf of Defendant GKN DRIVELINE NORTH AMERICA, INC. (JOYNER, KEVIN)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to GKN DRIVELINE NORTH AMERICA, INC. served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Service by Counsel for Def GKN Driveline)(HERNANDEZ, GILDA)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for RANDSTAD USA, LLC. Answer due by 12/7/2018. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 11/20/2018. (Brubaker, John)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by RANDSTAD USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MANOS, MARGARET)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to RANDSTAD USA, LLC served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service on Registered Agent for Randstad USA LLC)(HERNANDEZ, GILDA)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to GKN DRIVELINE NORTH AMERICA, INC., and RANDSTAD USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 GKN)(Coyne, Michelle)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney EMMA J. SMILEY on behalf of Plaintiffs James Mebane, Angela Worsham (SMILEY, EMMA)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Angela Worsham. (HERNANDEZ, GILDA)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by James Mebane. (HERNANDEZ, GILDA)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GILDA A. HERNANDEZ on behalf of Plaintiffs James Mebane, Angela Worsham (HERNANDEZ, GILDA)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2449152.), filed by James Mebane, Angela Worsham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to GKN Driveline North America, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons to Randstad USA, LLC, #4 Exhibit A - Consent to Sue as Named Plaintiff - James Mebane, #5 Exhibit B - Consent to Sue as Named Plaintiff - Angela Worsham)(HERNANDEZ, GILDA)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEBANE, ET AL. V. GKN DRIVELINE NORTH AMERICA, INC., ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GKN DRIVELINE NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: KEVIN SCOTT JOYNER
Represented By: REGINA W. CALABRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDSTAD USA, LLC
Represented By: MARGARET M. MANOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA WORSHAM
Represented By: GILDA A. HERNANDEZ
Represented By: EMMA J. SMILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MEBANE
Represented By: GILDA A. HERNANDEZ
Represented By: EMMA J. SMILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?