SCHMITZ v. ALAMANCE-BURLINGTON BOARD OF EDUCATION
Plaintiff: THERESA SCHMITZ
Defendant: ALAMANCE-BURLINGTON BOARD OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv00910
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID B. NOLAND on behalf of Defendant ALAMANCE-BURLINGTON BOARD OF EDUCATION (NOLAND, DAVID)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by THERESA SCHMITZ. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WALL, JONATHAN)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 BRIEF re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant ALAMANCE-BURLINGTON BOARD OF EDUCATION filed by ALAMANCE-BURLINGTON BOARD OF EDUCATION. (MITCHELL, ADAM)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ALAMANCE-BURLINGTON BOARD OF EDUCATION. Response to Motion due by 12/24/2018 (MITCHELL, ADAM)
October 30, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by ALAMANCE-BURLINGTON BOARD OF EDUCATION. Answer due by 12/3/2018. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 10/30/2018 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court.(Powell, Gloria)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to ALAMANCE-BURLINGTON BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Original document issued in Guilford County Superior Court on 10/05/2018 in case number 18CVS8269 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against ALAMANCE-BURLINGTON BOARD OF EDUCATION, filed by THERESA SCHMITZ. (Original document filed in Guilford County Superior Court, Case Number 18CVS8269 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Alamance-Burlington Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(MITCHELL, ADAM)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alamance-Burlington Board of Education. (MITCHELL, ADAM)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ADAM S. MITCHELL on behalf of Defendant Alamance-Burlington Board of Education (MITCHELL, ADAM)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Alamance-Burlington Board of Education ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2453330.), filed by Alamance-Burlington Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint)(MITCHELL, ADAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCHMITZ v. ALAMANCE-BURLINGTON BOARD OF EDUCATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERESA SCHMITZ
Represented By: JONATHAN WALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAMANCE-BURLINGTON BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: ADAM S. MITCHELL
Represented By: DAVID B. NOLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?