WHITE v. THE CITY OF GREENSBORO et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM Z WHITE
Defendant: WILLIAM B. BARHAM, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA, DON WAYNE SCOTT, JR., JAMES E. HINSON, JR., SHANNON C. COATES, JIM WESTMORELAND, THE CITY OF GREENSBORO, JAMES MATTHEW STALLS, LINDSAY MICHELLE ALBERT, CODY A. WESTMORELAND, ERIC A. WATKINS, THE CITY OF REIDSVILLE, DAVID W. COOK, BRIAN S. WILLIAMSON, LYNWOOD F. HAMPSHIRE, JAMES M. SHWOCHOW, ROBERT A. HASSELL, JOHNNY L. RAINES, JR., ERIC G. SIGMON, JASON A. LOWE, ELIZABETH M. BUSKIRK, HOMER F. WILKINS, B.J. BARNES and THE CITY OF BURLINGTON
Case Number: 1:2018cv00969
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 42 SUPPLEMENT EXHIBITS TO PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Plaintiff WILLIAM Z WHITE. (BARFIELD, TRISHA)
January 14, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by SHANNON C. COATES, LYNWOOD F. HAMPSHIRE, ROBERT A. HASSELL, THE CITY OF REIDSVILLE. (HARTZOG, DAN)
January 9, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by B.J. BARNES, ELIZABETH M. BUSKIRK, DAVID W. COOK, JAMES MATTHEW STALLS, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA, HOMER F. WILKINS. (SECOR, JAMES)
January 9, 2019 Filing 37 BRIEF re #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Warrant for Arrest 17CR556, #2 Exhibit Warrant for Arrest 17CR070285, #3 Exhibit Arrest Warrant 17MJ58-1, #4 Exhibit Warrant for Arrest 17CR051380, #5 Exhibit Warrant for Arrest 17CR71387, #6 Exhibit Memorandum Opinion and Order 17CR94-1, #7 Exhibit Application for Search Warrant)(SECOR, JAMES)
January 9, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by B.J. BARNES, ELIZABETH M. BUSKIRK, DAVID W. COOK, JAMES MATTHEW STALLS, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA, HOMER F. WILKINS. Response to Motion due by 1/30/2019 (SECOR, JAMES)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Thomas D. Schroeder on 01/09/2019, that the motion is GRANTED and the word limit for the Guilford County Sheriff Office Defendants' forthcoming Brief in Support of a Motion to Dismiss the Amended Compliant is expanded to a total of 7,000 words (including the body of the Brief, headings and footnotes). (Coyne, Michelle)
January 8, 2019 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Plaintiff WILLIAM Z WHITE . (BARFIELD, TRISHA) (Main Document 34 replaced on 1/9/2019) (Contreras, Jamie). (Main Document 34 replaced on 1/12/2019) (Worthington, Derrick).
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint for LINDSAY MICHELLE ALBERT; WILLIAM B. BARHAM; JAMES E. HINSON, JR.; JASON A. LOWE; JOHNNY L. RAINES, JR.; DON WAYNE SCOTT, JR.; JAMES M. SHWOCHOW; ERIC G. SIGMON; THE CITY OF GREENSBORO; JIM WESTMORELAND; and BRIAN S. WILLIAMSON. Answer due by 1/22/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 1/8/2019. (Brubaker, John)
January 8, 2019 Motion Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: #32 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Engle, Anita)
January 8, 2019 Filing 33 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #21 Amended Complaint by LINDSAY MICHELLE ALBERT, WILLIAM B. BARHAM, JAMES E. HINSON, JR., JASON A. LOWE, JOHNNY L. RAINES, JR., DON WAYNE SCOTT, JR., JAMES M. SHWOCHOW, ERIC G. SIGMON, THE CITY OF GREENSBORO, JIM WESTMORELAND, BRIAN S. WILLIAMSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TURNER, WILLIAM)
January 7, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by B.J. BARNES, ELIZABETH M. BUSKIRK, DAVID W. COOK, JAMES MATTHEW STALLS, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA, HOMER F. WILKINS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SECOR, JAMES)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for B.J. BARNES; ELIZABETH M. BUSKIRK; DAVID W. COOK; JAMES MATTHEW STALLS; TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA; and HOMER F. WILKINS. Answer due by 1/14/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/26/2018. (Brubaker, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 31 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #21 Amended Complaint by B.J. BARNES, ELIZABETH M. BUSKIRK, DAVID W. COOK, JAMES MATTHEW STALLS, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA, HOMER F. WILKINS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SECOR, JAMES) Modified on 12/26/2018 (Coyne, Michelle).
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by LINDSAY MICHELLE ALBERT, WILLIAM B. BARHAM, JAMES E. HINSON, JR., JASON A. LOWE, JOHNNY L. RAINES, JR., DON WAYNE SCOTT, JR., JAMES M. SHWOCHOW, ERIC G. SIGMON, THE CITY OF GREENSBORO, JIM WESTMORELAND, BRIAN S. WILLIAMSON. Answer due by 1/14/2019. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 12/21/2018 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court.(Powell, Gloria)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for THE CITY OF BURLINGTON; ERIC A. WATKINS; and CODY A. WESTMORELAND. Answer due by 1/23/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/20/2018. (Brubaker, John)
December 20, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 Amended Complaint by THE CITY OF BURLINGTON, ERIC A. WATKINS, CODY A. WESTMORELAND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HART, SCOTT) Modified on 12/20/2018 (Brubaker, John).
December 20, 2018 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY CORP., Corporate Parent TRAVELERS INSURANCE GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES, INC., Corporate Parent TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY for TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA.. (SECOR, JAMES)
December 20, 2018 Filing 28 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #21 Amended Complaint by LINDSAY MICHELLE ALBERT, WILLIAM B. BARHAM, JAMES E. HINSON, JR., JASON A. LOWE, JOHNNY L. RAINES, JR., DON WAYNE SCOTT, JR., JAMES M. SHWOCHOW, ERIC G. SIGMON, THE CITY OF GREENSBORO, JIM WESTMORELAND, BRIAN S. WILLIAMSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TURNER, WILLIAM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOMER F. WILKINS. (SECOR, JAMES)
December 20, 2018 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAMES MATTHEW STALLS. (SECOR, JAMES)
December 20, 2018 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DAVID W. COOK. (SECOR, JAMES)
December 20, 2018 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ELIZABETH M. BUSKIRK. (SECOR, JAMES)
December 20, 2018 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by B.J. BARNES. (SECOR, JAMES)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for SHANNON C. COATES, LYNWOOD F. HAMPSHIRE, ROBERT A. HASSELL, and THE CITY OF REIDSVILLE. Answer due by 1/14/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/20/2018. (Brubaker, John)
December 19, 2018 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #21 Amended Complaint by SHANNON C. COATES, LYNWOOD F. HAMPSHIRE, ROBERT A. HASSELL, THE CITY OF REIDSVILLE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(HARTZOG, DAN)
December 14, 2018 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by WILLIAM Z WHITE.(DECKER, RACHEL)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for THE CITY OF BURLINGTON; ERIC A. WATKINS; and CODY A. WESTMORELAND. Answer due by 1/23/2018. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/13/2018. (Brubaker, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by THE CITY OF BURLINGTON, ERIC A. WATKINS, CODY A. WESTMORELAND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(HART, SCOTT) Modified on 12/13/2018 (Brubaker, John).
December 12, 2018 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CODY A. WESTMORELAND. (HART, SCOTT)
December 12, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ERIC A. WATKINS. (HART, SCOTT)
December 12, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CITY OF BURLINGTON. (HART, SCOTT)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for SHANNON C. COATES; LYNWOOD F. HAMPSHIRE; ROBERT A. HASSELL; and THE CITY OF REIDSVILLE. Answer due by 1/14/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/11/2018. (Brubaker, John)
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by SHANNON C. COATES, LYNWOOD F. HAMPSHIRE, ROBERT A. HASSELL, THE CITY OF REIDSVILLE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(HARTZOG, DAN)
December 11, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE CITY OF REIDSVILLE. (HARTZOG, DAN)
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAN MCCORD HARTZOG, JR on behalf of Defendants SHANNON C. COATES, LYNWOOD F. HAMPSHIRE, ROBERT A. HASSELL, THE CITY OF REIDSVILLE (HARTZOG, DAN)
December 11, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KATHERINE MARIE BARBER-JONES on behalf of Defendants SHANNON C. COATES, LYNWOOD F. HAMPSHIRE, ROBERT A. HASSELL, THE CITY OF REIDSVILLE (BARBER-JONES, KATHERINE)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM CRAIG TURNER, JR on behalf of Defendants LINDSAY MICHELLE ALBERT, WILLIAM B. BARHAM, JAMES E. HINSON, JR., JASON A. LOWE, JOHNNY L. RAINES, JR., DON WAYNE SCOTT, JR., JAMES M. SHWOCHOW, ERIC G. SIGMON, THE CITY OF GREENSBORO, JIM WESTMORELAND, BRIAN S. WILLIAMSON (TURNER, WILLIAM)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for B.J. BARNES; ELIZABETH M. BUSKIRK; DAVID W. COOK; JAMES MATTHEW STALLS; TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA; and HOMER F. WILKINS. Answer due by 1/14/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/11/2018. (Brubaker, John)
December 11, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by B.J. BARNES, ELIZABETH M. BUSKIRK, DAVID W. COOK, JAMES MATTHEW STALLS, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA, HOMER F. WILKINS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SECOR, JAMES)
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES DEMAREST SECOR, III on behalf of Defendant TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA (SECOR, JAMES)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES DEMAREST SECOR, III on behalf of Defendants B.J. BARNES, ELIZABETH M. BUSKIRK, DAVID W. COOK, JAMES MATTHEW STALLS, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA, HOMER F. WILKINS (SECOR, JAMES)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SCOTT C. HART, ESQ on behalf of Defendants THE CITY OF BURLINGTON, ERIC A. WATKINS, CODY A. WESTMORELAND (HART, SCOTT)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for LINDSAY MICHELLE ALBERT; WILLIAM B. BARHAM; JAMES E. HINSON, JR.; JASON A. LOWE; JOHNNY L. RAINES, JR.; DON WAYNE SCOTT, JR.; JAMES M. SHWOCHOW; ERIC G. SIGMON; THE CITY OF GREENSBORO; JIM WESTMORELAND; and BRIAN S. WILLIAMSON. Answer due by 1/14/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/6/2018. (Brubaker, John)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by LINDSAY MICHELLE ALBERT, WILLIAM B. BARHAM, JAMES E. HINSON, JR., JASON A. LOWE, JOHNNY L. RAINES, JR., DON WAYNE SCOTT, JR., JAMES M. SHWOCHOW, ERIC G. SIGMON, THE CITY OF GREENSBORO, JIM WESTMORELAND, BRIAN S. WILLIAMSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(KANE, PATRICK)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Reissued as to JIM WESTMORELAND. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TRISHA L. BARFIELD on behalf of Plaintiff WILLIAM Z WHITE (BARFIELD, TRISHA)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 20, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KENNETH R. KELLER on behalf of Plaintiff WILLIAM Z WHITE (KELLER, KENNETH)
November 20, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2465203.), filed by WILLIAM Z WHITE.(DECKER, RACHEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE v. THE CITY OF GREENSBORO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM B. BARHAM
Represented By: PATRICK MICHAEL KANE
Represented By: WILLIAM CRAIG TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: JAMES DEMAREST SECOR, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DON WAYNE SCOTT, JR.
Represented By: PATRICK MICHAEL KANE
Represented By: WILLIAM CRAIG TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES E. HINSON, JR.
Represented By: PATRICK MICHAEL KANE
Represented By: WILLIAM CRAIG TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANNON C. COATES
Represented By: DAN MCCORD HARTZOG, JR.
Represented By: KATHERINE MARIE BARBER-JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIM WESTMORELAND
Represented By: PATRICK MICHAEL KANE
Represented By: WILLIAM CRAIG TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF GREENSBORO
Represented By: PATRICK MICHAEL KANE
Represented By: WILLIAM CRAIG TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MATTHEW STALLS
Represented By: JAMES DEMAREST SECOR, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDSAY MICHELLE ALBERT
Represented By: PATRICK MICHAEL KANE
Represented By: WILLIAM CRAIG TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CODY A. WESTMORELAND
Represented By: SCOTT C. HART, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC A. WATKINS
Represented By: SCOTT C. HART, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF REIDSVILLE
Represented By: DAN MCCORD HARTZOG, JR.
Represented By: KATHERINE MARIE BARBER-JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID W. COOK
Represented By: JAMES DEMAREST SECOR, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN S. WILLIAMSON
Represented By: PATRICK MICHAEL KANE
Represented By: WILLIAM CRAIG TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNWOOD F. HAMPSHIRE
Represented By: DAN MCCORD HARTZOG, JR.
Represented By: KATHERINE MARIE BARBER-JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES M. SHWOCHOW
Represented By: PATRICK MICHAEL KANE
Represented By: WILLIAM CRAIG TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT A. HASSELL
Represented By: DAN MCCORD HARTZOG, JR.
Represented By: KATHERINE MARIE BARBER-JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNNY L. RAINES, JR.
Represented By: PATRICK MICHAEL KANE
Represented By: WILLIAM CRAIG TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC G. SIGMON
Represented By: PATRICK MICHAEL KANE
Represented By: WILLIAM CRAIG TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON A. LOWE
Represented By: PATRICK MICHAEL KANE
Represented By: WILLIAM CRAIG TURNER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIZABETH M. BUSKIRK
Represented By: JAMES DEMAREST SECOR, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOMER F. WILKINS
Represented By: JAMES DEMAREST SECOR, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.J. BARNES
Represented By: JAMES DEMAREST SECOR, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CITY OF BURLINGTON
Represented By: SCOTT C. HART, ESQ.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM Z WHITE
Represented By: RACHEL SCOTT DECKER
Represented By: KENNETH R. KELLER
Represented By: TRISHA L. BARFIELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?