BONE et al v. UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HEALTH CARE SYSTEM et al
Plaintiff: NATIONAL FEDERATION OF THE BLIND, DISABILITY RIGHTS NORTH CAROLINA, JOHN BONE and TIMOTHY MILES
Defendant: NASH HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HEALTH CARE SYSTEM and Nash Hospitals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00994
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #17 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, in light of the filing of #18 Amended Complaint. All current Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to #18 Amended Complaint as prescribed in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3). Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 01/25/2019. (AULD, L.)
January 25, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
January 24, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, Nash Hospitals, Inc., filed by DISABILITY RIGHTS NORTH CAROLINA, JOHN BONE, NATIONAL FEDERATION OF THE BLIND, TIMOTHY MILES. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(WEBER, JESSICA)
January 24, 2019 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NASH HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HEALTH CARE SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LANGLEY, DENA)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HEALTH CARE SYSTEM. Answer due by 1/28/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/31/2018. (Brubaker, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HEALTH CARE SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(THOMAS, KATHRYN)
December 27, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KATHRYN JEAN THOMAS on behalf of Defendant UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HEALTH CARE SYSTEM (THOMAS, KATHRYN)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for NASH HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS. Answer due by 1/28/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/20/2018. (Brubaker, John)
December 20, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by NASH HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LANGLEY, DENA)
December 20, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NASH HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS. (LANGLEY, DENA)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DENA BETH LANGLEY on behalf of Defendant NASH HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS (LANGLEY, DENA)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 Declaration of Proof of Service served on Nash Health Care Systems on 12/12/2018, filed by JOHN BONE, DISABILITY RIGHTS NORTH CAROLINA, TIMOTHY MILES, NATIONAL FEDERATION OF THE BLIND. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(HODGSON, CHRISTOPHER)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to NASH HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HEALTH CARE SYSTEM. (Attachments: #1 Nash)(Coyne, Michelle)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER A. HODGSON on behalf of Plaintiffs JOHN BONE, DISABILITY RIGHTS NORTH CAROLINA, TIMOTHY MILES, NATIONAL FEDERATION OF THE BLIND (HODGSON, CHRISTOPHER)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JESSICA P. WEBER on behalf of Plaintiffs JOHN BONE, DISABILITY RIGHTS NORTH CAROLINA, TIMOTHY MILES, NATIONAL FEDERATION OF THE BLIND (WEBER, JESSICA)
December 3, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
December 3, 2018 Case assigned to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LISA GRAFSTEIN on behalf of Plaintiffs John Bone, DISABILITY RIGHTS NORTH CAROLINA, TIMOTHY MILES, National Federation of the Blind (GRAFSTEIN, LISA)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff TIMOTHY MILES (GRAFSTEIN, LISA)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff National Federation of the Blind (GRAFSTEIN, LISA)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff John Bone (GRAFSTEIN, LISA)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff DISABILITY RIGHTS NORTH CAROLINA (GRAFSTEIN, LISA)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nash Health Care Systems, UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HEALTH CARE SYSTEM ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2470897.), filed by DISABILITY RIGHTS NORTH CAROLINA, John Bone, National Federation of the Blind, TIMOTHY MILES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons)(GRAFSTEIN, LISA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BONE et al v. UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HEALTH CARE SYSTEM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NASH HEALTH CARE SYSTEMS
Represented By: DENA BETH LANGLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA HEALTH CARE SYSTEM
Represented By: KATHRYN JEAN THOMAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nash Hospitals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL FEDERATION OF THE BLIND
Represented By: JESSICA P. WEBER
Represented By: LISA GRAFSTEIN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. HODGSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISABILITY RIGHTS NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: JESSICA P. WEBER
Represented By: LISA GRAFSTEIN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. HODGSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BONE
Represented By: JESSICA P. WEBER
Represented By: LISA GRAFSTEIN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. HODGSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY MILES
Represented By: JESSICA P. WEBER
Represented By: LISA GRAFSTEIN
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. HODGSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?