JOSEPH V. WASTE MANAGEMENT OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., ET AL.
Plaintiff: Stanley Joseph
Defendant: Waste Management of Carolinas, Inc., Waste Management Resources, Inc, Waste Management of South Carolina, Inc. and WASTE MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, INC.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01003
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Answer updated for WASTE MANAGEMENT OF CAROLINAS, INC., WASTE MANAGEMENT OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC. and WASTE MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, INC. to 2/15/2019. C(Contreras, Jamie)
January 18, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by All Defendants. For good cause shown, Defendants shall have up to and including February 15, 2019 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 1/18/2019.(Lee, Pedra)
January 16, 2019 Motion Referred to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER RE: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond. (Engle, Anita)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by WASTE MANAGEMENT OF CAROLINAS, INC., WASTE MANAGEMENT OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., WASTE MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (NIGH, STEVEN) Modified on 1/16/2019 to remove duplicate text. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for All Defendants. Answer due by 1/16/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 12/31/2018. (Brubaker, John)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint . (NIGH, STEVEN)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WASTE MANAGEMENT OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., identifying Corporate Parent Waste Management Holdings, Inc., Waste Management, Inc., for WASTE MANAGEMENT OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC. (NIGH, STEVEN) Modified on 1/2/2019 to name correct defendant only. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by WASTE MANAGEMENT OF CAROLINAS, INC., WASTE MANAGEMENT OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., WASTE MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, INC.. (NIGH, STEVEN)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to WASTE MANAGEMENT OF CAROLINAS, INC., WASTE MANAGEMENT OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., WASTE MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, INC. (Attachments: #1 WMC, #2 WMR)(Coyne, Michelle)
December 4, 2018 Case assigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2471352.), filed by Stanley Joseph.(LYON, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOSEPH V. WASTE MANAGEMENT OF SOUTH CAROLINA, INC., ET AL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Management of Carolinas, Inc.
Represented By: STEVEN A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Management Resources, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Management of South Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: STEVEN A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASTE MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, INC.
Represented By: STEVEN A. NIGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Joseph
Represented By: DANIEL C. LYON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?