O'GARA V. HUNTER
Petitioner: TODD O'GARA and WANU WATER, INC.
Respondent: GREG HUNTER
Trustee: C. EDWIN ALLMAN, III
Interested Party: WILLIAM P. MILLER
Case Number: 1:2018cv01048
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Motions Submitted to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER: #15 MOTION to Strike #12 Response in Opposition to Motion (Motion to Strike Debtor's Objection to Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court), #20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney TORIN LANE FURY, and #2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. (Engle, Anita)
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Support re #15 MOTION to Strike #12 Response in Opposition to Motion (Motion to Strike Debtor's Objection to Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court) filed by TODD O'GARA, WANU WATER, INC.. Replies due by 3/11/2019 (EDWARDS, ASHLEY)
February 15, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney TORIN LANE FURY by on behalf of GREG HUNTER. Responses due by 3/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ORDER)(FURY, TORIN)
February 8, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Debtor GREG HUNTER, Respondent GREG HUNTER re #15 MOTION to Strike #12 Response in Opposition to Motion (Motion to Strike Debtor's Objection to Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court) filed by WANU WATER, INC., TODD O'GARA filed by GREG HUNTER, GREG HUNTER. Replies due by 2/25/2019 (BROMBERGER, ROSS)
February 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROSS J. BROMBERGER on behalf of Debtor GREG HUNTER, Respondent GREG HUNTER (BROMBERGER, ROSS)
February 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MEL JOSEPH GAROFALO on behalf of Debtor GREG HUNTER, Respondent GREG HUNTER (GAROFALO, MEL)
January 23, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY, filed by Movants TODD O'GARA, WANU WATER, INC., to Response to #2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by TODD O'GARA, WANU WATER, INC.. (HANLON, WILLIAM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike #12 Response in Opposition to Motion (Motion to Strike Debtor's Objection to Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court) by TODD O'GARA, WANU WATER, INC.. Response to Motion due by 2/11/2019 (HANLON, WILLIAM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney TORIN LANE FURY on behalf of Debtor GREG HUNTER, Respondent GREG HUNTER (FURY, TORIN)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE re #7 Certificate-Other Amended Certificate of No Objection to Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw the Reference to the Bankruptcy Court by Movants TODD O'GARA, WANU WATER, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(HANLON, WILLIAM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by WANU WATER, INC., TODD O'GARA filed by GREG HUNTER, GREG HUNTER. Replies due by 2/4/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bankruptcy Filing)(FURY, TORIN)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM J. HANLON on behalf of Movants TODD O'GARA, WANU WATER, INC. (HANLON, WILLIAM)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONAH R. HECHT on behalf of Movants TODD O'GARA, WANU WATER, INC. (HECHT, JONAH)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM L. PRICKETT on behalf of Movants TODD O'GARA, WANU WATER, INC. (PRICKETT, WILLIAM)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by TODD O'GARA, WANU WATER, INC. Notice of Relief From the Automatic Stay in Defendant's Bankruptcy Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(STARK, ANDREW)
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE re #2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference Certificate of No Objection by Movants TODD O'GARA, WANU WATER, INC.. (STARK, ANDREW)
January 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANDREW T. STARK on behalf of Movants TODD O'GARA, WANU WATER, INC. (STARK, ANDREW)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. (Main document - Doc. 12 Amended Designation of Record. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket file. (Attachments: #1 6-Summons, #2 7-Summons Service Executed)
December 28, 2018 Case Reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER. JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES no longer assigned to the case. Reference case 1:18cv825. (Marsh, Keah)
December 27, 2018 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Coyne, Michelle)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. (Main Document - Doc. 1 Complaint from Adversary Proceeding 18-1048. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket file. (Attachments: #1 2-AP Memo, #2 4-Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Bankruptcy Record re: Withdrawal of Reference. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket file. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet for Bankruptcy Case, #2 5-Movant's Designation of Record)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by TODD O'GARA, WANU WATER, INC.
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record for Motion for Withdrawal of Reference filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'GARA V. HUNTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TODD O'GARA
Represented By: ASHLEY A. EDWARDS
Represented By: JONAH R. HECHT
Represented By: WILLIAM J. HANLON
Represented By: WILLIAM L. PRICKETT
Represented By: ANDREW T. STARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WANU WATER, INC.
Represented By: ASHLEY A. EDWARDS
Represented By: JONAH R. HECHT
Represented By: WILLIAM J. HANLON
Represented By: WILLIAM L. PRICKETT
Represented By: ANDREW T. STARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: GREG HUNTER
Represented By: TORIN LANE FURY
Represented By: MEL JOSEPH GAROFALO
Represented By: ROSS J. BROMBERGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: C. EDWIN ALLMAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WILLIAM P. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?