ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT COMPANY v. L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Plaintiff: Electrical Equipment Company
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services and L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00074
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT COMPANY. L. FRANCIS CISSNA served on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. as to US Attorney's Office for the Middle District of North Carolina (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)
January 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30. (Coyne, Michelle)
January 15, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. Set flag for Magistrate Judge Joi Elizabeth Peake. (Coyne, Michelle)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER M. HINNANT on behalf of Plaintiff ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT COMPANY (HINNANT, CHRISTOPHER)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to L. FRANCIS CISSNA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 AUSA, #2 USAG)(Coyne, Michelle)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against L. Francis Cissna, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2492182.), filed by Electrical Equipment Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BANIAS, BRADLEY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ELECTRICAL EQUIPMENT COMPANY v. L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Equipment Company
Represented By: BRADLEY B. BANIAS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M. HINNANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?