TERRY v. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Plaintiff: MILTON H TERRY, JR
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00085
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. re #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement - 7.1(a) (GORDON, FRANK)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 4/25/2019 09:30 AM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #3 before MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garrett, Kim)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (GORDON, FRANK)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (GORDON, FRANK)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Coyne, Michelle)
January 16, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney AUDREY M. SNYDER on behalf of Plaintiff MILTON H TERRY, JR (SNYDER, AUDREY)
January 16, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2493652.), filed by MILTON H TERRY, JR.(BLACK, JANET WARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TERRY v. CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILTON H TERRY, JR
Represented By: AUDREY M. SNYDER
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: FRANK J. GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?