JOHNSON v. SUN PET, LTD et al
Plaintiff: DENNIS F. JOHNSON
Defendant: SUN PET, LTD and CENTRAL GARDEN & PET COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00086
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 3/25/2019 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by CENTRAL GARDEN & PET COMPANY, SUN PET, LTD. (DAVIS, MELISSA)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by All Defendants. Answer due by 2/22/2019. Signed by Gloria L. Powell on 1/22/2019 on behalf of John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court.(Powell, Gloria)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Complaint, or Otherwise Plead by CENTRAL GARDEN & PET COMPANY, SUN PET, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DAVIS, MELISSA)
January 17, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to CENTRAL GARDEN & PET COMPANY, SUN PET, LTD. (Original document issued in Rowan County Superior Court on 12/14/2019, Case Number 18CVS2890 and is listed as exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against CENTRAL GARDEN & PET COMPANY, SUN PET, LTD, filed by DENNIS F. JOHNSON. (Original document filed in Rowan County Superior Court, Case Number 18CVS2890 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Coyne, Michelle)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTRAL GARDEN & PET COMPANY. (DAVIS, MELISSA)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant SUN PET, LTD. (DAVIS, MELISSA)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SIDNEY O. MINTER on behalf of Defendants CENTRAL GARDEN & PET COMPANY, SUN PET, LTD (MINTER, SIDNEY)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MELISSA ROBIN DAVIS on behalf of Defendants CENTRAL GARDEN & PET COMPANY, SUN PET, LTD (DAVIS, MELISSA)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against CENTRAL GARDEN & PET COMPANY, SUN PET, LTD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2493694.), filed by CENTRAL GARDEN & PET COMPANY, SUN PET, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DAVIS, MELISSA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOHNSON v. SUN PET, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS F. JOHNSON
Represented By: CLARK D. TEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PET, LTD
Represented By: SIDNEY O. MINTER
Represented By: MELISSA ROBIN DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRAL GARDEN & PET COMPANY
Represented By: SIDNEY O. MINTER
Represented By: MELISSA ROBIN DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?