MCNEAL v. HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: WILLIE MCNEAL, JR.
Defendant: R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, LORILLARD LLC and HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00097
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019; R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (PRZYBYSZ, ERIC)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 Summons issued as to HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY, R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 H&V)(Coyne, Michelle)
February 20, 2019 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by WILLIE MCNEAL, JR.(BLACK, JANET WARD)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY and R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY. Answer due by 3/21/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 02/19/2019. (Brubaker, John)
February 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY, LORILLARD LLC, R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BURKHALTER, HOWELL)
February 19, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's Motion and concludes that good cause exists to allow leave to amend the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint attached as Exhibit A to the Motion within five days of the date of this Order. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 2/19/2019.(Lee, Pedra)
February 19, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #6 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Sanders, Marlene)
February 18, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff WILLIE MCNEAL, JR re #6 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by WILLIE MCNEAL, JR. (BLACK, JANET WARD)
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by WILLIE MCNEAL, JR. Response to Motion due by 3/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Redlined Complaint)(BLACK, JANET WARD)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to All Defendants. HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY served on 02/01/2019, Answer due 02/22/2019, LORILLARD LLC and R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY served 01/28/2019, Answer due 02/19/2019. (BLACK, JANET WARD) Modified on 2/6/2019 to include dates.(Taylor, Abby).
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY, LORILLARD LLC, and R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY. (Coyne, Michelle)
January 22, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
January 21, 2019 Filing 2 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
January 18, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2495017.), filed by WILLIE MCNEAL, JR.(BLACK, JANET WARD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCNEAL v. HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE MCNEAL, JR.
Represented By: JANET WARD BLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY
Represented By: HOWELL A. BURKHALTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORILLARD LLC
Represented By: HOWELL A. BURKHALTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY
Represented By: HOWELL A. BURKHALTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?