YARBROUGH v. BUILDING MAINTENANCE SERVICES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: KEVIN YARBROUGH
Defendant: BUILDING MAINTENANCE SERVICES, LLC and SURFACE LOGIC, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00098
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #9 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual), #10 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual), to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Garrett, Kim)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). by KEVIN YARBROUGH. Response to Motion due by 4/5/2019 (ATWATER, BRANDON)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). Response to Motion due by 3/29/2019 by BUILDING MAINTENANCE SERVICES, LLC, SURFACE LOGIC, LLC.(FITZGIBBON, MEREDITH)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SURFACE LOGIC, LLC. (FITZGIBBON, MEREDITH)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BUILDING MAINTENANCE SERVICES, LLC. (FITZGIBBON, MEREDITH)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 3/20/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand by BUILDING MAINTENANCE SERVICES, LLC, SURFACE LOGIC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit January 2018 Emails, #2 Exhibit Termination Letter)(FITZGIBBON, MEREDITH)
January 18, 2019 Case assigned to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
January 18, 2019 Notice of Right to Consent. (Coyne, Michelle)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BUILDING MAINTENANCE SERVICES, LLC, SURFACE LOGIC, LLC. (original document issued in Durham County Superior Court, Case Number 18CVS4270 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against BUILDING MAINTENANCE SERVICES, LLC, SURFACE LOGIC, LLC, filed by KEVIN YARBROUGH. (Original document filed in Durham County Superior Court, Case Number 18CVS04270 and is listed as Exhibit A to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN on behalf of Defendants Building Maintenance Services, LLC, Surface Logic, LLC (FLANAGAN, PATRICK)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against Kevin Yarbrough ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2495138.), filed by Surface Logic, LLC, Building Maintenance Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal)(FITZGIBBON, MEREDITH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YARBROUGH v. BUILDING MAINTENANCE SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUILDING MAINTENANCE SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: MEREDITH A. FITZGIBBON
Represented By: PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SURFACE LOGIC, LLC
Represented By: MEREDITH A. FITZGIBBON
Represented By: PATRICK HOUGHTON FLANAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN YARBROUGH
Represented By: BRANDON SHERARD ATWATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?