JETER v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, et al.

Plaintiff: ZYRALE JETER
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, ALAN RHOADES, M.D. and GRAND PRAIRIE HEALTHCARE SERVICES, PC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00152
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: THOMAS D SCHROEDER
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Appointing THOMAS C. DUNCAN as the mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Gammon, Cheryl)
March 28, 2019 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER ; Mediation to take place by 3/1/2020. (Gammon, Cheryl)
March 21, 2019 TEXT ORDER adopting #17 Joint Discovery Plan. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 03/21/2019. (AULD, L.)
March 20, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #17 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED JOINT 26(f) REPORT filed by all parties.. (MILAK, JENNIFER) Modified on 3/20/2019 to correct event used (Garrett, Kim).
March 18, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #16 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
March 15, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by all parties. by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, ALAN RHOADES, MD.(MILAK, JENNIFER) Modified on 3/18/2019 to correct event used (Garrett, Kim).
February 18, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to GRAND PRAIRIE HEALTHCARE SERVICES, PC served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(TAYLOR, JOHN)
February 18, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC served on 1/19/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(TAYLOR, JOHN)
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GRAND PRAIRIE HEALTHCARE SERVICES, PC. (MILAK, JENNIFER)
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC. (MILAK, JENNIFER)
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 3/25/2019 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by ALAN RHOADES, MD. (MILAK, JENNIFER)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by GRAND PRAIRIE HEALTHCARE SERVICES, PC. (MILAK, JENNIFER)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC. (MILAK, JENNIFER)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by ALAN RHOADES, MD. (MILAK, JENNIFER)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC. (MILAK, JENNIFER) Modified on 2/12/2019 to correctly reflect document title. (Garland, Leah)
February 7, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 6, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Original document issued in Forsyth County Superior Court on 12/20/2018 in case number 18CVS6512 and is attached to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, GRAND PRAIRIE HEALTHCARE SERVICES, PC, ALAN RHOADES, MD, filed by ZYRALE JETER. (Original document filed in Forsyth County Superior Court, Case Number 18CVS6512 and is attached to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance (MILAK, JENNIFER)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against ALAN RHOADES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2505928.), filed by ALAN RHOADES.(MILAK, JENNIFER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JETER v. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: JENNIFER BRYANT MILAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN RHOADES, M.D.
Represented By: JENNIFER BRYANT MILAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRAND PRAIRIE HEALTHCARE SERVICES, PC
Represented By: JENNIFER BRYANT MILAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZYRALE JETER
Represented By: JOHN N. TAYLOR, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?