INMAR BRAND SOLUTIONS, INC. v. NATIONAL PROGRAMMING SERVICE, LLC
Plaintiff: INMAR BRAND SOLUTIONS, INC.
Defendant: NATIONAL PROGRAMMING SERVICE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00165
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by INMAR BRAND SOLUTIONS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent INMAR, INC. for INMAR BRAND SOLUTIONS, INC. (WINTERS, ELIZABETH)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 [Corrected] Answer to Counterclaim ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by INMAR BRAND SOLUTIONS, INC.. (WINTERS, ELIZABETH)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 5/22/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 Answer to Counterclaim ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by INMAR BRAND SOLUTIONS, INC.. (WINTERS, ELIZABETH)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ELIZABETH L. WINTERS on behalf of Counter Defendant INMAR BRAND SOLUTIONS, INC., Plaintiff INMAR BRAND SOLUTIONS, INC. (WINTERS, ELIZABETH)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against by NATIONAL PROGRAMMING SERVICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DENTON, LEE)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for NATIONAL PROGRAMMING SERVICE, LLC. Answer due by 3/8/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 03/04/2019. (Brubaker, John)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint, by NATIONAL PROGRAMMING SERVICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DENTON, LEE)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for NATIONAL PROGRAMMING SERVICE, LLC. Answer due by 3/4/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 2/15/2019. (Brubaker, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by NATIONAL PROGRAMMING SERVICE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DENTON, LEE)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
February 12, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL PROGRAMMING SERVICE, LLC. (Original document issued in Forsyth County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS291 ON 01/11/2019 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL PROGRAMMING SERVICE, LLC, filed by INMAR BRAND SOLUTIONS, INC. (Original document filed in Forsyth County Superior Court, Case Number 19CVS291 and is listed as Exhibit 1 to the Petition for Removal) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Coyne, Michelle)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Programming Service, LLC. (DENTON, LEE)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against INMAR BRAND SOLUTIONS, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2509036.), filed by National Programming Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing)(DENTON, LEE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INMAR BRAND SOLUTIONS, INC. v. NATIONAL PROGRAMMING SERVICE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INMAR BRAND SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: JASON MICHAEL WENKER
Represented By: ELIZABETH L. WINTERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL PROGRAMMING SERVICE, LLC
Represented By: LEE D. DENTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?