UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CURRENCY, $34,760.00 IN U.S. et al

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: 2015 BMW428i, VIN WBA4A5C57FD410683, 2004 LEXUS RX330, VIN JTJHA31U240021955, CURRENCY, $34,760.00 IN U.S., CURRENCY, $4,117.00 IN U.S. and 2014 TOYOTA HIGHLANDER, VIN 5TDBKRFH9ES021793
Claimant: JIA LIU
Case Number: 1:2019cv00186
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 CLAIM by Jia Liu. (ZESZOTARSKI, JOSEPH)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSEPH E. ZESZOTARSKI, JR on behalf of Claimant Jia Liu (ZESZOTARSKI, JOSEPH)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE NON-PARTY on March 15, 2019 with the Verified Complaint of Forfeiture, Warrant for Arrest, and Legal Notice as to Jia Liu, by and through her attorney, Joseph E. Zeszotarski, Jr. (BAKER, STEVEN)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT FOR ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 03/07/2019. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 19, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joi Elizabeth Peake RE: #2 Application for Warrant for Arrest. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 19, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to UNASSIGNED and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Warrant for Arrest (), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BAKER, STEVEN)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against 2004 LEXUS RX330, VIN JTJHA31U240021955, 2014 TOYOTA HIGHLANDER, VIN 5TDBKRFH9ES021793, 2015 BMW428i, VIN WBA4A5C57FD410683, CURRENCY, $34,760.00 IN U.S., CURRENCY, $4,117.00 IN U.S. (Filing fee.), filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(BAKER, STEVEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CURRENCY, $34,760.00 IN U.S. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 BMW428i, VIN WBA4A5C57FD410683
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2004 LEXUS RX330, VIN JTJHA31U240021955
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURRENCY, $34,760.00 IN U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CURRENCY, $4,117.00 IN U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2014 TOYOTA HIGHLANDER, VIN 5TDBKRFH9ES021793
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: STEVEN N. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: JIA LIU
Represented By: JOSEPH E. ZESZOTARSKI, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?