FOSTER V. HUTSON

Appellant: RALPH M. FOSTER
Appellee: RICHARD M. HUTSON, II
Interested Party: WILLIAM P. MILLER and Robert Price, Jr.
Intervenor: WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00202
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by RALPH M. FOSTER re: #19 MOTION. (Garland, Leah)
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE entitled "Debtor-Appellant's combined Objections and Response to the Motions of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., to Intervene and to Dismiss the Appeal" re #14 MOTION to Intervene filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, #16 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal, filed by RALPH M. FOSTER. Replies due by 4/15/2019. (Garland, Leah)
March 29, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION entitled "Debtor's Emergency Motion for Stay of All Proceedings and Collection actions pending Appeal" filed by RALPH M. FOSTER. Response to Motion due by 4/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Garland, Leah)
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 Roseboro Letter re: #16 Motion to Dismiss. (Garland, Leah)
March 28, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM filed by Intervenor WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal #1 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(EWING, BAXTER)
March 28, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Appeal #1 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal by WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Response to Motion due by 4/18/2019 (EWING, BAXTER)
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM filed by Intervenor WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION re #14 MOTION to Intervene filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(EWING, BAXTER)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Intervene by WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. Response to Motion due by 4/18/2019 (EWING, BAXTER)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Intervenor WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (EWING, BAXTER)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BAXTER CHAD EWING on behalf of Intervenor WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (EWING, BAXTER)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/15/18, before Judge James. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (bancap, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Bankruptcy Record Part 2 filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Attachments: #1 68-Debtor Emergency Motion to Reconsider and other Relief, #2 72-Order Granting in part and Denying in part, #3 73-Motin to Continue heairg by Wells Fargo, #4 79-Order Graning Motion to Dismiss Case, #5 84-Order Denying Debtors Rule 42 Motion, #6 87-Amended Schedules, #7 88-Debtors Rule 59 and 60 Motion for Reconsideration and or Vacate Amended Order Dismissing case, #8 89-Order Denying Debotrs Rule 59 and 60 Motion for Reconsideration, #9 91-Notice of Appeal, #10 100-Debtors Motin for Extension of Time to File Designation of Record) (bancap,SW )
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. Bankruptcy Record Part 1 filed. Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court hereby certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Attachments: #1 47-Amended Proposed Ch 13 Plan, #2 49-Motion for Relief from Stay, #3 50-Amended Motin for Releif from Stay, #4 55-Trustee Objection to Confirmatmion of Plan, #5 57-Debtors Objection to Motion for Releif, #6 58-Adversay Complaint, #7 59-Objection to Confirmation of Plan, #8 62-Amended Notice to Creditors and Proposed Plan) (bancap,SW)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to Parties in Bankruptcy Case re #1 Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal filed by RALPH M. FOSTER. Appellant Brief due by 4/26/2019. (Garland, Leah)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet(bancap,SW)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court(bancap,SW)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR***MOTION entitled "Debtor's Motion for Extension of Time to File Designation of Record Items on Appeal" filed by RALPH M. FOSTER. (Garland, Leah) Modified on 3/20/2019, original document delivered to USMD Bankruptcy court for docketing. (Garland, Leah)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBERT E. PRICE, JR on behalf of Interested Party Robert Price, Jr. (PRICE, ROBERT)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR***Notice of DEBTOR/APPELLANT'S DISIGNATION OF RECORD AND STATEMENT OF ISSUES ON APPEAL, filed by RALPH M. FOSTER.(Taylor, Abby) Modified on 3/7/2019, Original document delivered to USMD Bankruptcy court for docketing. (Taylor, Abby).
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Designation of Record Items on Appeal by RALPH M. FOSTER. (Taylor, Abby) Modified on 3/7/2019, Original document delivered to USMD Bankruptcy court for docketing. (Taylor, Abby).
February 22, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Garland, Leah)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE by Debtor RALPH M. FOSTER of Bankruptcy Appeal. (Garland, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FOSTER V. HUTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: RALPH M. FOSTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RICHARD M. HUTSON, II
Represented By: RICHARD M. HUTSON, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WILLIAM P. MILLER
Represented By: WILLIAM P. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Robert Price, Jr.
Represented By: ROBERT E. PRICE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: WELLS FARGO BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: BAXTER CHAD EWING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?