QUALITY LABELS & PACKAGING, INC. et al v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: DISTRIBUIDORA DE EMPAQUES CENTROAMERICANO, S.A. and QUALITY LABELS & PACKAGING, INC.
Defendant: DREW'S LOUNGE, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. and ANDREW I. ROBERTSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv00210
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff QUALITY LABELS & PACKAGING, INC., to Response to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by QUALITY LABELS & PACKAGING, INC.. (LEAK, FRANK)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 3/19/2019, that the motion to withdraw, (Doc. #13 ), is GRANTED and that Attorney Kristen P. Watson is allowed to withdraw from representing Defendant Wells Fargo. Remaining counsel of record for Defendant shall continue as counsel in this matter. (Butler, Carol)
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by QUALITY LABELS & PACKAGING, INC., #9 Brief filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. Replies due by 4/1/2019 (LUNSFORD, MIGNON)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney KRISTEN P. WATSON by on behalf of WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw)(WATSON, KRISTEN)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR on 03/18/2019, that Plaintiffs' motion for extension, (Doc. #10 ), is GRANTED and that Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendant's motion to dismiss fourteen (14) days after the court rules on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. (Taylor, Abby)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MIGNON A. LUNSFORD on behalf of Defendant WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (LUNSFORD, MIGNON)
March 14, 2019 Motion Submitted re: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR. (Welch, Kelly)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by QUALITY LABELS & PACKAGING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LEAK, FRANK)
March 8, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(LEAK, FRANK)
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by QUALITY LABELS & PACKAGING, INC.. Response to Motion due by 3/29/2019 (LEAK, FRANK)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. of Service of Notice of Right to Consent (WATSON, KRISTEN)
February 24, 2019 Filing 6 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by QUALITY LABELS & PACKAGING, INC..(LEAK, FRANK)
February 22, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. Response to Motion due by 3/15/2019 (WATSON, KRISTEN)
February 21, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DREW'S LOUNGE, LLC, WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Original document issued in Forsyth County Superior Court, Case Number 18CVS392 and is listed as Exhibit 2 to the Petition for Removal) (Coyne, Michelle)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants, filed by QUALITY LABELS & PACKAGING, INC., DISTRIBUIDORA DE EMPAQUES CENTROAMERICANO, S.A. (Original document filed in Forsyth County Superior Court, Case Number 18CVS3982 and is listed as Exhibit 2 to the Petition for Removal)(Coyne, Michelle)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL against DISTRIBUIDORA DE EMPAQUES CENTROAMERICANO, S.A., QUALITY LABELS & PACKAGING, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2516334.), filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint)(WATSON, KRISTEN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QUALITY LABELS & PACKAGING, INC. et al v. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRIBUIDORA DE EMPAQUES CENTROAMERICANO, S.A.
Represented By: FRANK WALTER LEAK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUALITY LABELS & PACKAGING, INC.
Represented By: FRANK WALTER LEAK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DREW'S LOUNGE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: KRISTEN P. WATSON
Represented By: MIGNON A. LUNSFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW I. ROBERTSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?