MORI EL v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE et al
Plaintiff: RAVENGRACE MORI EL
Defendant: HSBC BANK USA, N.A., BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. LLC, ISSUING ENTITY TRUST ACE SECURTIES CORPORATION HOME EQUITY TRUST, SERIES 2006-CW1, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, H.S.B.C., U.S.A., N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR ACE SECURITIES CORPORATION, DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE, CHRISTY MORSE and RAY M. WARNER
Case Number: 1:2019cv00218
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: LORETTA C BIGGS
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP (), #8 MOTION for Leave, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Blay, Debbie)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 02/28/2019, that Plaintiff's Verified Emergency Petition for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief, (ECF No. #4 ), is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Expedited Hearing Petition, (ECF No. #5 ), and Amended Emergency Motion for Expedited Hearing, (ECF. No. #7 ), are DENIED AS MOOT. (Garland, Leah)
February 28, 2019 Motions Submitted: #5 MOTION to Expedite, #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and #7 MOTION to Expedite to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. (Marsh, Keah)
February 28, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garland, Leah)
February 27, 2019 Motions Referred to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Garland, Leah)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Electronically by RAVENGRACE MORI EL. Responses due by 3/19/2019. (Taylor, Abby)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED MOTION to Expedite by RAVENGRACE MORI EL. (Taylor, Abby)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Signed Pro Se Electronic Service Consent by RAVENGRACE MORI EL r.el8@aol.com (Coyne, Michelle)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Expedite Hearing by RAVENGRACE MORI EL. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order entitled Verified Emergency Petition for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction, and Declaratory Relief" by RAVENGRACE MORI EL.(Coyne, Michelle)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by RAVENGRACE MORI EL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit F)(Coyne, Michelle)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by RAVENGRACE MORI EL. (Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORI EL v. NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC BANK USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISSUING ENTITY TRUST ACE SECURTIES CORPORATION HOME EQUITY TRUST, SERIES 2006-CW1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.S.B.C., U.S.A., N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR ACE SECURITIES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100 INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTY MORSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAY M. WARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAVENGRACE MORI EL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?