GASTON v. MASTERBRAND ULTRACRAFT CABINETRY

Plaintiff: ROBERT ARMARD GASTON
Defendant: MASTERBRAND ULTRACRAFT CABINETRY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00219
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: WILLIAM L OSTEEN
Referring Judge: JOE L WEBSTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JADE M. GILSTRAP on behalf of Defendant MASTERBRAND ULTRACRAFT CABINETRY (GILSTRAP, JADE)
April 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 5/22/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MASTERBRAND ULTRACRAFT CABINETRY identifying Corporate Parent Norcraft Holding, LLC, Corporate Parent MasterBrand Cabinets, Inc., Corporate Parent Fortune Brands Home & Security, Inc. for MASTERBRAND ULTRACRAFT CABINETRY.. (SMITH, FREDERICK)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #2 Complaint by MASTERBRAND ULTRACRAFT CABINETRY. (SMITH, FREDERICK)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney FREDERICK T. SMITH on behalf of Defendant MASTERBRAND ULTRACRAFT CABINETRY (SMITH, FREDERICK)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend Complaint by ROBERT ARMARD GASTON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Coyne, Michelle)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 USMS Return Executed for Complaint, Summons, Notice on 3/18/2019 as to MASTERBRAND ULTRACRAFT CABINETRY. (Butler, Carol)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Right to Consent. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MASTERBRAND ULTRACRAFT CABINETRY. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 02/27/2019, that the plaintiff in the above-entitled proceeding be, and is hereby, permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. [28 U.S.C. 1915(a)] Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant, including the correct address and the name and title of the individual to be served on behalf of a corporation, association, infant, incompetent or government agency. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons and complaint upon defendant. (Garland, Leah)
February 26, 2019 Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 26, 2019 Case Assigned to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against MASTERBRAND ULTRACRAFT CABINETRY, filed by ROBERT ARMARD GASTON.(Coyne, Michelle)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by ROBERT ARMARD GASTON. (Coyne, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GASTON v. MASTERBRAND ULTRACRAFT CABINETRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT ARMARD GASTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MASTERBRAND ULTRACRAFT CABINETRY
Represented By: JADE M. GILSTRAP
Represented By: FREDERICK T. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?