FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. v. AZAR
Plaintiff: FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2019cv00257
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: L PATRICK AULD
Referring Judge: N C TILLEY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Set Plaintiff's Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2019, Defendant's Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2019. Plaintiff's Responses due by 1/6/2020, Defendant's Replies due by 1/27/2020. (Taylor, Abby)
September 26, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines. Plaintiff shall file any summary judgment motion by 11/15/2019. Defendant shall file any response and cross-motion for summary judgment by 12/16/2019. Plaintiff shall file any reply and/or response by 01/06/2020. Defendant shall file any reply by 01/27/2020. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 09/26/2019. (AULD, L.)
September 26, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. To Extend Briefing Schedule until November 15, 2019 to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Winchester, Robin)
September 25, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion for FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. To Extend Briefing Schedule until November 15, 2019 by FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RUBIN, LORI)
August 13, 2019 TEXT ORDER adopting #17 Joint Notice and Proposed Briefing Schedule and cancelling the Initial Pretrial Conference. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 08/13/2019. (AULD, L.)
August 13, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #17 MOTION to Cancel Initial Pretrial Conference and Enter Briefing Schedule for Summary Judgment Proceedings, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by ALEX M. AZAR, II Joint Notice Regarding LR 16.1(a)(1) Exemption and Proposed Briefing Schedule (CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA) Modified on 8/13/2019 to correct event used (Garrett, Kim).
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CASSANDRA L. CRAWFORD on behalf of Defendant ALEX M. AZAR, II (CRAWFORD, CASSANDRA)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 8/26/2019 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT (Part 7 of 7) by Defendant ALEX M. AZAR, II, Plaintiff FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 (Part 7 of 7))(SLOAN, CHERYL)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT (Part 6 of 7) by Defendant ALEX M. AZAR, II, Plaintiff FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 (Part 6 of 7))(SLOAN, CHERYL)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT (Part 5 of 7) by Defendant ALEX M. AZAR, II, Plaintiff FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 (Part 5 of 7))(SLOAN, CHERYL)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT (Part 4 of 7) by Defendant ALEX M. AZAR, II, Plaintiff FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 (Part 4 of 7))(SLOAN, CHERYL)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT (Part 3 of 7) by Defendant ALEX M. AZAR, II, Plaintiff FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 (Part 3 of 7))(SLOAN, CHERYL)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT (Part 2 of 7) by Defendant ALEX M. AZAR, II, Plaintiff FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 (Part 2 of 7))(SLOAN, CHERYL)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED DOCUMENT (Part 1 of 7) by Defendant ALEX M. AZAR, II, Plaintiff FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 of 7)(SLOAN, CHERYL)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Administrative Record filed electronically by ALEX M. AZAR, II. (SLOAN, CHERYL)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for ALEX M. AZAR, II. Answer due by 6/20/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 05/20/2019. (Brubaker, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(SLOAN, CHERYL)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (BENNETT, JOSHUA)
March 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LORI A. RUBIN on behalf of Plaintiff FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. (RUBIN, LORI)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USAG, #2 AZAR)(Coyne, Michelle)
March 6, 2019 Case assigned to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. identifying Corporate Parent NOVANT HEALTH, Corporate Parent NOVANT HEALTH TRIAD REGION, LLC for FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC... (BENNETT, JOSHUA)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2523844.), filed by FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC..(BENNETT, JOSHUA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: CHERYL T. SLOAN
Represented By: CASSANDRA L. CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORSYTH MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT
Represented By: LORI A. RUBIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?