FUMA INTERNATIONAL LLC v. R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY

Plaintiff: FUMA INTERNATIONAL LLC
Defendant: R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv00260
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: CATHERINE C EAGLES
Referring Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RALPH J. GABRIC on behalf of Defendant R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY (GABRIC, RALPH)
May 2, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LAURA B. MILLER on behalf of Defendant R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY (MILLER, LAURA)
May 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER P. SULLIVAN on behalf of Plaintiff FUMA INTERNATIONAL LLC (SULLIVAN, CHRISTOPHER)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER issued by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 4/30/19: The parties shall make their initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures on or before 5/20/19. The parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report(s) no later than 5/27/19. The Court will hold and counsel shall appear for an initial pretrial conference even if the parties agree on a discovery schedule. During the meet-and-confer required by LR 16, the parties shall also discuss the extent to which purportedly confidential documents will likely need to be filed in connection with motions and shall include in their Rule 26(f) report(s) a proposed plan for managing such filings. (Sanders, Marlene)
April 30, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 6/5/19 at 10:00 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #3 before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
April 29, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against by R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 07/11/2016 Response to Office Action, #2 Exhibit 2 - May 2016 Trial Tr. Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 3 - N.D. Ohio Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ohio State Court Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - '813 App. Declarations, #6 Exhibit 6 - '917 App. Declarations, #7 Exhibit 7 - '604 Patent Family Chart, #8 Exhibit 8 - '819 App. Cover Sheet, #9 Exhibit 9 - '097 App. Cover Sheet, #10 Exhibit 10 - '628 Patent, #11 Exhibit 11 - '955 App. Declarations, #12 Exhibit 12 - Ohio State Action Answer, #13 Exhibit 13 - '955 App. Data Sheet, #14 Exhibit 14 - March 2015 Settlement Hearing Tr. Excerpts, #15 Exhibit 15 - June 2016 Continuation Tr. Excerpts, #16 Exhibit 16 - USPTO Report on Ohio State Action, August 2016 Settlement Hearing Tr. Excerpts, #17 Exhibit 17 - N.D. Ohio Notice of Dismissal, #18 Exhibit 18 - '955 App. Assignments, #19 Exhibit 19 - 01/15/2016 Office Action, #20 Exhibit 20 - U.S. Patent App. Pub. No. 2009/0272379, #21 Exhibit 21 - '089 Patent, #22 Exhibit 22 - 07/16/2013 Office Action, #23 Exhibit 23 - 10/16/2013 Response to Office Action, #24 Exhibit 24 - 12/04/2013 Office Action, #25 Exhibit 25 - 07/31/2014 Letter, #26 Exhibit 26 - 07/31/2014 Letter)(BOAZ, DAVID)
April 26, 2019 Motion Referred: RE: #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Marsh, Keah)
April 26, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BOAZ, DAVID)
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN F. MORROW, JR on behalf of Defendant R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY (MORROW, JOHN)
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ANA FRIEDMAN on behalf of Defendant R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY (FRIEDMAN, ANA)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY. Answer due by 4/29/2019. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 03/25/2019. (Brubaker, John)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BOAZ, DAVID)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID RUFUS BOAZ on behalf of Defendant R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY (BOAZ, DAVID)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FUMA INTERNATIONAL LLC re #11 Affidavit of Service (WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. (Sanders, Marlene)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DIRK D. THOMAS on behalf of Plaintiff FUMA INTERNATIONAL LLC (THOMAS, DIRK)
March 6, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Coyne, Michelle)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Coyne, Michelle)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY. (Coyne, Michelle)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRANDON M. JORDAN on behalf of Plaintiff FUMA INTERNATIONAL LLC (JORDAN, BRANDON)
March 6, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by FUMA INTERNATIONAL LLC, an Ohio limited liability company re #1 Complaint,, (DAVIS, WILLIAM)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FUMA INTERNATIONAL LLC, an Ohio limited liability company. (DAVIS, WILLIAM)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS on behalf of Plaintiff FUMA INTERNATIONAL LLC, an Ohio limited liability company (WILLIAMS, KEVIN)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY, a North Carolina corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2524481.)(Related Case # 16-cv-1255), filed by FUMA INTERNATIONAL LLC, an Ohio limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit)(DAVIS, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FUMA INTERNATIONAL LLC v. R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.J. REYNOLDS VAPOR COMPANY
Represented By: LAURA B. MILLER
Represented By: RALPH J. GABRIC
Represented By: ANA FRIEDMAN
Represented By: DAVID RUFUS BOAZ
Represented By: JOHN F. MORROW, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FUMA INTERNATIONAL LLC
Represented By: KEVIN GUY WILLIAMS
Represented By: BRANDON M. JORDAN
Represented By: WILLIAM K. DAVIS
Represented By: DIRK D. THOMAS
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?