VINSON et al v. ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al
Plaintiff: LINDA G. VINSON and KERRY D. VINSON
Defendant: CBS Corporation (a Delaware Corporation), FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., COVIL CORPORATION, GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED, ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., GRINNELL LLC, DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, Crosby Valve, LLC, VELAN VALVE CORP., ITT CORPORATION, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, Anchor/Darling Valve Company, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, CRANE CO., FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY, FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC and CBS CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv00313
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE
Referring Judge: N C TILLEY
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Motions Referred: RE: #62 MOTION for Leave for Plaintiffs to File Amended Complaint, to MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE (Winchester, Robin)
June 7, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave for Plaintiffs to File Amended Complaint by KERRY D. VINSON, LINDA G. VINSON. Responses due by 6/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(PAUL, KEVIN)
May 30, 2019 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORPORATION. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
May 17, 2019 Filing 60 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY. (HOLDEN, JOHN)
May 14, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEPHANIE G. FLYNN on behalf of Defendants ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., VELAN VALVE CORP. (FLYNN, STEPHANIE)
May 8, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant ITT CORPORATION (STARR, WILLIAM)
May 8, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant GRINNELL LLC (STARR, WILLIAM)
May 8, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED (STARR, WILLIAM)
May 8, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR on behalf of Defendant ANCHOR/DARLING VALVE COMPANY (STARR, WILLIAM)
April 18, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSEPH D. HAMMOND on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION. (HAMMOND, JOSEPH)
April 18, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CURTIS J. SHIPLEY on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION. (SHIPLEY, CURTIS)
April 18, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LESLIE C. PACKER on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION. (PACKER, LESLIE)
April 18, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ASHLEY KAMPHAUS BRATHWAITE on behalf of Defendant COVIL CORPORATION. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
April 18, 2019 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COVIL CORPORATION. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
April 18, 2019 Filing 49 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by COVIL CORPORATION. (BRATHWAITE, ASHLEY)
April 18, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RHYAN J. LINDLEY on behalf of Defendant FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC (LINDLEY, RHYAN)
April 18, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney RHYAN J. LINDLEY on behalf of Defendant CROSBY VALVE, LLC (LINDLEY, RHYAN)
April 18, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PHILIP C. REID on behalf of Defendant CROSBY VALVE, LLC (REID, PHILIP)
April 18, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PHILIP C. REID on behalf of Defendant FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC (REID, PHILIP)
April 17, 2019 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VELAN VALVE CORP.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
April 17, 2019 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by VELAN VALVE CORP.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
April 17, 2019 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
April 17, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (PECK, TIMOTHY)
April 17, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KEVIN W. PAUL on behalf of Plaintiffs KERRY D. VINSON, LINDA G. VINSON (PAUL, KEVIN)
April 16, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by CRANE CO.. (MATHER, EMILY)
April 15, 2019 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant ITT CORPORATION by ITT CORPORATION.(TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 15, 2019 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant GRINNELL LLC by GRINNELL LLC.(TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 15, 2019 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED by GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED.(TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 15, 2019 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant ANCHOR/DARLING VALVE COMPANY by ANCHOR/DARLING VALVE COMPANY.(TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 15, 2019 Filing 34 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CROSBY VALVE, LLC (O'NEILL, M.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by CROSBY VALVE, LLC. (O'NEILL, M.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC (O'NEILL, M.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (O'NEILL, M.)
April 15, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ITT CORPORATION. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 15, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GRINNELL LLC. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 15, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 15, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ANCHOR/DARLING VALVE COMPANY. (TOMLIN, TRACY)
April 15, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY. (HOLDEN, JOHN)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY. Answer due 5/17/2019. Signed by Keah Marsh on behalf of John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 4/15/2019.(Marsh, Keah)
April 15, 2019 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order MEOT)(HOLDEN, JOHN)
April 15, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN T. HOLDEN on behalf of Defendant THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY (HOLDEN, JOHN)
April 12, 2019 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORPORATION. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
April 12, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CBS CORPORATION. (TECHMAN, JENNIFER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (MAJOR, CHRISTOPHER)
April 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SCOTT E. FRICK on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. (FRICK, SCOTT)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney W. DAVID CONNER on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. (CONNER, W.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MOFFATT G. MCDONALD on behalf of Defendants DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. (MCDONALD, MOFFATT)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and to Cross-Claims of any and all other Defendants and Third-Party Defendants by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (COLTRAIN, KEITH)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARLA T. RESCHLY on behalf of Defendant CRANE CO. (RESCHLY, MARLA)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Defendant CRANE CO. (MATHER, EMILY)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney EMILY K. MATHER on behalf of Defendant CRANE CO. (MATHER, EMILY)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (Garland, Leah)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Garland, Leah)
March 21, 2019 Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE N. C. TILLEY, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Garland, Leah)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JONATHAN M. HOLDER on behalf of Plaintiffs KERRY D. VINSON, LINDA G. VINSON (HOLDER, JONATHAN)
March 21, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Garland, Leah)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2534948.), filed by Linda G. Vinson, Kerry D. Vinson.(GRAHAM, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VINSON et al v. ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA G. VINSON
Represented By: WILLIAM MARC GRAHAM
Represented By: JONATHAN M. HOLDER
Represented By: KEVIN W. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERRY D. VINSON
Represented By: WILLIAM MARC GRAHAM
Represented By: JONATHAN M. HOLDER
Represented By: KEVIN W. PAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation (a Delaware Corporation)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COVIL CORPORATION
Represented By: LESLIE C. PACKER
Represented By: ASHLEY KAMPHAUS BRATHWAITE
Represented By: CURTIS J. SHIPLEY
Represented By: JOSEPH D. HAMMOND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: STEPHANIE G. FLYNN
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL LLC
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, LLC
Represented By: PHILIP C. REID
Represented By: RHYAN J. LINDLEY
Represented By: M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELAN VALVE CORP.
Represented By: STEPHANIE G. FLYNN
Represented By: TIMOTHY PECK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT CORPORATION
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KEITH E. COLTRAIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor/Darling Valve Company
Represented By: TRACY E. TOMLIN
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL STARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO.
Represented By: MARLA T. RESCHLY
Represented By: EMILY K. MATHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NEW YORK BLOWER COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN T. HOLDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION
Represented By: SCOTT E. FRICK
Represented By: W. DAVID CONNER
Represented By: MOFFATT G. MCDONALD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: PHILIP C. REID
Represented By: RHYAN J. LINDLEY
Represented By: M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: JENNIFER M. TECHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?